Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1856741

EP1856741 - ELECTROSTATICALLY REGULATED ATOMIC SCALE ELECTROCONDUCTIVITY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.02.2015
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.03.2015  [2015/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NATIONAL RESEARCH COUNCIL OF CANADA
Intellectual Property Services, Building M 58, 1200 Montreal Road Ottawa
Ontario K1A 0R6 / CA
[2007/47]
Inventor(s)01 / WOLKOW, Robert, A.
11615 Saskatchewan Drive
Edmonton, Alberta T6G 2B5 / CA
02 / PIVA, Paul, G.
Apt. 14, 10515 85th Avenue
Edmonton, Alberta T6E 2K5 / CA
03 / PITTERS, Jason, L.
2329 37B Avenue
Edmonton, Alberta T6T 1N8 / CA
04 / DILABIO, Gino, A.
8131 188 Street
Edmonton, Alberta T5T 5A6 / CA
 [2007/47]
Representative(s)Richardson, Lyndsey Ann , et al
Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP
Essex Place
22, Rodney Road
Cheltenham GL50 1JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/39]Lynch, Lyndsey Ann , et al
Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP
Essex Place
22, Rodney Road
Cheltenham GL50 1JJ / GB
Former [2009/31]Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles , et al
Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham
Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB
Former [2007/47]Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles , et al
Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham
Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB
Application number, filing date06710519.708.03.2006
[2007/47]
WO2006IB00510
Priority number, dateUS20050659481P08.03.2005         Original published format: US 659481 P
US20050701276P21.07.2005         Original published format: US 701276 P
[2007/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006095252
Date:14.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1856741
Date:21.11.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2006
[2007/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA14.09.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2010
ClassificationInternational:H01L29/06, G01K7/01, B82B1/00, G01N27/414, H01L29/66, H01L51/05
[2014/34]
Former International [2010/16]H01L29/06, G01K7/01, B82B1/00, G01N27/414, H01L29/66, H01L51/00, H01L51/05
Former International [2007/47]H01L29/06, G01K7/01, B82B1/00, G01N27/414, H01L29/66
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/47]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTROSTATISCH GEREGELTE ELEKTROLEITFÄHIGKEITS-EINRICHTUNG AUF ATOMAREM MASSSTAB[2007/47]
English:ELECTROSTATICALLY REGULATED ATOMIC SCALE ELECTROCONDUCTIVITY DEVICE[2007/47]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ELECTROCONDUCTIVITE A L'ECHELLE ATOMIQUE A REGULATION ELECTROSTATIQUE[2007/47]
Entry into regional phase01.10.2007National basic fee paid 
01.10.2007Search fee paid 
01.10.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
01.10.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.10.2007Examination requested  [2007/47]
20.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.2012Date of oral proceedings
05.09.2012Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
20.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.08.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.10.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/11]
29.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2015/11]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.07.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
15.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201409   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2004036217  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]; TORNOW MARC UWE [DE]; ABSTREITER GERHARD [DE]; FUJIT) [X] 1-33 * the whole document *;
 [I]WO0235580  (MOLECULAR ELECTRONICS CORP [US]; TOUR JAMES M [US]; MAYER THERESA [US]) [I] 1-33 * pages 160-169; figures 1-3,5a,6 *;
 [I]  - ROTH S ET AL, "MOLECULAR RECTIFIERS AND TRANSISTORS BASED ON PI-CONJUGATED MATERIALS", SYNTHETIC METALS, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, LAUSANNE, CH, (19980101), vol. 94, no. 1, ISSN 0379-6779, pages 105 - 110, XP001004861 [I] 1-33 * page 109; figures 1,18 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0379-6779(97)04153-2
International search[X]US6844566  (WASSHUBER CHRISTOPH [US]);
 [A]US2004061173  (HU SHU-FEN [TW], et al);
 [A]  - SIMMONS I.E. ET AL., "The Atomic Fabrication of Silicon Based Quantum Computer", NANOTECHNOLOGY, 2001. IEEE-NANO 2001, PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2001 1ST IEEE CONFERENCE, (20011028), pages 471 - 476, XP008120813

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NANO.2001.966469
by applicantWO2004036217
 WO0235580
    - "Single-Electron Devices and Their Applications" by K.K. Likharev", PROC. IEEE, (199904), vol. 87, pages 606 - 632
    - J.G. KUSHMERICK, MATERIALS TODAY, (2005), vol. 8, page 26
    - J.G. KUSHMERICK, MATERIALS TODAY, (2005), vol. 8, no. 26
    - KUSHMERICK, MATERIALS TODAY, (2005), vol. 8, page 26
    - H. SONG, NATURE, (2009), vol. 462, page 1039
    - E.S. SOLDATOV ET AL., PHYSICS-USPEKHI, (1998), vol. 41, page 202
    - TANS ET AL., NATURE, (1997), vol. 386, page 474
    - K.K. LIKHAREV, PROC. IEEE, (199904), vol. 87, pages 606 - 632
    - KANE, NATURE, (1998), vol. 393, page 133
    - H. SONG; Y. KIM; Y.H. JANG; H. JEONG; M.A. REED; T. LEE, "Observation of molecular orbital gating", NATURE, (2009), vol. 462, doi:doi:10.1038/nature08639, page 1039, XP055035798

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature08639
    - E.S. SOLDATOV; V.V. KHANIN; A.S. TRIFONOV; S.P. GUBIN; V.V. KOLESOV; D.E. PRESNOV; S.A. LAKOVENKO; G.B. KHOMUTOV; A.N. KOROTKOV, "Room temperature molecular single-electron transistor", PHYSICS-USPEKHI, (1998), vol. 41, page 202
    - S.J. TANS; M.H. DEVORET; H. DAI; A. THESS; R.E. SMALLEY; L.J. GEERLIGS; C. DEKKER, "Individual single-wall carbon nanotubes as quantum wires", NATURE, (1997), vol. 386, doi:doi:10.1038/386474a0, page 474, XP002929424

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/386474a0
    - B.E. KANE, "A silicon-based nuclear spin quantum computer", NATURE, (1998), vol. 393, doi:doi:10.1038/30156, page 133, XP000907134

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/30156
    - H. RAZA; K.H. BEVAN; D. KIENLE, "Incoherent transport through molecules on silicon in the vicinity of a dangling bond", PHYS. REV. B, (2008), vol. 77, page 035432
    - PIVA ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 435, page 658
    - P.G. PIVA; R.A. WOLKOW; G. KIRCZENOW, "Nonlocal Conductance Modulation by Molecules: Scanning Tunneling Microscopy of Substituted Styrene Heterostructures on H-Terminated Si(100)", PHYS. REV. LETT., (2008), vol. 101, doi:doi:10.1103/PhysRevLett.101.106801, page 106801, XP055035800

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevLett.101.106801
    - M. B. HAIDER; J.L. PITTERS; G.A. DILABIO; L. LIVADARU; J.Y. MUTUS; R.A. WOLKOW, "Controlled Coupling and Occupation of Silicon Atomic Quantum Dots at Room Temperature", PHYS. REV. LETT., (2009), vol. 102, doi:doi:10.1103/PhysRevLett.102.046805, page 046805, XP055035802

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevLett.102.046805