Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1882269

EP1882269 - Apparatus for attenuating reflections of electromagnetic waves. method for its manufacture and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2008/05]APPARATUS FOR ATTENUATING REFLECTIONS OF ELECTROMAGNETIC WAVES, METHOD FOR ITS MANUFACTURE AND ITS USE
[2008/38]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Karlsruher Institut für Technologie
Kaiserstrasse 12
76131 Karlsruhe / DE
[2009/50]
Former [2008/05]For all designated states
Forschungszentrum Karlsruhe GmbH
Weberstrasse 5
76133 Karlsruhe / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SEEMANN, Klaus
Hainbuchenweg 2
76448 Durmersheim / DE
02 / LEISTE, Harald
Wiesenstrasse 29
76356 Weingarten / DE
03 / BEKKER, Viacheslav
Brunnenhausstrasse 4
76227 Karlsruhe / DE
04 / ZILS, Stefan
Neuwiesenstrasse 5
76275 Ettlingen / DE
 [2008/05]
Application number, filing date06723895.631.03.2006
[2008/05]
WO2006EP02934
Priority number, dateDE2005102247314.05.2005         Original published format: DE102005022473
[2008/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006122608
Date:23.11.2006
Language:DE
[2006/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1882269
Date:30.01.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2006
[2008/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1882269
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.11.2006
ClassificationInternational:H01L23/552
[2008/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/05]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Dämpfung von Reflexionen elektromagnetischer Wellen, Verfahren zur Herstellung und ihre Verwendung[2008/38]
English:Apparatus for attenuating reflections of electromagnetic waves. method for its manufacture and its use[2008/38]
French:Dispositif d'atténuation des réflexions d'ondes electromagnétiques, son procédé de production et son utilisation[2008/38]
Former [2008/05]VORRICHTUNG ZUR DÄMPFUNG VON REFLEXIONEN ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER WELLEN, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG
Former [2008/05]APPARATUS FOR ATTENUATING REFLECTIONS OF ELECTROMAGNETIC WAVES, METHOD FOR ITS MANUFACTURE AND ITS USE
Former [2008/05]DISPOSITIF D'ATTENUATION DES REFLEXIONS D'ONDES ELECTROMAGNETIQUES, SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET SON UTILISATION
Entry into regional phase28.06.2007National basic fee paid 
28.06.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
28.06.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.06.2007Examination requested  [2008/05]
29.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.12.2008Fee for grant paid
05.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
TR18.02.2009
AT31.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
LU31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/33]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
AT31.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
LU31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
Former [2011/22]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
AT31.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
LU31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2011/17]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
AT31.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2011/04]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
AT31.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/30]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
AT31.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/14]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BE31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/03]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
MC31.03.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Cited inInternational search[X]US2002067313
 [X]US6483481
 [A]EP1508917