Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1858990

EP1858990 - INK COMPOSITION FOR CONTINUOUS DEFLECTED INK JET PRINTING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.01.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.02.2010  [2010/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IMAJE S.A.
9, rue Gaspard Monge
26500 Bourg les Valence / FR
[2007/48]
Inventor(s)01 / DE SAINT-ROMAIN, Pierre
10, Rue Rabelais
F-26000 Valence / FR
 [2007/48]
Representative(s)Poulin, Gérard , et al
BREVALEX
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Poulin, Gérard , et al
Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2007/48]Poulin, Gérard , et al
BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date06725090.216.03.2006
[2007/48]
WO2006EP60776
Priority number, dateFR2005005069918.03.2005         Original published format: FR 0550699
[2007/48]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006097502
Date:21.09.2006
Language:FR
[2006/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1858990
Date:28.11.2007
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2006
[2007/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1858990
Date:25.02.2009
Language:FR
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.09.2006
ClassificationInternational:C09D11/00
[2007/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2008/16]
Former [2007/48]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TINTENZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUM KONTINUIERLICHEN ABGELENKTEN TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKEN[2007/48]
English:INK COMPOSITION FOR CONTINUOUS DEFLECTED INK JET PRINTING[2007/48]
French:COMPOSITION D'ENCRE POUR L'IMPRESSION PAR JET CONTINU DEVIE[2007/48]
Entry into regional phase24.08.2007National basic fee paid 
24.08.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
24.08.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.11.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.08.2007Examination requested  [2007/48]
19.10.2007Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
27.11.2007Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
01.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2008Fee for grant paid
11.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]FR2796959  (IMAJE SA [FR]) [Y] 1-31 * page 11, line 31 - page 13, line 5; claims 1-18 *;
 [Y]EP0237788  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 1-31 * page 3, lines 25-51; example 1; claims 1-17 *;
 [A]JPS52148307  ;
 [A]US2002144626  (SCHUT DAVID M [US]) [A] 1-31 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1978, no. 04, Database accession no. 1978-07417A, XP002354623 & JPS52148307 A 19771209 (SAILOR PEN CO LTD) [A] 1-31 * abstract *