Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1859432

EP1859432 - DEVICES, SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF CAPTURING AND DISPLAYING APPEARANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.01.2014
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vilcovsky, Nissi
Mota Gur 21
69694 Tel Aviv / IL
[2007/48]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2007/48]
Representative(s)Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/30]Korenberg, Alexander Tal , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2007/48]Maggs, Michael Norman
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date06711263.101.03.2006
[2007/48]
WO2006IL00281
Priority number, dateUS20050656885P01.03.2005         Original published format: US 656885 P
US20050656884P01.03.2005         Original published format: US 656884 P
[2007/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006092793
Date:08.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/36]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1859432
Date:28.11.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2006
[2007/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US02.08.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.08.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/262, G06F3/01, G06Q30/00, H04N7/18
[2011/37]
Former International [2007/48]G09G5/00, G09G5/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/48]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINRICHTUNGEN, SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERFASSEN UND ANZEIGEN VON ERSCHEINUNGSBILDERN[2007/48]
English:DEVICES, SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF CAPTURING AND DISPLAYING APPEARANCES[2007/48]
French:DISPOSITIFS, SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES DE CAPTURE ET D'AFFICHAGE D'ASPECTS[2007/48]
Entry into regional phase25.09.2007National basic fee paid 
25.09.2007Search fee paid 
25.09.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
25.09.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.09.2007Examination requested  [2007/48]
24.04.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
22.05.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.12.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination05.12.2014Appeal received No.  T0585/15
24.02.2015Statement of grounds filed
30.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)EP14200722.8  / EP2884738
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.06.2012
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
22.05.2012Request for further processing filed
22.05.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.06.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
02.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
11.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
28.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
28.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[IY]EP1372092  (ACCENTURE GLOBAL SERVICES GMBH [CH]) [I] 1-12 * paragraphs [0015] - [0035] - [0039] * [Y] 8,9;
 [XYI]US2005018140  (ISHIZAKI HIDEAKI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-4,10,12 * paragraphs [0063] - [0091]; figures 1-4,7 * [Y] 8,9 [I] 5-7,11;
 [XYI]DE10031965  (FLOEGEL EBERHARD [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,10-12 * paragraphs [0001] - [0010]; figure 1 * [Y] 8,9 [I] 5,7;
 [XI]US2002196333  (GORISCHEK IGNAZ M [US]) [X] 1-4,10,12 * paragraphs [0015] - [0027]; figures 1,2C, 3 * [I] 5-7,11;
 [Y]WO0022955  (FISCHER ERIC [DE]) [Y] 1-4,6,10-12 * figure 2 *;
 [Y]DE19943355  (BENESCH MARKUS [DE]) [Y] 1-4,6,10-12 * column 6, line 28 - column 7, line 48; figures 1,2 * * column 8, line 66 - column 10, line 31; figure 4 *;
 [Y]EP1376207  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-3,6,10-12 * paragraph [0001]; figure 1 *
International search[X]US2003085866