Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1863498

EP1863498 - COMPOSITION COMPRISING ISOORIENTIN FOR SUPPRESSING HISTAMINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.09.2012
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.10.2012  [2012/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unigen, Inc.
200-1, Songjeong-ri Byeongcheon-myeon, Cheonan-si
Chungcheongnamdo 330-863 / KR
[2007/50]
Inventor(s)01 / WOO, Sung-Sick
Sangjiritzvill 3rd, 5-501, 843-15 Bangbae 4-dong
Seocho-gu, Seoul 137-836 / KR
02 / KIM, Dong-Seon
Hyundae Apt. 104-1002, Wa-dong, Daedeok-gu
Daejeon 306-789 / KR
03 / DO, Seon-Gil
Hanul 2nd,201-1106, 724,Yullyang-dong, Sangdang
-gu, Cheongju-si, Chungcheongbuk-do 360-818 / KR
04 / LEE, Young-Chul
Samsung Apt. 14-1103, Oryu-dong, Jung-gu
Daejeon 301-758 / KR
05 / OH, Mi-Sun
No. 200-1, Songjeong-Ri, Byeongcheon-Myeon
Cheonan-Si, Chungnam 330-863 / KR
06 / CHA, Ji-Min
200-1, Songjeong-Ri, Byeongcheon-Myeon
Cheonan-Si, Chungnam 330-683 / KR
07 / JO, Tae-Hyung
Maeul 1-121, Jeongja-dong, Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-811 / KR
 [2008/26]
Former [2008/16]01 / WOO, Sung-Sick
Sangjiritzvill 3rd, 5-501, 843-15 Bangbae 4-dong
Seocho-gu, Seoul 137-836 / KR
02 / KIM, Dong-Seon
Hyundae Apt. 104-1002, Wa-dong, Daedeok-gu
Daejeon 306-789 / KR
03 / DO, Seon-Gil
Hanul 2nd,201-1106, 724,Yullyang-dong, Sangdang
-gu, Cheongju-si, Chungcheongbuk-do 360-818 / KR
04 / LEE, Young-Chul
Samsung Apt. 14-1103, Oryu-dong, Jung-gu
Daejeon 301-758 / KR
05 / OH, Mi-Sun
Munhwa-dong, Cheonan-si
Chungcheongnam-do 330-220 / KR
06 / CHA, Ji-Min
200-1, Songjeong-Ri, Byeongcheon-Myeon
Cheonan-Si, Chungnam 330-683 / KR
07 / JO, Tae-Hyung
Maeul 1-121, Jeongja-dong, Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-811 / KR
Former [2007/50]01 / WOO, Sung-Sick
Sangjiritzvill 3rd, 5-501, 843-15 Bangbae 4-dong
Seocho-gu, Seoul 137-836 / KR
02 / KIM, Dong-Seon
Hyundae Apt. 104-1002, Wa-dong, Daedeok-gu
Daejeon 306-789 / KR
03 / DO, Seon-Gil
Hanul 2nd,201-1106, 724,Yullyang-dong, Sangdang
-gu, Cheongju-si, Chungcheongbuk-do 360-818 / KR
04 / LEE, Young-Chul
Samsung Apt. 14-1103, Oryu-dong, Jung-gu
Daejeon 301-758 / KR
05 / OH, Mi-Sun
Munhwa-dong, Cheonan-si
Chungcheongnam-do 330-220 / KR
06 / CHA, Ji-Min
Shinsamho Apt. Ga-507,725, Bangbae-dong
Seocho-gu, Seoul 137-060 / KR
07 / JO, Tae-Hyung
Maeul 1-121, Jeongja-dong, Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-811 / KR
Representative(s)Wichmann, Hendrik , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/43]Wichmann, Hendrik , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Former [2007/50]Wichmann, Hendrik
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Prinzregentenstrasse 68
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date06716434.317.03.2006
[2007/50]
WO2006KR00984
Priority number, dateKR2005002277218.03.2005         Original published format: KR 20050022772
[2007/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006098603
Date:21.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/38]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1863498
Date:12.12.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2006
[2007/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AT30.11.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.06.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/7032, A61K31/352, A61K36/899, A61P37/08
[2007/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/50]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT ISOORIENTIN ZUR UNTERDRÜCKUNG VON HISTAMIN[2007/50]
