Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1847000

EP1847000 - SYSTEM FOR WIRELESS MONITORING OF CIRCUIT BREAKERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.01.2015
Database last updated on 23.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.01.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.02.2015  [2015/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eaton Corporation
Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue
Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US
[2007/43]
Inventor(s)01 / CARLINO, Harry, J.
2223 Woodmont Dr.
Export, PA 15632 / US
02 / SHAAK, Todd, M.
5247 Thoms Run Road
Presto, PA 15142 / US
 [2007/43]
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2007/43]Wagner, Karl H.
WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date06710332.507.02.2006
[2007/43]
WO2006IB00233
Priority number, dateUS2005005417409.02.2005         Original published format: US 54174
[2007/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006085190
Date:17.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1847000
Date:24.10.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2006
[2007/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.08.2006
ClassificationInternational:H02H1/00, H02H1/06
[2007/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/43]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR DRAHTLOSEN ÜBERWACHUNG VON UNTERBRECHERSCHALTERN[2007/43]
English:SYSTEM FOR WIRELESS MONITORING OF CIRCUIT BREAKERS[2007/43]
French:SYSTEME DE SURVEILLANCE SANS FIL DE DISJONCTEURS[2007/43]
Entry into regional phase31.07.2007National basic fee paid 
31.07.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
31.07.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.09.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.07.2007Examination requested  [2007/43]
11.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.09.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/07]
25.09.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2015/07]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.02.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
09.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
08.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
08.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
07.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
07.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201409   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]DE10031963
 [X]US2002075616
 [XP]WO2005101604
 [Y]DE10248640
 [A]DE1763551
 [A]DE19736181