Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1877486

EP1877486 - ACRYLIC BLENDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2008/03]ACRYLIC BLENDS
[2014/45]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.10.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
11.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lucite International UK Limited
Cumberland House
15-17 Cumberland Place
Southampton
Hampshire SO15 2BG / GB
[2014/44]
Former [2008/03]For all designated states
Lucite International UK Limited
Queens Gate, 15-17 Queens Terrace
Southampton, Hampshire SO14 3BP / GB
Inventor(s)01 / FRASER, Ian
17 St. Nicholas Gardens
Yarm
North Yorkshire TS15 9SJ / GB
02 / ROBINSON, Ian
11 Dulverton Way
Guisborough
North Yorkshire TS14 7B / GB
 [2014/45]
Former [2008/03]01 / FRASER, Ian
17 St. Nicholas Gardens Yarm
North Yorkshire TS15 9SJ / GB
02 / ROBINSON, Ian
11 Dulverton Way Guisborough
North Yorkshire TS14 7B / GB
Representative(s)Appleyard Lees IP LLP
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Walsh, David Patrick
Appleyard Lees
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
Former [2008/03]Walsh, David Patrick
Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
Application number, filing date06726789.818.04.2006
[2014/45]
WO2006GB01393
Priority number, dateGB2005000825525.04.2005         Original published format: GB 0508255
[2008/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006114576
Date:02.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1877486
Date:16.01.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2006
[2008/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1877486
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.11.2006
ClassificationInternational:C08L33/04
[2008/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/03]
TitleGerman:ACRYLMISCHUNG[2014/45]
English:ACRYLIC BLENDS[2014/45]
French:MELANGES ACRYLIQUES[2014/45]
Former [2008/03]ACRYLMISCHUNG
Former [2008/03]ACRYLIC BLENDS
Former [2008/03]MELANGES ACRYLIQUES
Entry into regional phase23.10.2007National basic fee paid 
23.10.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
23.10.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.02.2007Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.10.2007Examination requested  [2008/03]
17.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.11.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
25.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.08.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.09.2014Fee for grant paid
22.09.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.09.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP10154164.7  / EP2192154
EP10154167.0  / EP2192155
EP10185812.4  / EP2277946
EP14184653.5  / EP2924073
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.04.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  31.07.2015  05.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA FRANCE
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
 [2015/37]
11.09.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.01.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.04.2017Date of oral proceedings
25.04.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.04.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition26.06.2017Appeal received No.  T1451/17
04.09.2017Statement of grounds filed
09.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
25.01.2010Request for further processing filed
25.01.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
07.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
19.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
19.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
28.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBG05.11.2014
CY05.11.2014
LT05.11.2014
LV05.11.2014
MC05.11.2014
RO05.11.2014
SK05.11.2014
IS05.03.2015
AT18.04.2017
CZ18.04.2017
IE18.04.2017
LU18.04.2017
HU19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
BE30.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
DK30.04.2017
EE30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
PT18.10.2017
GR03.11.2017
[2018/23]
Former [2018/21]BG05.11.2014
CY05.11.2014
LT05.11.2014
LV05.11.2014
MC05.11.2014
RO05.11.2014
SK05.11.2014
IS05.03.2015
AT18.04.2017
CZ18.04.2017
LU18.04.2017
HU19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
DK30.04.2017
EE30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
PT18.10.2017
GR03.11.2017
Former [2018/12]BG05.11.2014
CY05.11.2014
LT05.11.2014
LV05.11.2014
MC05.11.2014
RO05.11.2014
SK05.11.2014
IS05.03.2015
AT18.04.2017
CZ18.04.2017
LU18.04.2017
HU19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
EE30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
PT18.10.2017
GR03.11.2017
Former [2018/10]BG05.11.2014
CY05.11.2014
LT05.11.2014
LV05.11.2014
MC05.11.2014
RO05.11.2014
SK05.11.2014
IS05.03.2015
AT18.04.2017
CZ18.04.2017
HU19.04.2017
EE30.04.2017
Former [2018/09]BG05.11.2014
CY05.11.2014
LT05.11.2014
LV05.11.2014
MC05.11.2014
RO05.11.2014
SK05.11.2014
IS05.03.2015
HU19.04.2017
EE30.04.2017
Former [2017/39]BG05.11.2014
CY05.11.2014
LT05.11.2014
LV05.11.2014
MC05.11.2014
RO05.11.2014
SK05.11.2014
IS05.03.2015
Former [2016/01]CY05.11.2014
LT05.11.2014
LV05.11.2014
MC05.11.2014
RO05.11.2014
SK05.11.2014
IS05.03.2015
Former [2015/37]CY05.11.2014
LT05.11.2014
LV05.11.2014
RO05.11.2014
SK05.11.2014
IS05.03.2015
Former [2015/36]CY05.11.2014
LT05.11.2014
LV05.11.2014
RO05.11.2014
IS05.03.2015
Former [2015/26]CY05.11.2014
LT05.11.2014
LV05.11.2014
IS05.03.2015
Former [2015/24]LT05.11.2014
LV05.11.2014
IS05.03.2015
Former [2015/23]LT05.11.2014
IS05.03.2015
Former [2015/20]LT05.11.2014
Cited inInternational search[DX]WO8605503  (AVERY INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [DX] 1-31 * example -; claim - *;
 [DX]DE19927769  (ROEHM GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1-31 * example -; claim - * * page 3, lines 26-41 * * page 3, lines 55-61 *;
 [X]EP1013713  (H B FULLER COATINGS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-31 * claims 1-4 * * examples 1,2 * * paragraphs [0022] , [0023] *
by applicantEP0588147
 WO8605503
 JPS568476
 JPH07174133
 JPH07174189
 JPS5423539
 EP0144140
 EP1189987
 US6388017
 US5306775
 US5319029
 US5380803
 FR2749591
 WO9637531
    - HWANG; CHO, "Effect of chain entanglement on the bulk strength of glass polymer", DEPARTMENT OF CHEMICAL ENGINEERING
    - C RAUWENDAAL, Polymer Extrusion, HANSER PUBLISHERS, (1994), page 322
    - "Melt Rheology and its role in plastics processing", JM DEELY; KF WISSBRUN, Theory and Applications, VAN NOSTRAN REINHOLD, (1990), page 480
    - LA UTRAKI, Polymer Alloys and Blends, HANSER PUBLISHERS, (1990), page 134
    - FN COGSWELL, Polymer Melt Rheology Appendix 9, (1997), page 156
    - RG LARSON ET AL., JOURNAL OF RHEOLOGY, (2003), vol. 47, page 809
    - S WU, "Chain Structure and entanglements", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE:PT B POLYMER PHYSICS, (1989), vol. 27, page 723