Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1838697

EP1838697 - PROCESSES FOR PREPARING 4-(PHENOXY-5-METHYL-PYRIMIDIN-4-YLOXY)PIPERIDINE-1-CARBOXYLIC ACID DERIVATIVES AND RELATED COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.02.2011
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 17.09.2014  [2014/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
6166 Nancy Ridge Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2007/40]
Inventor(s)01 / GHARBAOUI, Tawfik
2340 Lomica Place
Escondido, California 92029 / US
02 / FRITCH, John, R
23622 Calistoga Place
Ramona, California 92065 / US
03 / KRISHNAN, Ashwin, M
11023 Cedarcrest Way
San Diego, California 92121 / US
04 / THROOP, Beverly, Wolgast
12761 Jordan Ridge Court
San Diego, California 92130 / US
05 / KATO, Naomi, S
3379 30th Street
San Diego, California 92104 / US
 [2007/40]
Representative(s)Wytenburg, Wilhelmus Johannes , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/40]Wytenburg, Wilhelmus Johannes , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date06717730.309.01.2006
[2007/40]
WO2006US00565
Priority number, dateUS20050642627P10.01.2005         Original published format: US 642627 P
[2007/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006076243
Date:20.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1838697
Date:03.10.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2006
[2007/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1838697
Date:31.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.07.2006
ClassificationInternational:C07D401/12
[2007/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/40]
Extension statesAL31.07.2007
BA31.07.2007
HR31.07.2007
MK31.07.2007
YU31.07.2007
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 4-(PHENOXY-5-METHYL-PYRIMIDIN-4-YLOXY)PIPERIDIN-1-CARBOXYLSÄURE-DERIVATEN UND DAMIT ZUSAMMENHÄNGENDEN VERBINDUNGEN[2007/40]
English:PROCESSES FOR PREPARING 4-(PHENOXY-5-METHYL-PYRIMIDIN-4-YLOXY)PIPERIDINE-1-CARBOXYLIC ACID DERIVATIVES AND RELATED COMPOUNDS[2007/40]
French:PROCEDES D'ELABORATION DE DERIVES D'ACIDE 4-(PHENOXY-5-METHYL-PYRIMIDINE-4-YLOXY)PIPERIDINE-1-CARBOXYLIQUE, ET DE COMPOSES CONNEXES[2007/40]
Entry into regional phase31.07.2007National basic fee paid 
31.07.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
31.07.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.09.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.07.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.07.2007Examination requested  [2007/40]
27.08.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.02.2010Fee for grant paid
05.02.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.01.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
13.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
CY31.03.2010
CZ31.03.2010
EE31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
GR31.03.2010
HU31.03.2010
LT31.03.2010
LV31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
RO31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
SK31.03.2010
TR31.03.2010
BG30.06.2010
IS31.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
[2014/38]
Former [2013/45]AT31.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
CY31.03.2010
CZ31.03.2010
EE31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
HU31.03.2010
LT31.03.2010
LV31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
RO31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
SK31.03.2010
TR31.03.2010
BG30.06.2010
IS31.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
Former [2013/44]AT31.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
CY31.03.2010
CZ31.03.2010
EE31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
LT31.03.2010
LV31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
RO31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
SK31.03.2010
TR31.03.2010
BG30.06.2010
IS31.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
Former [2013/42]AT31.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
CY31.03.2010
CZ31.03.2010
EE31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
LT31.03.2010
LV31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
RO31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
SK31.03.2010
BG30.06.2010
IS31.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
Former [2011/09]AT31.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
CY31.03.2010
CZ31.03.2010
EE31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
LT31.03.2010
LV31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
RO31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
SK31.03.2010
IS31.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
Former [2011/04]AT31.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
CY31.03.2010
CZ31.03.2010
EE31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
LT31.03.2010
LV31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
RO31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
SK31.03.2010
IS31.07.2010
Former [2010/41]AT31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
LT31.03.2010
LV31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2004065380
 [X]WO2004099144
 [X]WO03018556
 [X]WO02085892
 [X]GB1495665
 [XP]WO2005007647