Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1910825

EP1910825 - BIOMARKERS FOR CARDIOVASCULAR SIDE-EFFECTS INDUCED BY COX-2 INHIBITORY COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.06.2013
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For:BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  NL  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
Firalis SAS
35 rue de Fort
68330 Huningue / FR
[2009/34]
Former [2008/44]For:BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  NL  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
Firalis SAS
35 rue de Fort
68330 Huningue / FR
For:AT 
NOVARTIS-PHARMA GMBH
Brunner Strasse 59
1230 Vienna / AT
Former [2008/16]For:BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  NL  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
For:AT 
NOVARTIS-PHARMA GMBH
Brunner Strasse 59
1230 Vienna / AT
Inventor(s)01 / FIRAT, Hueseyin
29a, Rue De Michel Felden
F-68330 Huningue / FR
02 / BOISCLAIR, Julie
Rheinparkstr. 13
CH-4127 Birsfelden Bl / CH
03 / GRENET, Olivier
26, rue Hopfet
F-68730 Blotzheim / FR
04 / PERENTES, Elias
Novartis Pharma AG
Auhafenstrasse
CH-4132 Muttenz 1 / CH
05 / SCHUMACHER, Martin, M.
Linsenackerweg 4
CH-4450 Sissach BL / CH
 [2012/32]
Former [2008/16]01 / FIRAT, Hueseyin
29a, Rue De Michel Felden
F-68330 Huningue / FR
02 / BOISCLAIR, Julie
Rheinparkstr. 13
CH-4127 Birsfelden Bl / CH
03 / GRENET, Olivier
26, rue Hopfet
F-68730 Blotzheim / FR
04 / PERENTES, Elias
Novartis Pharma AG Auhafenstrasse
CH-4132 Muttenz 1 / CH
05 / SCHUMACHER, Martin, M.
Linsenackerweg 4
CH-4450 Sissach BL / CH
Representative(s)Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Erika-Mann Strasse 23
80636 München / DE
[2011/44]
Former [2010/40]Breuer, Markus , et al
Breuer & Müller Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Heimeranstrasse 35
80339 München / DE
Former [2008/44]Molac, Béatrice
25, chemin des Cadets
68100 Mulhouse / FR
Former [2008/16]Bourgarel, Denis Jacques Marie
Novartis AG Corporate Intellectual Property
4002 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date06710533.810.03.2006
[2008/16]
WO2006IB00533
Priority number, dateUS20050661192P11.03.2005         Original published format: US 661192 P
[2008/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006095259
Date:14.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/37]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1910825
Date:16.04.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2006
[2008/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1910825
Date:08.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.01.2007
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/53, A61K45/06, C12Q1/68
[2008/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/16]
TitleGerman:BIOMARKER FÜR DURCH COX-2-INHIBITORVERBINDUNGEN INDUZIERTE KARDIOVASKULÄRE NEBENWIRKUNGEN[2008/16]
English:BIOMARKERS FOR CARDIOVASCULAR SIDE-EFFECTS INDUCED BY COX-2 INHIBITORY COMPOUNDS[2008/16]
French:BIOMARQUEURS POUR DES EFFETS SECONDAIRES CARDIO-VASCULAIRES INDUITS PAR DES COMPOSES INHIBITEURS DE COX-2[2008/16]
Entry into regional phase06.02.2008National basic fee paid 
06.02.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
06.02.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.11.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time
06.02.2008Examination requested  [2008/16]
04.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2011Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.01.2011
31.01.2011Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
13.05.2011Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
15.02.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.06.2012Fee for grant paid
25.06.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination22.07.2011Appeal received
28.07.2011Statement of grounds filed
09.09.2011Interlocutory revision of appeal
Divisional application(s)EP10010203.7  / EP2287608
EP10010204.5  / EP2290363
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.06.2008
Opposition(s)10.05.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/29]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee
06.02.2008Request for further processing filed
06.02.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.03.2008Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
06.02.2008Request for further processing filed
06.02.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.03.2008Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT
06.02.2008Request for further processing filed
06.02.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.03.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
03.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
16.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.03.2006
AT08.08.2012
BE08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
CZ08.08.2012
DK08.08.2012
EE08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
IT08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
LV08.08.2012
NL08.08.2012
PL08.08.2012
RO08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
SI08.08.2012
SK08.08.2012
TR08.08.2012
BG08.11.2012
GR09.11.2012
ES19.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
PT10.12.2012
GB10.03.2013
IE10.03.2013
LU10.03.2013
CH31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
FR02.04.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT08.08.2012
BE08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
CZ08.08.2012
DK08.08.2012
EE08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
IT08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
LV08.08.2012
NL08.08.2012
PL08.08.2012
RO08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
SI08.08.2012
SK08.08.2012
TR08.08.2012
BG08.11.2012
GR09.11.2012
ES19.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
PT10.12.2012
GB10.03.2013
IE10.03.2013
CH31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
FR02.04.2013
Former [2014/09]AT08.08.2012
BE08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
CZ08.08.2012
DK08.08.2012
EE08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
IT08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
LV08.08.2012
NL08.08.2012
PL08.08.2012
