Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1870525

EP1870525 - PIPING STRUCTURE OF A FRONT WORK MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2007/52]PIPING STRUCTURE OF FRONT WORK MACHINE
[2010/01]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.02.2011
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.03.2011  [2011/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yanmar Co., Ltd.
1-32, Chayamachi
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0013 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/52]For all designated states
Yanmar Co., Ltd.
1-32, Chayamachi Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0013 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SAKADA, Seiji c/o Yanmar Construction Equipment Co Ltd
1717-1 Oaza Kumano Chikugo-shi
8330055 Fukuoka / JP
02 / OGATA, Nagahiro c/o Yanmar Construction Equipment Co Ltd
1717-1 Oaza Kumano Chikugo-shi
833-0055 Fukuoka / JP
 [2007/52]
Representative(s)Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter
Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG
Brüsseler Ring 51
52074 Aachen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/52]Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter
Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Brüsseler Ring 51
52074 Aachen / DE
Application number, filing date06712024.620.01.2006
[2007/52]
WO2006JP300799
Priority number, dateJP2005007204414.03.2005         Original published format: JP 2005072044
[2007/52]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006098082
Date:21.09.2006
Language:JA
[2006/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1870525
Date:26.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1870525
Date:21.04.2010
Language:EN
[2010/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.09.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:E02F3/34, B62D21/18, E02F9/14
[2009/08]
Former International [2007/52]E02F3/36, B62D21/18, E02F9/00, E02F9/14
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2008/25]
Former [2007/52]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ROHRLEITUNGSSTRUKTUR EINER FRONTARBEITSMASCHINE[2007/52]
English:PIPING STRUCTURE OF A FRONT WORK MACHINE[2010/01]
French:STRUCTURE DE TUYAUTERIE D'AVANT DE MACHINE DE CHANTIER[2007/52]
Former [2007/52]PIPING STRUCTURE OF FRONT WORK MACHINE
Entry into regional phase12.09.2007Translation filed 
15.10.2007National basic fee paid 
15.10.2007Search fee paid 
15.10.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
15.10.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.10.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
15.10.2007Examination requested  [2007/52]
13.03.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.12.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.03.2010Fee for grant paid
10.03.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.01.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
02.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
01.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH03103351U  (?) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]JP2000314149  (CATERPILLAR MITSUBISHI LTD) [A] 1 * figures 1,4,5 *;
 [A]JPH11200409  (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD, et al) [A] 1,3 * figures 1,3,5,10,11 *;
 [A]JPS60190839U  (?) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]JP2002013158  (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [A] 4 * figure - *;
 [A]FR2846016  (KUBOTA KK [JP]) [A] 4 * figures 5,6 *;
 [A]JP2000027234  (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [A] 3 * figure - *;
 [A]US5542339  (KACZMARCZYK EDWARD T [CA], et al) [A] 1 * figure - *