blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1910825


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.08.2015  [2015/34]
03.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
24.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.02.2014  [2014/09]
17.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.02.2014  [2014/08]
10.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.02.2014  [2014/07]
18.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2013  [2013/47]
19.07.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2013  [2013/34]
14.06.2013 No opposition filed within time limit published on  17.07.2013  [2013/29]
03.05.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.06.2013  [2013/23]
26.04.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.05.2013  [2013/22]
19.04.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2013  [2013/21]
08.03.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.04.2013  [2013/15]
22.02.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.03.2013  [2013/13]
15.02.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2013  [2013/12]
08.02.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2013  [2013/11]
01.02.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2013  [2013/10]
25.01.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2013  [2013/09]
18.01.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2013  [2013/08]
11.01.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.02.2013  [2013/07]
06.07.2012 (Expected) grant published on  08.08.2012  [2012/32]
04.07.2012 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
04.07.2012 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
23.03.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.02.2012 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
30.09.2011 Change - representative published on  02.11.2011  [2011/44]
07.09.2011 New entry: Interlocutory revision of appeal
04.08.2011 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
28.07.2011 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
28.07.2011 New entry: Appeal number
06.05.2011 Change: Despatch of communication that application is refused
06.05.2011 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
25.03.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.01.2011 Change: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
11.01.2011 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
15.10.2010 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
15.10.2010 Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
15.10.2010 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
06.10.2010 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
01.10.2010 Change - divisional application(s) published on  03.11.2010  [2010/44]
03.09.2010 Change - representative published on  06.10.2010  [2010/40]
11.03.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.01.2010 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
03.12.2009 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.09.2009 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.07.2009 Change - applicant published on  19.08.2009  [2009/34]
13.07.2009 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.06.2009 Change: Reply to examination report
17.06.2009 New entry: Reply to examination report
17.03.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.03.2009 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.01.2009 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.12.2008 New entry: Reply to examination report
26.09.2008 Change - applicant published on  29.10.2008  [2008/44]
26.09.2008 Change - representative published on  29.10.2008  [2008/44]
18.09.2008 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.07.2008 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.06.2008 First examination report
03.06.2008 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
16.05.2008 Change - extension states published on  18.06.2008  [2008/25]
21.03.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.03.2008 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  16.04.2008  [2008/16]
14.03.2008 Request for examination filed published on  16.04.2008  [2008/16]
29.02.2008 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
14.02.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
14.02.2008 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
14.02.2008 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
06.02.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
30.01.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
22.11.2007 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
06.01.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
19.09.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
15.09.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
29.04.2006 PCT data prior to European publication