RO08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
SI08.08.2012
SK08.08.2012
BG08.11.2012
GR09.11.2012
ES19.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
PT10.12.2012
GB10.03.2013
IE10.03.2013
CH31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
FR02.04.2013
Former [2014/08]AT08.08.2012
BE08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
CZ08.08.2012
DK08.08.2012
EE08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
IT08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
LV08.08.2012
NL08.08.2012
PL08.08.2012
RO08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
SI08.08.2012
SK08.08.2012
BG08.11.2012
GR09.11.2012
ES19.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
PT10.12.2012
IE10.03.2013
CH31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
FR02.04.2013
Former [2014/07]AT08.08.2012
BE08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
CZ08.08.2012
DK08.08.2012
EE08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
IT08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
LV08.08.2012
NL08.08.2012
PL08.08.2012
RO08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
SI08.08.2012
SK08.08.2012
BG08.11.2012
GR09.11.2012
ES19.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
PT10.12.2012
IE10.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
FR02.04.2013
Former [2013/47]AT08.08.2012
BE08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
CZ08.08.2012
DK08.08.2012
EE08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
IT08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
LV08.08.2012
NL08.08.2012
PL08.08.2012
RO08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
SI08.08.2012
SK08.08.2012
BG08.11.2012
GR09.11.2012
ES19.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
PT10.12.2012
MC31.03.2013
Former [2013/34]AT08.08.2012
BE08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
CZ08.08.2012
DK08.08.2012
EE08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
IT08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
LV08.08.2012
NL08.08.2012
PL08.08.2012
RO08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
SI08.08.2012
SK08.08.2012
BG08.11.2012
GR09.11.2012
ES19.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
PT10.12.2012
Former [2013/23]AT08.08.2012
BE08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
CZ08.08.2012
DK08.08.2012
EE08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
IT08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
LV08.08.2012
NL08.08.2012
PL08.08.2012
RO08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
SI08.08.2012
SK08.08.2012
GR09.11.2012
ES19.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
PT10.12.2012
Former [2013/22]AT08.08.2012
BE08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
CZ08.08.2012
DK08.08.2012
EE08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
LV08.08.2012
NL08.08.2012
PL08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
SI08.08.2012
GR09.11.2012
ES19.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
PT10.12.2012
Former [2013/21]AT08.08.2012
BE08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
DK08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
LV08.08.2012
NL08.08.2012
PL08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
SI08.08.2012
GR09.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
PT10.12.2012
Former [2013/15]AT08.08.2012
BE08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
LV08.08.2012
NL08.08.2012
PL08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
SI08.08.2012
GR09.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
PT10.12.2012
Former [2013/13]AT08.08.2012
BE08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
LV08.08.2012
PL08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
SI08.08.2012
GR09.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
PT10.12.2012
Former [2013/12]AT08.08.2012
BE08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
LV08.08.2012
PL08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
SI08.08.2012
GR09.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
Former [2013/11]AT08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
LV08.08.2012
PL08.08.2012
SI08.08.2012
GR09.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
Former [2013/10]AT08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
IS08.12.2012
Former [2013/09]AT08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
Former [2013/08]AT08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
Former [2013/07]AT08.08.2012
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2004112589  (GENENEWS INC [CA], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5,7,8,10,12,13,16-18 * page 144, line 28 - page 148, line 26 * * claims 1-9,11 *;
 [PX]WO2006023966  (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al) [PX] 1,2,4,5,7,8,12,16-18 * page 23, line 1 * * page 29 * * claims 1-72 *
 [X]  - GIANNITSIS EVANGELOS, "Rationale for testing the cardiovascular risk for patients with COX-2 inhibitors on the basis of biomarker NT-proBNP.", CLINICAL LABORATORY. 2005, (2005), vol. 51, no. 1-2, ISSN 1433-6510, pages 63 - 72, XP008056286 [X] 1,2,4,5,18 * the whole document *
 [A]  - JUNI P ET AL, "Risk of cardiovascular events and rofecoxib: cumulative meta-analysis", LANCET THE, LANCET LIMITED. LONDON, GB, (20041204), vol. 364, no. 9450, ISSN 0140-6736, pages 2021 - 2029, XP004746586 [A] 1,2,4,5,7,8,10,12,13,16-18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(04)17514-4
 [A]  - PFISTER R ET AL, "Natriuretic peptides BNP and NT-pro-BNP: established laboratory markers in clinical practice or just perspectives?", CLINICA CHIMICA ACTA, AMSTERDAM, NL, (200411), vol. 349, no. 1-2, ISSN 0009-8981, pages 25 - 38, XP004591517 [A] 1,2,4,5,7,8,10,12,13,16-18

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cccn.2004.06.018
Examination   - LEVINE S M ET AL, "New approaches to treatment in systemic vasculitis: biological therapies.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (200106), Database accession no. NLM11469824
    - LEVINE S M ET AL, "New approaches to treatment in systemic vasculitis: biological therapies.", BEST PRACTICE & RESEARCH. CLINICAL RHEUMATOLOGY JUN 2001, (200106), vol. 15, no. 2, ISSN 1521-6942, pages 315 - 333