blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1988052

EP1988052 - MOVING HANDRAIL REPAIR DEVICE FOR PASSENGER CONVEYOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.08.2016
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.09.2016  [2016/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2008/47]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Former [2008/45]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KAWASAKI, Atsushi
c/o Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha, 7-3, Maruno uchi 2-chome, ;
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 1008310 / JP
 [2008/45]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/45]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date06714182.021.02.2006
[2008/45]
WO2006JP303042
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2007096948
Date:30.08.2007
Language:JA
[2007/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1988052
Date:05.11.2008
Language:EN
[2008/45]
Type: A8 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP1988052
Date:11.02.2009
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.08.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.08.2015
ClassificationIPC:B66B31/02, B66B23/24
[2015/37]
CPC:
B66B23/24 (EP,KR,US); B66B31/02 (KR); B29C73/00 (EP,US);
B29C73/30 (EP,US); B29C73/34 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2008/45]B66B31/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   NL [2010/14]
Former [2008/45]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:REPARATURVORRICHTUNG FÜR BEWEGLICHEN HANDLAUF FÜR PERSONENBEFÖRDERUNGSEINRICHTUNG[2008/45]
English:MOVING HANDRAIL REPAIR DEVICE FOR PASSENGER CONVEYOR[2008/45]
French:DISPOSITIF DE REPARATION DE MAIN COURANTE POUR SYSTEME DE TRANSPORT DE PASSAGERS[2008/45]
Entry into regional phase04.09.2007Translation filed 
04.09.2007National basic fee paid 
04.09.2007Search fee paid 
04.09.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
04.09.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
04.09.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.09.2007Examination requested  [2008/45]
08.03.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/36]
13.04.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
23.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
27.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
20.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
18.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.201611   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH08268679  (MATSUI MFG CO) [A] 1-5* abstract *;
 [A]JP2000016743  (HITACHI BUILDING SYS CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2005053687  (MITSUBISHI ELEC BUILDING TECHN) [A] 1-5 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.