EP1847532 - IGF-1R INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyowa Hakko Kirin Co., Ltd. 1-6-1, Ohtemachi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2013/23] |
Former [2009/17] | For all designated states Kyowa Hakko Kirin Co., Ltd. 1-6-1, Ohtemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANDA, Yutaka c/o Pharmaceutical Research Center KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO.LTD,1188, Shimotogari Nagaizumi-cho, Sunto-gun, Shizuoka 411- 8731 / JP | 02 /
ANDO, Hiromi c/o Head Office, KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO.LTD 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | 03 /
KAWASHIMA, Keiko c/o Pharmaceutical Research Center KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO.LTD,1188, Shimotogari Nagaizumi-cho, Sunto-gun, Shizuoka 411- 8731 / JP | 04 /
SUGITA, Takamasa c/o Sakai Research Laboratories KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO.LTD, 1-53, Takasu-cho 1 cho Sakai-ku, Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-8554 / JP | 05 /
SUZUKI, Masayo c/o Bio Frontier Laboratories KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO.LTD, 6-6, Asahi-machi 3 chome Machida-shi, Tokyo 194-8533 / JP | 06 /
TAGAYA, Hisashi c/o Pharmaceutical Research Center KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO.LTD,1188, Shimotogari Nagaizumi-cho, Sunto-gun, Shizuoka 411- 8731 / JP | 07 /
NAKAZATO, Tomoyuki c/o Pharmaceutical Research Center KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO.LTD,1188, Shimotogari Nagaizumi-cho, Sunto-gun, Shizuoka 411- 8731 / JP | 08 /
YAMASHITA, Yoshinori c/o Head Office, KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO.LTD 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | 09 /
TAKAHASHI, Takeshi c/o Head Office, KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO.LTD 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | 10 /
NARA, Shinji c/o Pharmaceutical Research Center KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO.LTD,1188, Shimotogari Nagaizumi-cho, Sunto-gun, Shizuoka 411- 8731 / JP | 11 /
NAKAMURA, Hiroaki c/o Pharmaceutical Research Center KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO.LTD,1188, Shimotogari Nagaizumi-cho, Sunto-gun, Shizuoka 411- 8731 / JP | [2013/23] |
Former [2007/43] | 01 /
KANDA, Yutaka c/o Pharmaceutical Research Center KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO.LTD,1188, Shimotogari Nagaizumi-cho, Sunto-gun, Shizuoka 411- 8731 / JP | ||
02 /
ANDO, Hiromi c/o Head Office, KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO.LTD 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | |||
03 /
KAWASHIMA, Keiko c/o Pharmaceutical Research Center KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO.LTD,1188, Shimotogari Nagaizumi-cho, Sunto-gun, Shizuoka 411- 8731 / JP | |||
04 /
SUGITA, Takamasa c/o Sakai Research Laboratories KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO.LTD, 1-53, Takasu-cho 1 cho Sakai-ku, Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-8554 / JP | |||
05 /
SUZUKI, Masayo c/o Bio Frontier Laboratories KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO.LTD, 6-6, Asahi-machi 3 chome Machida-shi, Tokyo 194-8533 / JP | |||
06 /
TAGAYA, Hisashi c/o Pharmaceutical Research Center KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO.LTD,1188, Shimotogari Nagaizumi-cho, Sunto-gun, Shizuoka 411- 8731 / JP | |||
07 /
NAKAZATO, Tomoyuki c/o Pharmaceutical Research Center KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO.LTD,1188, Shimotogari Nagaizumi-cho, Sunto-gun, Shizuoka 411- 8731 / JP | |||
08 /
YAMASHITA, Yoshinori c/o Head Office, KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO.LTD 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | |||
09 /
TAKAHASHI, Takeshi c/o Head Office, KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO.LTD 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | |||
10 /
NARA, Shinji c/o Pharmaceutical Research Center KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO.LTD,1188, Shimotogari Nagaizumi-cho, Sunto-gun, Shizuoka 411- 8731 / JP | |||
11 /
NAKAMURA, Hiroaki c/o Pharmaceutical Research Center KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO.LTD,1188, Shimotogari Nagaizumi-cho, Sunto-gun, Shizuoka 411- 8731 / JP | Representative(s) | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2007/43] | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 06712507.0 | 27.01.2006 | [2007/43] | WO2006JP301341 | Priority number, date | JP20050020158 | 27.01.2005 Original published format: JP 2005020158 | [2007/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006080450 | Date: | 03.08.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1847532 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1847532 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/56, A61K31/416, A61K31/4196, A61K31/422, A61K31/423, A61K31/427, A61K31/433, A61K31/437, A61K31/438, A61K31/4439, A61K31/454, C07D401/12, C07D405/12, C07D409/12, C07D413/12, C07D417/12, C07D491/10, C07D495/04 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
C07D231/56 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/381 (KR);
A61K31/415 (KR);
A61K31/535 (KR);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D401/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D417/12 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/43] | C07D231/56, A61K31/416, A61K31/4196, A61K31/422, A61K31/423, A61K31/427, A61K31/433, A61K31/437, A61K31/438, A61K31/4439, A61K31/454, A61K31/496, A61K31/497, A61K31/506, A61K31/5377, A61P13/08, A61P13/10, A61P35/00, A61P35/02, A61P43/00, C07D401/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/43] | Title | German: | IGF-1R-INHIBITOR | [2007/43] | English: | IGF-1R INHIBITOR | [2007/43] | French: | INHIBITEUR D'IGF-1R | [2007/43] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2007 | Translation filed | 22.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 05.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.01.2006 | AT | 05.06.2013 | BE | 05.06.2013 | CY | 05.06.2013 | CZ | 05.06.2013 | DK | 05.06.2013 | EE | 05.06.2013 | FI | 05.06.2013 | LT | 05.06.2013 | LV | 05.06.2013 | MC | 05.06.2013 | NL | 05.06.2013 | PL | 05.06.2013 | RO | 05.06.2013 | SE | 05.06.2013 | SI | 05.06.2013 | SK | 05.06.2013 | TR | 05.06.2013 | BG | 05.09.2013 | GR | 06.09.2013 | IS | 05.10.2013 | PT | 07.10.2013 | IE | 27.01.2014 | LU | 27.01.2014 | CH | 31.01.2014 | LI | 31.01.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 27.01.2006 | |
AT | 05.06.2013 | ||
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
IE | 27.01.2014 | ||
LU | 27.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
IE | 27.01.2014 | ||
LU | 27.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
IE | 27.01.2014 | ||
LU | 27.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
LU | 27.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
LU | 27.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | IT | 27.01.2013 | |
AT | 05.06.2013 | ||
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | IT | 27.01.2013 | |
AT | 05.06.2013 | ||
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | IT | 27.01.2013 | |
AT | 05.06.2013 | ||
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | IT | 27.01.2013 | |
AT | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 05.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP1582211 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]) [XP] 1,2* table 1; compound 1 * |