Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1883476

EP1883476 - ROTOR FOR SCRAP SHREDDER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.06.2009
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.07.2009  [2009/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SATRIND S.p.A.
Via Baracca 2
20010 Arluno / IT
[2008/06]
Inventor(s)01 / ROTA, Fabio, Marcello
Via Giambellino, 15
I-20146 Milano (MI) / IT
 [2008/06]
Representative(s)Coggi, Giorgio , et al
Racheli S.R.L.
Viale San Michele del Carso, 4
20144 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2008/06]Coggi, Giorgio , et al
Racheli & C. S.p.A. Viale San Michele del Carso, 4
20144 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date06724423.619.04.2006
[2008/06]
WO2006EP03570
Priority number, dateIT2005MI0075727.04.2005         Original published format: IT MI20050757
[2008/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006114223
Date:02.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1883476
Date:06.02.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2006
[2008/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1883476
Date:20.08.2008
Language:EN
[2008/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.11.2006
ClassificationInternational:B02C18/18
[2008/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FI,   IT,   SE [2008/22]
Former [2008/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ROTOR FÜR EINEN ABFALLZERKLEINERER[2008/06]
English:ROTOR FOR SCRAP SHREDDER[2008/06]
French:ROTOR POUR UNE DECHIQUETEUSE DE DECHETS[2008/06]
Entry into regional phase04.07.2007National basic fee paid 
04.07.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
04.07.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.07.2007Examination requested  [2008/06]
28.10.2007Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
08.01.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR
26.05.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.07.2008Fee for grant paid
09.07.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.05.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]GB448258
 [A]US6422495
 [A]US4702424
by applicant GB448258