Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1857521

EP1857521 - ORGANIC ELECTRIC FIELD LIGHT EMITTING ELEMENT AND PRODUCTION THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.02.2014
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8251 / JP
[2017/51]
Former [2017/35]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8251 / JP
Former [2012/27]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8251 / JP
Former [2007/47]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
14-1, Shiba 4-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0014 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YABE, Masayoshi
c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science and Technology Research Center,Inc.
1000, Kamoshida-cho
Aoba-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2278502 / JP
02 / OGATA, Tomoyuki
c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science and Technology Research Center, Inc.
1000, Kamoshida-cho
Aoba-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2278502 / JP
03 / SATO, Hideki
c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science and Technology Research Center, Inc.
1000, Kamoshida-cho
Aoba-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2278502 / JP
04 / IIDA, Koichiro
c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science and Technology Research Center, Inc.
1000, Kamoshida-cho
Aoba-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2278502 / JP
05 / TANAKA, Asato
c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science and Technology Research Center, Inc.
1000, Kamoshida-cho
Aoba-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2278502 / JP
06 / TANAMURA, Mitsuru
c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science and Technology Research Center, Inc.
1000, Kamoshida-cho
Aoba-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2278502 / JP
07 / KAWAMURA, Yuichiro@Mitsubishi Chemical Group Scien
c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science and Technology Research Center, Inc.
1000, Kamoshida-cho
Aoba-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2278502 / JP
08 / ISHIKAWA, Hironori
c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science and Technology Research Center, Inc.
1000, Kamoshida-cho
Aoba-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2278502 / JP
09 / OKABE, Kazuki
c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science and Technology Research Center, Inc.
1000, Kamoshida-cho
Aoba-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2278502 / JP
 [2013/44]
Former [2007/47]01 / YABE, Masayoshi Mitsubishi Chem. Group Science and
Technology Res. Cntr, Inc., 1000, Kamoshida-cho
Aoba-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2278502 / JP
02 / OGATA, Tomoyuki, Mitsubishi Chem. Group Science &
Technology Res. Cntr, Inc., 1000, Kamoshida-cho
Aoba-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2278502 / JP
03 / SATO, Hideki, Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science &
Technology Res. Cntr, Inc., 1000, Kamoshida-cho
Aoba-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2278502 / JP
04 / IIDA, Koichiro, Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science
& Technology Res. Cntr, Inc., 1000, Kamoshida-cho
Aoba-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2278502 / JP
05 / TANAKA, Asato, Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science
&Technology Res. Cntr, Inc., 1000, Kamoshida-cho
Aoba-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2278502 / JP
06 / TANAMURA, Mitsuru Mitsubishi Chemical GroupScience
& Technology Res. Cntr, Inc., 1000, Kamoshida-cho
Aoba-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2278502 / JP
07 / KAWAMURA, Yuichiro Mitsubishi Chemical Group Scien
& Technology Res. Cntr, Inc., 1000, Kamoshida-cho
Aoba-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2278502 / JP
08 / ISHIKAWA, Hironori Mitsubishi Chemical Group Scien
& Technology Res. Cntr, Inc., 1000, Kamoshida-cho
Aoba-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2278502 / JP
09 / OKABE, Kazuki Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science &
Technology Res. Center, Inc., 1000, Kamoshida-cho
Aoba-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2278502 / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/14]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2007/47]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date06713643.214.02.2006
[2007/47]
WO2006JP302502
Priority number, dateJP2005004425021.02.2005         Original published format: JP 2005044250
[2007/47]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006095539
Date:14.09.2006
Language:JA
[2006/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1857521
Date:21.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1857521
Date:02.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.09.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.02.2010
ClassificationInternational:C09K11/06, H01L51/00, H01L51/50
[2013/41]
Former International [2007/47]C09K11/00, H01L51/00
Designated contracting statesDE [2008/22]
Former [2007/47]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:ORGANISCHES LICHTEMITTIERENDES ELEMENT MIT ELEKTRISCHEM FELD UND HERSTELLUNG DAVON[2007/47]
English:ORGANIC ELECTRIC FIELD LIGHT EMITTING ELEMENT AND PRODUCTION THEREFOR[2007/47]
French:ELEMENT ORGANIQUE PHOTOEMETTEUR SOUS CHAMP ELECTRIQUE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION[2007/47]
Entry into regional phase20.08.2007Translation filed 
20.08.2007National basic fee paid 
20.08.2007Search fee paid 
20.08.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
20.08.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.08.2007Examination requested  [2007/47]
07.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.03.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2014Fee for grant paid
17.01.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.07.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.12.2014   
Merck Patent GmbH
Postfach
Frankfurter Strasse 250
64293 Darmstadt / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/05]
Opponent(s)01  19.12.2014   
Merck Patent GmbH
Postfach Frankfurter Strasse 250
D-64293 Darmstadt / DE
16.02.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.09.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
01.06.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition31.07.2017Appeal received No.  T1729/17
09.10.2017Statement of grounds filed
16.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
23.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
27.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
20.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
18.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2004214040  (LEE SOO-HYOUNG [KR] ET AL) [X] 1-4,6,9-15 * paragraphs [0071] - [0073] - [0144] - [0146]; figure 11a; example 1; compound 1e * [I] 5,7-8;
 [XI]US2004209115  (THOMPSON MARK E [US] ET AL) [X] 1-4,6,9-15 * paragraphs [0046] , [0064]; figures 1,12 * [I] 5,7-8;
 [A]US6366017  (ANTONIADIS HOMER [US] ET AL) [A] 5 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 6; example 7 *;
 [A]US2004096698  (KISHIMOTO HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 8-9 * example 1 *
 [I]  - HE GUFENG ET AL, "High-efficiency and low-voltage p-i-n electrophosphorescent organic light-emitting diodes with double-emission layers", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20040101), vol. 85, no. 17, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 3911 - 3913, XP012063133 [I] 1-15 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1812378
 [I]  - SHINJIRO OKADA ET AL, "52.2: High-efficiency RED Organic Light Emitting Material and Device Based on Triplet Emission with Ir Complex", 2002 SID INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM - MAY 21, 2002, HYNES CONVENTION CENTER, BOSTON, MASSACHUSETTS, (20020521), vol. XXXIII, page 1360, XP007008070 [I] 1-15 * figure 10 *
 [XI]  - M. Thompson, "Efficient utlization of excitons", (20030430), URL: http://www.rochester.edu/College/workshop/presentations/MarkThompson/MT_2003.pdf, (20100129), XP002566107 [X] 1-4,6,9-15 * the whole document * [I] 5,7-8