Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1854231

EP1854231 - DEVICE CAPABLE OF BEING OPERATED WITHIN A NETWORK, NETWORK SYSTEM, METHOD OF OPERATING A DEVICE WITHIN A NETWORK, PROGRAM ELEMENT, AND COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.02.2014
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  NL  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/28]For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  NL  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
Former [2013/15]For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  NL  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
Former [2007/46]For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  NL  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BUIL, Vincent, P.
C/o Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / VAN DE SLUIS, Bartel, M.
C/o Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
03 / BALDUS, Heribert
C/o Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
04 / FALCK, Thomas
C/o Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
 [2007/46]
Representative(s)Verweij, Petronella Daniëlle , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2012/34]Verweij, Petronella Danielle , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2007/46]Groenendaal, Antonius W. M.
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date06710893.613.02.2006
[2007/46]
WO2006IB50466
Priority number, dateEP2005010120717.02.2005         Original published format: EP 05101207
[2007/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006087670
Date:24.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1854231
Date:14.11.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2006
[2007/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1854231
Date:10.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.08.2006
ClassificationInternational:H04B13/00
[2007/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/46]
TitleGerman:IN EINEM NETZWERK BETREIBBARE VORRICHTUNG, NETZWERKSYSTEM, VERFAHREN FÜR DEN BETRIEB EINER VORRICHTUNG IN EINEM NETZWERK, PROGRAMMELEMENT UND COMPUTERLESBARES MEDIUM[2007/46]
English:DEVICE CAPABLE OF BEING OPERATED WITHIN A NETWORK, NETWORK SYSTEM, METHOD OF OPERATING A DEVICE WITHIN A NETWORK, PROGRAM ELEMENT, AND COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM[2007/46]
French:DISPOSITIF CAPABLE DE FONCTIONNER DANS UN RESEAU, SYSTEME DE RESEAU, PROCEDE POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN DISPOSITIF DANS UN RESEAU, ELEMENT DE PROGRAMME ET SUPPORT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR[2007/46]
Entry into regional phase17.09.2007National basic fee paid 
17.09.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
17.09.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.09.2007Examination requested  [2007/46]
23.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.2012Fee for grant paid
21.12.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.12.2009
Opposition(s)13.01.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
01.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
29.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
28.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.02.2006
AT10.04.2013
BE10.04.2013
CY10.04.2013
CZ10.04.2013
DK10.04.2013
EE10.04.2013
FI10.04.2013
IT10.04.2013
LT10.04.2013
LV10.04.2013
MC10.04.2013
NL10.04.2013
PL10.04.2013
RO10.04.2013
SE10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
SK10.04.2013
TR10.04.2013
BG10.07.2013
GR11.07.2013
ES21.07.2013
IS10.08.2013
PT12.08.2013
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU13.02.2006
AT10.04.2013
BE10.04.2013
CY10.04.2013
CZ10.04.2013
DK10.04.2013
EE10.04.2013
FI10.04.2013
IT10.04.2013
LT10.04.2013
LV10.04.2013
MC10.04.2013
NL10.04.2013
PL10.04.2013
RO10.04.2013
SE10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
SK10.04.2013
BG10.07.2013
GR11.07.2013
ES21.07.2013
IS10.08.2013
PT12.08.2013
Former [2014/44]AT10.04.2013
BE10.04.2013
CY10.04.2013
CZ10.04.2013
DK10.04.2013
EE10.04.2013
FI10.04.2013
IT10.04.2013
LT10.04.2013
LV10.04.2013
MC10.04.2013
NL10.04.2013
PL10.04.2013
RO10.04.2013
SE10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
SK10.04.2013
BG10.07.2013
GR11.07.2013
ES21.07.2013
IS10.08.2013
PT12.08.2013
Former [2014/11]AT10.04.2013
BE10.04.2013
CY10.04.2013
CZ10.04.2013
DK10.04.2013
EE10.04.2013
FI10.04.2013
IT10.04.2013
LT10.04.2013
LV10.04.2013
NL10.04.2013
PL10.04.2013
RO10.04.2013
SE10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
SK10.04.2013
BG10.07.2013
GR11.07.2013
ES21.07.2013
IS10.08.2013
PT12.08.2013
Former [2014/10]AT10.04.2013
BE10.04.2013
CY10.04.2013
CZ10.04.2013
DK10.04.2013
EE10.04.2013
FI10.04.2013
LT10.04.2013
LV10.04.2013
NL10.04.2013
PL10.04.2013
SE10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
SK10.04.2013
BG10.07.2013
GR11.07.2013
ES21.07.2013
IS10.08.2013
PT12.08.2013
Former [2014/09]AT10.04.2013
BE10.04.2013
CY10.04.2013
DK10.04.2013
EE10.04.2013
FI10.04.2013
LT10.04.2013
LV10.04.2013
NL10.04.2013
PL10.04.2013
SE10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
BG10.07.2013
GR11.07.2013
ES21.07.2013
IS10.08.2013
PT12.08.2013
Former [2013/52]AT10.04.2013
BE10.04.2013
CY10.04.2013
FI10.04.2013
LT10.04.2013
LV10.04.2013
NL10.04.2013
PL10.04.2013
SE10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
BG10.07.2013
GR11.07.2013
ES21.07.2013
IS10.08.2013
PT12.08.2013
Former [2013/50]AT10.04.2013
BE10.04.2013
FI10.04.2013
LT10.04.2013
LV10.04.2013
NL10.04.2013
PL10.04.2013
SE10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
BG10.07.2013
GR11.07.2013
ES21.07.2013
IS10.08.2013
PT12.08.2013
Former [2013/49]AT10.04.2013
BE10.04.2013
FI10.04.2013
LT10.04.2013
NL10.04.2013
SE10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
GR11.07.2013
ES21.07.2013
IS10.08.2013
PT12.08.2013
Former [2013/48]AT10.04.2013
LT10.04.2013
NL10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
ES21.07.2013
IS10.08.2013
PT12.08.2013
Former [2013/47]LT10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
PT12.08.2013
Former [2013/37]SI10.04.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1096722  (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5,8-25 * paragraphs [0060] - [0063] - [0076] - [0081] - [0120] , [0153]; figures 1,12 *;
 [I]EP1220501  (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [I] 1-25 * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] , [0026]; figures 1-3 *
by applicantEP1096722
 EP1220501