Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1846410

EP1846410 - DIHYDROQUINAZOLINONES AS 5HT MODULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.11.2009
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Route 206 and Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08543 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/04]For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Route 206 and Province Line Road P.O. Box 4000
Princeton NJ 08543-4000 / US
Former [2007/43]For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
P.O. Box 4000, Route 206 and Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US
Inventor(s)01 / AHMAD, Saleem
2094 Ohadi Drive
Wall, NJ 07719 / US
02 / NGU, Khehyong
4 Kunkel Court
Pennington, NJ 08534 / US
 [2007/43]
Representative(s)Hart-Davis, Jason , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2007/43]Hart Davis, Jason , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date06720489.109.02.2006
[2007/43]
WO2006US04417
Priority number, dateUS20050651833P10.02.2005         Original published format: US 651833 P
[2007/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006086464
Date:17.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1846410
Date:24.10.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2006
[2007/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1846410
Date:21.01.2009
Language:EN
[2009/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.09.2006
ClassificationInternational:C07D487/04, A61K31/495, A61K31/55, A61P3/04, A61P3/10, A61P25/22, A61P25/24, A61P25/06, A61P25/18, A61P25/20
[2007/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/43]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DIHYDROCHINAZOLINONE ALS 5HT-MODULATOREN[2007/43]
English:DIHYDROQUINAZOLINONES AS 5HT MODULATORS[2007/43]
French:DIHYDROQUINAZOLINONES UTILISEES COMME MODULATEURS DE LA 5HT[2007/43]
Entry into regional phase20.08.2007National basic fee paid 
20.08.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
20.08.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.08.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.08.2007Examination requested  [2007/43]
11.07.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.11.2008Fee for grant paid
04.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.10.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/53]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
CY21.01.2009
CZ21.01.2009
DK21.01.2009
EE21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
LT21.01.2009
LV21.01.2009
NL21.01.2009
PL21.01.2009
RO21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
SK21.01.2009
TR21.01.2009
IE09.02.2009
LU09.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
BG21.04.2009
SE21.04.2009
GR22.04.2009
IS21.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
HU22.07.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/33]AT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
CZ21.01.2009
DK21.01.2009
EE21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
LT21.01.2009
LV21.01.2009
NL21.01.2009
PL21.01.2009
RO21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
SK21.01.2009
IE09.02.2009
LU09.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
BG21.04.2009
SE21.04.2009
GR22.04.2009
IS21.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
HU22.07.2009
Former [2011/22]AT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
CZ21.01.2009
DK21.01.2009
EE21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
LT21.01.2009
LV21.01.2009
NL21.01.2009
PL21.01.2009
RO21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
SK21.01.2009
IE09.02.2009
LU09.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
BG21.04.2009
SE21.04.2009
GR22.04.2009
IS21.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
Former [2011/04]AT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
CZ21.01.2009
DK21.01.2009
EE21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
LT21.01.2009
LV21.01.2009
NL21.01.2009
PL21.01.2009
RO21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
SK21.01.2009
IE09.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
BG21.04.2009
SE21.04.2009
GR22.04.2009
IS21.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
Former [2010/14]AT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
CZ21.01.2009
DK21.01.2009
EE21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
LT21.01.2009
LV21.01.2009
NL21.01.2009
PL21.01.2009
RO21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
SK21.01.2009
IE09.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
BG21.04.2009
SE21.04.2009
IS21.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
Former [2010/07]AT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
CZ21.01.2009
DK21.01.2009
EE21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
LT21.01.2009
LV21.01.2009
NL21.01.2009
PL21.01.2009
RO21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
SK21.01.2009
IE09.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
SE21.04.2009
IS21.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
Former [2010/03]AT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
CZ21.01.2009
DK21.01.2009
EE21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
LT21.01.2009
LV21.01.2009
NL21.01.2009
PL21.01.2009
RO21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
SK21.01.2009
MC28.02.2009
SE21.04.2009
IS21.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
Former [2009/29]NL21.01.2009
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2004094425
 [A]  ZIGEUNER, GUSTAV ET AL: "Heterocycles, 55. 2-(1,2,3,4-Tetrahydro-4,4,6-trimethyl-2-th ioxo-1- pyrimidine)benzoic acid and 2,3,4,4a-tetrahydro-3,3,4a-trimethyl-1-thi oxo- 1H,6H-pyrimido[1,6-a][3,1]benzoxazin-6-one " MONATSHEFTE FUER CHEMIE , 109(1), 113-21 CODEN: MOCMB7; ISSN: 0026-9247, 1978, XP008066828

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00911951