Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1871835

EP1871835 - COMPOSITION COMPRISING BENZOXAZINE AND EPOXY RESIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.06.2009
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huntsman Advanced Materials (Switzerland) GmbH
Klybeckstrasse 200
4057 Basel / CH
[2008/01]
Inventor(s)01 / TSUEI, Dave
4f-10, No. 145 Da Tung 2nd Road
Kaohsiung, 80143 / TW
 [2008/01]
Representative(s)Hoffmann, Daniele , et al
Huntsman (Europe) BVBA
Intellectual Property Department
Everslaan 45
3078 Everberg / BE
[N/P]
Former [2008/01]Hoffmann, Daniele , et al
Huntsman (Europe) BVBA Intellectual Property Department Everslaan 45
3078 Everberg / BE
Application number, filing date06725196.721.03.2006
[2008/01]
WO2006EP60909
Priority number, dateEP2005010260401.04.2005         Original published format: EP 05102604
[2008/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006103185
Date:05.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1871835
Date:02.01.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2006
[2008/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1871835
Date:13.08.2008
Language:EN
[2008/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.10.2006
ClassificationInternational:C08L63/02, C08L61/12, C08G61/12, C08G73/06
[2008/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/01]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BENZOXAZIN UND EPOXIDHARZ ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2008/01]
English:COMPOSITION COMPRISING BENZOXAZINE AND EPOXY RESIN[2008/01]
French:COMPOSITION CONTENANT DE LA RESINE DE BENZOXAZINE ET D'EPOXY[2008/01]
Entry into regional phase02.11.2007National basic fee paid 
02.11.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
02.11.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.11.2007Examination requested  [2008/01]
14.03.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2008Fee for grant paid
01.07.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.05.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
CY13.08.2008
CZ13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
EE13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
LT13.08.2008
LV13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
PL13.08.2008
RO13.08.2008
SI13.08.2008
SK13.08.2008
TR13.08.2008
BG13.11.2008
SE13.11.2008
GR14.11.2008
IS13.12.2008
PT13.01.2009
HU14.02.2009
IE21.03.2009
LU21.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
[2011/43]
Former [2011/33]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
CZ13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
EE13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
LT13.08.2008
LV13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
PL13.08.2008
RO13.08.2008
SI13.08.2008
SK13.08.2008
BG13.11.2008
SE13.11.2008
GR14.11.2008
IS13.12.2008
PT13.01.2009
HU14.02.2009
IE21.03.2009
LU21.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2011/22]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
CZ13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
EE13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
LT13.08.2008
LV13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
PL13.08.2008
RO13.08.2008
SI13.08.2008
SK13.08.2008
BG13.11.2008
SE13.11.2008
GR14.11.2008
IS13.12.2008
PT13.01.2009
IE21.03.2009
LU21.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2011/04]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
CZ13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
EE13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
LT13.08.2008
LV13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
PL13.08.2008
RO13.08.2008
SI13.08.2008
SK13.08.2008
BG13.11.2008
SE13.11.2008
GR14.11.2008
IS13.12.2008
PT13.01.2009
IE21.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2010/26]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
CZ13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
EE13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
LT13.08.2008
LV13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
PL13.08.2008
RO13.08.2008
SI13.08.2008
SK13.08.2008
BG13.11.2008
SE13.11.2008
IS13.12.2008
PT13.01.2009
IE21.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2010/14]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
CZ13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
EE13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
LT13.08.2008
LV13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
RO13.08.2008
SI13.08.2008
SK13.08.2008
BG13.11.2008
SE13.11.2008
IS13.12.2008
PT13.01.2009
IE21.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2010/07]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
CZ13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
EE13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
LT13.08.2008
LV13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
RO13.08.2008
SI13.08.2008
SK13.08.2008
BG13.11.2008
IS13.12.2008
PT13.01.2009
IE21.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2010/03]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
CZ13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
EE13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
LT13.08.2008
LV13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
RO13.08.2008
SI13.08.2008
SK13.08.2008
BG13.11.2008
IS13.12.2008
PT13.01.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2009/29]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
CZ13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
LT13.08.2008
LV13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
RO13.08.2008
SI13.08.2008
SK13.08.2008
BG13.11.2008
IS13.12.2008
PT13.01.2009
Former [2009/19]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
LT13.08.2008
LV13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
SI13.08.2008
IS13.12.2008
Former [2009/18]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
LT13.08.2008
LV13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
SI13.08.2008
IS13.12.2008
Former [2009/15]AT13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
LT13.08.2008
LV13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
SI13.08.2008
IS13.12.2008
Former [2009/12]LT13.08.2008
LV13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
IS13.12.2008
Former [2009/10]LT13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
IS13.12.2008
Cited inInternational search[A]US2004261660  (LI WEI HELEN ET AL) [A] 1 * example - *;
 [A]EP1247844  (NIPPON PAINT CO., LTD) [A] 1 * example 3 *;
 [DA]JP2001220455
 [A]  - PODZIMEK S ET AL, "EPOXY RESINS BASED ON BISPHENOL S. II. HPLC ANALYSIS", JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, JOHN WILEY AND SONS INC. NEW YORK, US, (19951128), vol. 58, no. 9, ISSN 0021-8995, pages 1491 - 1494, XP000537850 [A] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/app.1995.070580910
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010412), vol. 2000, no. 25, & JP2001220455 A 20010814 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEM CO INC) [DA] 1 * abstract *