Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1896631

EP1896631 - CONDITIONING OF A LITHO STRIP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.05.2012
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
12.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hydro Aluminium Rolled Products GmbH
Aluminiumstrasse 1
41515 Grevenbroich / DE
[2012/40]
Former [2008/11]For all designated states
Hydro Aluminium Deutschland GmbH
Ettore-Bugatti-Strasse 6-14
51149 Köln / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KERNIG, Bernhard
Höninger Weg 145
50969 Köln / DE
02 / BRINKMAN, Henk Jan
Neckarstrasse 40
53175 Bonn / DE
 [2008/16]
Former [2008/11]01 / KERNIG, Bernhard
Höninger Weg 145
50969 Köln / DE
02 / BRINKMAN, Henk Jan
Am Kreuter 7
53177 Bonn / DE
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/23]Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2008/31]Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2008/11]Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date06725588.505.04.2006
[2008/11]
WO2006EP61358
Priority number, dateEP2005001084719.05.2005         Original published format: EP 05010847
[2008/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006122852
Date:23.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1896631
Date:12.03.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2006
[2008/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1896631
Date:06.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.11.2006
ClassificationInternational:C23G1/12, C23G1/22, C23G5/02, B41N1/08, B41N3/03
[2008/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/11]
TitleGerman:KONDITIONIERUNG EINES LITHOBANDS[2008/11]
English:CONDITIONING OF A LITHO STRIP[2008/11]
French:CONDITIONNEMENT D'UNE PELLICULE DE LITHOGRAPHIE[2008/11]
Entry into regional phase02.11.2007National basic fee paid 
02.11.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
02.11.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.2007Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.11.2007Examination requested  [2008/11]
22.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.2012Fee for grant paid
13.03.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP12157830.6  / EP2460909
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.02.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.03.2013  14.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Novelis Inc.
3560 Lenox Road, Suite 2000
Atlanta, GA 30326 / US
Opponent's representative
Dey, Michael, et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/16]
Opponent(s)01  06.03.2013  14.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Novelis Inc.
3560 Lenox Road, Suite 2000
Atlanta, GA 30326 / US
Opponent's representative
Dey, Michael, et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860820
81635 München / DE
18.04.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.10.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
01.02.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
01.02.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition11.04.2016Appeal received No.  T0852/16
13.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
08.04.2016Appeal received No.  T0852/16
06.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
10.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
22.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
15.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
17.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.04.2006
AT06.06.2012
BE06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
DK06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
IT06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
MC06.06.2012
NL06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
BG06.09.2012
IS06.10.2012
PT08.10.2012
IE05.04.2013
LU05.04.2013
CH30.04.2013
FR30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2014/20]AT06.06.2012
BE06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
DK06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
IT06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
MC06.06.2012
NL06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
BG06.09.2012
IS06.10.2012
PT08.10.2012
IE05.04.2013
CH30.04.2013
FR30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
Former [2014/11]AT06.06.2012
BE06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
DK06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
IT06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
MC06.06.2012
NL06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
BG06.09.2012
IS06.10.2012
PT08.10.2012
CH30.04.2013
FR30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
Former [2014/08]AT06.06.2012
BE06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
DK06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
IT06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
MC06.06.2012
NL06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
BG06.09.2012
IS06.10.2012
PT08.10.2012
CH30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
Former [2014/01]AT06.06.2012
BE06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
DK06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
IT06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
MC06.06.2012
NL06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
BG06.09.2012
IS06.10.2012
PT08.10.2012
Former [2013/34]AT06.06.2012
BE06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
DK06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
IT06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
NL06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
BG06.09.2012
IS06.10.2012
PT08.10.2012
Former [2013/13]AT06.06.2012
BE06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
IT06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
NL06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
IS06.10.2012
PT08.10.2012
Former [2013/11]AT06.06.2012
BE06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
IT06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
NL06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
IS06.10.2012
Former [2013/10]AT06.06.2012
BE06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
NL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
IS06.10.2012
Former [2013/09]AT06.06.2012
BE06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
NL06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
Former [2013/08]AT06.06.2012
BE06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
NL06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
Former [2013/07]AT06.06.2012
BE06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
Former [2012/51]CY06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
Former [2012/50]CY06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
Former [2012/49]CY06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
Former [2012/48]FI06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
Former [2012/47]LT06.06.2012
Cited inInternational search[X]GB647782  (HERBERT MANFRED FREUD) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,10 * page 1, lines 21,22,62-69,78-90 * * page 2, lines 31-57 *;
 [X]US3699013  (MIYATA AKIRA, et al) [X] 1,2,7,9,10 * column 2, lines 34-55 * * column 3, lines 1-16 *;
 [X]JPS62177191  ;
 [X]US4547274  (OHASHI AZUSA [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-7,9,10 * column 2, lines 48-68 *;
 [X]US4634656  (OHASHI AZUSA [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-7,9,10 * column 3, lines 3-23 *;
 [X]DD244363  (STEREMAT VEB [DD]) [X] 1,2,7,9,10 * page 2 *;
 [X]AT386614B  (WILLMITZER HERBERT [AT]) [X] 1,2,5,6,9 * page 2, line 51 - page 3, line 1 * * page 3, lines 7-17,48-50 * * page 4, lines 14-30 *;
 [XY]DE3600415  (CANNING GMBH W [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,9 * abstract * * column 2, lines 62-64 * * column 3, lines 19-41 * * column 4, paragraphs 16-51 * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 23 * [Y] 3;
 [XY]US6447982  (VON ASTEN WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [X] 1,7-10,12 * column 2, lines 42-50 * * column 3, paragraphs 51-61 * * column 5, paragraphs 53-57 * * claim 9 * [Y] 3,5,8,11,12;
 [XY]GB655737  (JOHNSON MATTHEY CO LTD) [X] 1,2,9 * page 1, lines 57-62,79-81 * [Y] 3;
 [YD]US5997721  (LIMBACH PETER KARL FERDINAND [DE], et al) [YD] 5,8,11,12 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 21 * * column 3, line 30 *;
 [YD]DE4317815  (VAW VER ALUMINIUM WERKE AG [DE]) [YD] 3 * column 3, lines 15-31 * * column 4, lines 33-40 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880127), vol. 012, no. 028, Database accession no. (C - 471), & JP62177191 A 19870804 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO LTD) [X] 1,6,7,9,10 * abstract *
by applicantUS5997721
 DE4317815
 US4547274