English:COMPOSITION COMPRISING ISOORIENTIN FOR SUPPRESSING HISTAMINE[2007/50]
French:COMPOSITION RENFERMANT DE L'ISOORIENTINE POUR SUPPRESSION D'HISTAMINE[2007/50]
Entry into regional phase16.10.2007National basic fee paid 
16.10.2007Search fee paid 
16.10.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
16.10.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.10.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.10.2007Examination requested  [2007/50]
04.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.04.2011Observations by third parties
27.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.05.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/43]
11.06.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/43]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.09.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
17.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201207   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US2003170186  ;
 [X]US2003125264  ;
 [X]JPH05271088  ;
 [X]JP2003212786  ;
 [X]JPS61233627  ;
 [X]JPH07252158  ;
 [X]TW235922B
 [X]  - KAWASAKI M. ET AL., "In-vitro antiallergic activity of flavonoids in histamine release assay using rat basophillic leukemia (RBL-2H3)", SHOKUHIN EISEIGAKU ZASSHI, (1994), vol. 35, no. 5, pages 497 - 503, XP008001959
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 75, Database accession no. 2003-793483, XP003004292 & JP2003212786 A 20030730 (UNIV NIPPON)
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1986, no. 48, Database accession no. 1986-315436, XP003004293 & JPS61233627 A 19860117 (AGENCY OF IND SCI & TECHNOLOGY)
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 48, Database accession no. 1995-371111, XP003004294 & JPH07252158 A 19951003 (SOKEN KK)
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 08, Database accession no. 1995-059632, XP003004295 & TW235922B B 19941211 (AMBOO DEVICE CO LTD)
other   - "Maa-ul-buqool", TKDL, Database accession no. AH5/262G, XP003027862
    - MOHAMMAD AKMAL KHAN, Qaraabaadeen Azam wa Akmal, (1909), page 367
    - "Sibr", TKDL, Database accession no. AA21/910, XP003027863
    - ABU BAKR MOHAMMAD. BIN ZAKARIVYA AL RAZI, Kitaab-al-Haawi-fil-Tibb, (1968), page 147
    - "Zimaad Baraai banaat-ul-Lail", TKDL, Database accession no. AH5/1838, XP003027864
    - MOHAMMAD AKMAL KHAN, Qaraabaadeen Azam wa Akmal, (1909), page 519
    - "Godanti (haritala) Bhasma Vidhi-02", TKDL, Database accession no. RG12/169C, XP003027865
    - Äyurveda Särasamgrahah, (2003), page 102
    - "Dawa Bara-e-Qai", TKDL, Database accession no. AA5/138, XP003027866
    - ABU BAKR MOHAMMAD. BIN ZAKARIYYA AL RAZI, Kitaab al Haawi fil Tibb, (1979), pages 94 - 95
    - "Narikelamrta", TKDL, Database accession no. AK11/2673, XP003027867
    - VANGASENA, Vangasena, (1996), page 654
    - "Maajoon-e-Tabasheer", TKDL, Database accession no. MH5/1381, XP003027868
    - MOHAMMAD AKBAR ARZANI, Qaraabaadeen Qaadri, (1968), page 200
    - "Safoof Bara-e- Suaghal Balghami", TKDL, Database accession no. MH1/1348, XP003027869
    - MOHAMMAD SHAREEF KHAN, Ilaaj-al-Amraaz, (1921), page 108
    - "Naqoo Barae Deedan-e-shikam", TKDL, Database accession no. AN2/323C, XP003027870
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHAM KHAN, Khazaain al Advia, (1911), page 339
    - "Vidangadi Modakah", TKDL, Database accession no. AK11/1659, XP003027871
    - VANGASENA, Vangasena, (1996), page 423
    - "Sivathai Chooranam", TKDL, Database accession no. PD04/203, XP003027872
    - AGASTHIYAR, Agathiar vaithiam 600, page 107