Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1841566

EP1841566 - STAPLER WITH STACK HEIGHT COMPENSATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.03.2011
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.04.2011  [2011/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ACCO Brands USA LLC
300 Tower Parkway
Lincolnshire, IL 60069-3665 / US
[2007/41]
Inventor(s)01 / ADAMS, David, P.
1000 South Summit Street
Barrington, Illinois 60010 / US
02 / BARGO, Kenneth, J.
7338 Farwell
Chicago, Illinois 60631 / US
 [2007/41]
Representative(s)Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart , et al
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/44]Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart , et al
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2008/44]Parry, Simon James , et al
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2007/41]Parry, Simon James , et al
Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date06719162.720.01.2006
[2007/41]
WO2006US02203
Priority number, dateUS20050647658P27.01.2005         Original published format: US 647658 P
[2007/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006081159
Date:03.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/31]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1841566
Date:10.10.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2006
[2007/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.04.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.04.2010
ClassificationInternational:B25C5/02
[2007/41]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2008/18]
Former [2007/41]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HEFTGERÄT MIT STAPELHÖHENAUSGLEICH[2007/41]
English:STAPLER WITH STACK HEIGHT COMPENSATION[2007/41]
French:AGRAFEUSE MUNIE D'UN SYSTEME DE COMPENSATION DE LA HAUTEUR DE LA PILE[2007/41]
Entry into regional phase26.07.2007National basic fee paid 
26.07.2007Search fee paid 
26.07.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
26.07.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.07.2007Examination requested  [2007/41]
31.08.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/16]
14.10.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201106   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US5222645
 [Y]US6547119
 [A]US2770805
 [A]US2975424
 [A]US2500217
 [A]US6820787