Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1874771

EP1874771 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING BICYCLIC COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.04.2012
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.05.2012  [2012/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SmithKline Beecham (Cork) Limited
Currabinny Carrigaline
Cork / IE
For all designated states
NEUROCRINE BIOSCIENCES, INC.
12790 El Camino Real
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
[2008/45]
Former [2008/02]For all designated states
SB Pharmco Puerto Rico Inc.
The Prentice Hall Corp. System of P.R. Inc., c/o FGR Corporate Services Inc. BBV Tower 8th Floor 254 Munoz Rivera Avenue
00918 San Juan / PR
For all designated states
NEUROCRINE BIOSCIENCES, INC.
12790 El Camino Real
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BACCHI, Sergio
GlaxoSmithKline Via Alessandro Fleming 2
I-37135 Verona / IT
02 / DELPOGETTO, Monica
GlaxoSmithKline Via Alessandro Fleming 2
I-37135 Verona / IT
03 / GUELFI, Simone
GlaxoSmithKline Via Alessandro Fleming 2
I-37135 Verona / IT
04 / PERBONI, Alcide
GlaxoSmithKline Via Alessandro Fleming 2
I-37135 Verona / IT
05 / RIBECAI, Arianna
GlaxoSmithKline Via Alessandro Fleming 2
I-37135 Verona / IT
06 / STABILE, Paolo
GlaxoSmithKline Via Alessandro Fleming 2
I-37135 Verona / IT
07 / TAMPIERI, Marsia
GlaxoSmithKline Via Alessandro Fleming 2
I-37135 Verona / IT
 [2008/02]
Representative(s)Mauro, Marina Eliana , et al
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/02]Mauro, Marina Eliana , et al
GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property CN925.1 980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Application number, filing date06724393.106.04.2006
[2008/02]
WO2006EP03531
Priority number, dateGB2005000719808.04.2005         Original published format: GB 0507198
[2008/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006108693
Date:19.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/42]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1874771
Date:09.01.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2006
[2008/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.10.2007
ClassificationInternational:C07D471/04, C07D207/22
[2008/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/02]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HR16.10.2007
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG BICYCLISCHER VERBINDUNGEN[2008/02]
English:PROCESS FOR PREPARING BICYCLIC COMPOUNDS[2008/02]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE COMPOSES BICYCLIQUES[2008/02]
Entry into regional phase16.10.2007National basic fee paid 
16.10.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
16.10.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.02.2007Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.10.2007Examination requested  [2008/02]
07.08.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.11.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/19]
20.12.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2012/19]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.08.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
07.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201106   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[DX]WO2004094420  (SB PHARMCO PUERTO RICO INC; NEUROCRINE BIOSCIENCES INC; ANDREOTTI, DAN) [DX] 1-4,8,9 * scheme 2,;; examples 2-1,3-1,4-1,7-1,8-1; claim - *;
 [X]WO2004062665  (SB PHARMCO PUERTO RICO INC; NEUROCRINE BIOSCIENCES INC; GLAXO GROUP LI) [X] 1-4,8,9 * scheme 3,;; example 4; claim - *;
 [X]DE2826678  (BYK-GULDEN LOMBERG CHEMISCHE FABRIK G.M.B.H., FED. REP. GER.) [X] 5-7 * the whole document *;
 [X]US3773788  (VIS, JAN H.) [X] 5-7 * the whole document *;
 [X]US3717648  (DIANA, GUY D.) [X] 5-7 * column 5, line 45 - column 6, line 45; example 9; compound IVA *;
 [X]US4366158  (HODGSON, GORDON LEWIS, JR. ET AL) [X] 5-7 * example 9 *;
 [A]  - BOUILLON, JEAN-PHILIPPE ET AL, "Reactions of trifluoromethylated enamines with iminium chlorides and analogs. Synthesis of new 2-aza-1,3-dienes and pyridin-4-ones", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1997:346092, URL: STN, XP002426289 [A] 3,4,8,9 * abstract *
 [X]  - BERGMANN, ROLF ET AL, "Synthesis and antihypertensive activity of 4-(1,2-dihydro-2-oxo-1-pyridyl)- 2H-1-benzopyrans and related compounds, new potassium channel activators", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY , 33(2), 492-504 CODEN: JMCMAR; ISSN: 0022-2623, (1990), XP002443777 [X] 5-7 * scheme III,;; example -; table IV *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00164a005
 [X]  - KOVTUNENKO, V. A. ET AL, "2-Amino-.DELTA.1-pyrrolinium salts", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1984:630290, URL: STN, XP002443784 [X] 5-7 * abstract *
 [X]  - VIS, JAN H. ET AL, "N-nitroso derivatives of 1-substituted-2-iminopyrrolidines", JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY , 7(6), 1417-19 CODEN: JHTCAD; ISSN: 0022-152X, (1970), XP002443778 [X] 5-7 * page 1417, column L; table I *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jhet.5570070633
 [X]  - KOVTUNENKO, V. A. ET AL, "Preparation and reactions of 1R-2-iminopyrrolidines", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1987:119589, URL: STN, XP002443785 [X] 5-7 * abstract *
 [X]  - KWOK, RUSSELL ET AL, "Synthesis and nuclear magnetic resonance spectra of some N-substituted 2-iminopyrrolidines", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY , 32(3), 738-40 CODEN: JOCEAH; ISSN: 0022-3263, (1967), XP002443779 [X] 5-7 * scheme I,;; example - *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo01278a052