Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1861626

EP1861626 - ANCHOR ASSEMBLY FOR FASTENER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.09.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
21.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cobra Fixations Cie. Ltée- Cobra Anchors Co. Ltd.
8051 Boul. Métropolitain Est Anjou
Quebec H1J 1J8 / CA
[2007/49]
Inventor(s)01 / McDUFF, Pierre
153 Avenue Maplewood
Outremont, Quebec H2V 2M4 / CA
02 / POLLAK, Alexandre
1753 rue Colbert
Laval, Québec H7M 1M2 / CA
03 / NGUYEN, Lang
12 de Gaspé
Dollard-des-Ormeaux, Quebec H9B 3G8 / CA
 [2007/49]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[2014/43]
Former [2007/49]Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date06721687.921.03.2006
[2007/49]
WO2006CA00419
Priority number, dateCA2005250204421.03.2005         Original published format: CA 2502044
US20050685498P31.05.2005         Original published format: US 685498 P
[2007/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006099728
Date:28.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1861626
Date:05.12.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2006
[2007/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1861626
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA28.09.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.08.2010
ClassificationInternational:F16B13/08
[2007/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/49]
TitleGerman:ANKERANORDNUNG FÜR BEFESTIGUNGSELEMENT[2007/49]
English:ANCHOR ASSEMBLY FOR FASTENER[2007/49]
French:ENSEMBLE D'ANCRAGE POUR PIECE DE FIXATION[2007/49]
Entry into regional phase21.09.2007National basic fee paid 
21.09.2007Search fee paid 
21.09.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
21.09.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.09.2007Examination requested  [2007/49]
13.07.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.08.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.01.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
03.04.2014Fee for grant paid
03.04.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.04.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.08.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.07.2015  31.07.2015  ADMISSIBLE
fischerwerke GmbH & Co. KG
Klaus-Fischer-Strasse 1
72178 Waldachtal / DE
 [2015/37]
28.08.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.03.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
13.07.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.07.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition25.09.2017Appeal received No.  T2140/17
23.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
21.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
03.04.2014Request for further processing filed
03.04.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.04.2014Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application
13.07.2011Request for further processing filed
13.07.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.11.2011Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
13.07.2011Request for further processing filed
13.07.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.11.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.03.2006
AT22.10.2014
BE22.10.2014
BG22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
IT22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SI22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
TR22.10.2014
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
IE21.03.2015
LU21.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
[2017/46]
Former [2017/39]HU21.03.2006
AT22.10.2014
BG22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
IT22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SI22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
TR22.10.2014
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
IE21.03.2015
LU21.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/12]AT22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
IT22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SI22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
IE21.03.2015
LU21.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/07]AT22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
IT22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
IE21.03.2015
LU21.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/06]AT22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
IT22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
LU21.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2015/47]AT22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
IT22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
LU21.03.2015
Former [2015/46]AT22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
IT22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/37]AT22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
IT22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/36]AT22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/35]AT22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/34]AT22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/26]AT22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/25]AT22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/24]ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/23]ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/22]LT22.10.2014
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/20]LT22.10.2014
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]EP0713981  (CCL SYSTEMS LTD [GB]);
 [X]US4294156  (MCSHERRY THOMAS W, et al);
 [Y]WO2004079209  (COBRA FIXATIONS CIE LTEE COBRA [CA], et al);
 [Y]CA2458320  (DEMEO TERENCI [CA]);
 [A]US4043245  (KAPLAN STANLEY)
by applicantUS4294156
 US4075924
 US4650386