blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1910825 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1910825



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 596
12.06.2013 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
08.08.2012 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
12.07.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.06.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
25.06.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
25.06.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
25.06.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
25.06.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
25.06.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
23.03.2012 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
23.03.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
15.02.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
15.02.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
15.02.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
15.02.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 53
09.11.2011 Description Search / examination 9
09.11.2011 Drawings Search / examination 1
09.11.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
07.11.2011 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 7
07.11.2011 Description Search / examination 2
07.11.2011 Drawings Search / examination 1
07.11.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
07.11.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
07.11.2011 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
26.10.2011 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 4
29.09.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.09.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
13.09.2011 Brief communication with time limit Search / examination 1
09.09.2011 Decision on interlocutory revision Search / examination 1
02.09.2011 Processing of an appeal Search / examination 2
04.08.2011 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
28.07.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
28.07.2011 Claims Search / examination 1
28.07.2011 Description Search / examination 8
28.07.2011 Drawings Search / examination 1
28.07.2011 Statement of grounds Search / examination 12
22.07.2011 Notice of appeal Search / examination 2
17.05.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
17.05.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
13.05.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
13.05.2011 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
13.05.2011 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
13.05.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 4
13.05.2011 Means of redress Search / examination 2
30.03.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
30.03.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
18.01.2011 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
18.01.2011 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
13.01.2011 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
13.01.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
11.01.2011 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
29.12.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
23.12.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 12
27.10.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
26.10.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
22.10.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
22.10.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
22.10.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
14.10.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
06.10.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
06.10.2010 Claims Search / examination 1
06.10.2010 Drawings Search / examination 1
06.10.2010 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 4
04.10.2010 Claims Search / examination 1
04.10.2010 Claims Search / examination 1
04.10.2010 Drawings Search / examination 1
04.10.2010 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
01.10.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
29.09.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
29.09.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
29.09.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
29.09.2010 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
29.09.2010 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
29.09.2010 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
29.09.2010 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
29.09.2010 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
29.09.2010 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
23.09.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
22.09.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
22.09.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
22.09.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
22.09.2010 Claims Search / examination 1
22.09.2010 Claims Search / examination 1
22.09.2010 Claims Search / examination 1
22.09.2010 Description Search / examination 4
22.09.2010 Drawings Search / examination 1
22.09.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 9
22.09.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 7
22.09.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
21.09.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
21.09.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 12
20.09.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
20.09.2010 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
20.09.2010 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
14.09.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
01.09.2010 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 1
01.09.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
18.08.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
12.08.2010 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
12.08.2010 Claims Search / examination 1
12.08.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 7
12.08.2010 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
03.08.2010 Invitation to file an authorisation Search / examination 1
15.07.2010 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
07.03.2010 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
07.03.2010 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
07.03.2010 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
05.02.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
20.01.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
20.01.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
22.12.2009 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
27.11.2009 Claims Search / examination 1
27.11.2009 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
25.11.2009 Claims Search / examination 1
25.11.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
17.09.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
17.09.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.09.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.07.2009 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
16.07.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
16.07.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.05.2009 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
29.05.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
29.05.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
29.05.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
29.05.2009 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
28.05.2009 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 2
26.05.2009 Claims Search / examination 6
26.05.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
08.04.2009 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
25.03.2009 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
16.03.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
14.03.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.03.2009 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
10.03.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.03.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.03.2009 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
09.03.2009 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
23.01.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
23.01.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.12.2008 Claims Search / examination 4
11.12.2008 Claims Search / examination 4
11.12.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
06.12.2008 Claims Search / examination 4
06.12.2008 Claims Search / examination 4
06.12.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
29.10.2008 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
07.10.2008 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
07.10.2008 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
06.10.2008 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
06.10.2008 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
30.09.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
30.09.2008 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
23.09.2008 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
23.09.2008 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
22.09.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
18.09.2008 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
18.09.2008 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
18.09.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.09.2008 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
18.09.2008 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
17.09.2008 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
16.09.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.09.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 1
26.08.2008 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
24.07.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
22.07.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.07.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.06.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
04.06.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.05.2008 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
08.05.2008 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
19.03.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
06.03.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
06.03.2008 Request for further processing allowed Search / examination 1
01.02.2008 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
15.01.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.01.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
26.11.2007 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) Search / examination 6
26.09.2007 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 12
18.07.2007 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
04.01.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 8
04.01.2007 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
02.10.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 52
14.09.2006 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 56
04.04.2006 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
04.04.2006 Claims International Searching Authority 4
04.04.2006 Description International Searching Authority 43
04.04.2006 Drawings International Searching Authority 8