blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1857560

EP1857560 - METHOD OF MELTING MAGNESIUM AND MELTING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  13.11.2009
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Taiyo Nippon Sanso Corporation
3-26, Koyama 1-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 1428558 / JP
For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI RIKA DENKI SEISAKUSHO
3-260 Toyota, Oguchi-cho Niwa-gun
Aichi-ken, 480-0195 / JP
[2007/47]
Inventor(s)01 / SANUI, Hiroshi
c/o TAIYO NIPPON SANSO CORPORATION, 3-26, Koyama 1
-chome, Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo, 1428558 / JP
02 / NOMURA, Yuji
c/o TAIYO NIPPON SANSO CORPORATION, 3-26, Koyama 1
-chome, Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo, 1428558 / JP
03 / KATO, Toru
c/o KABUSHIKIKAISHA TOKAI RIKA DENKI SEISAKUSHO, 3
-260, Toyota, Oguchi-cho, Niwa-gun, Aich / JP
04 / NAKAMURA, Toru
c/o KABUSHIKIKAISHA TOKAI RIKA DENKI SEISAKUSHO, 3
-260, Toyota, Oguchi-cho, Niwa-gun, Aich / JP
 [2007/47]
Representative(s)Smyth, Gyles Darren
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/47]Smyth, Gyles Darren
Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date06711999.019.01.2006
[2007/47]
WO2006JP300753
Priority number, dateJP2005001258020.01.2005         Original published format: JP 2005012580
[2007/47]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2006077931
Date:27.07.2006
Language:JA
[2006/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1857560
Date:21.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP27.07.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.08.2009
ClassificationIPC:C22B9/16, B22D21/04
[2007/47]
CPC:
B22D21/007 (EP,US); B22D21/04 (KR); C22B26/22 (EP,US);
C22B9/003 (EP,US); C22B9/006 (EP,US); C22B9/16 (KR);
Y02P10/25 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2008/17]
Former [2007/47]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM SCHMELZEN VON MAGNESIUM UND SCHMELZVORRICHTUNG[2007/47]
English:METHOD OF MELTING MAGNESIUM AND MELTING APPARATUS[2007/47]
French:PROCEDE DE FUSION DE MAGNESIUM ET DISPOSITIF DE FUSION[2007/47]
Entry into regional phase11.07.2007Translation filed 
10.07.2007National basic fee paid 
10.07.2007Search fee paid 
10.07.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.07.2007Examination requested  [2007/47]
06.11.2009Application withdrawn by applicant  [2009/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]  - SCHINDELBACHER G ET AL, "EFFEKTIVITAET UND SCHUTZWIRKUNG VON VERSCHIEDENEN GASGEMISCHEN BEI MAGNESIUMSCHMELZEN", GIESSEREI, GIESSEREI VERLAG, DUSSELDORF, DE, (20030114), vol. 90, no. 1, ISSN 0016-9765, pages 54 - 57, XP001143749 [A] 1-6 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.