Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1874771

Designated contracting statesAT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
NL 
PL 
PT 
RO 
SE 
SI 
SK 
TR 
Examination procedure20.12.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2012/19]
Entry into regional phase16.10.2007National basic fee paid 
16.10.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
16.10.2007Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
07.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201106   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:09.01.2008 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20071016
 
Event date:09.01.2008 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:09.01.2008 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL BA HR MK YU
 
Event date:16.07.2008 
Event description:REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED
EXTENSION STATE:HR
Payment DATE:20071016
 
Event date:10.09.2008 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20080807
 
Event date:24.10.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HK DE 1114091 HK
Code Expl.: REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG
 
Event date:05.11.2008 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
OWNER NAME:SMITHKLINE BEECHAM (CORK) LIMITED
 
Event date:05.11.2008 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
OWNER NAME:NEUROCRINE BIOSCIENCES, INC.
 
Event date:09.05.2012 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20111102
 
Event date:31.10.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HK WD 1114091 HK
Code Expl.:-APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG