Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1879567

EP1879567 - AMINO ACID DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.09.2013
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.10.2013  [2013/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pfizer Limited
Ramsgate Road
Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB
[2008/04]
Inventor(s)01 / GRAHAM, Shelley, Rene
Pfizer Global Research and Development Ann Arbor Laboratories
2800 Plymouth Road Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US
02 / MANTELL, Simon, John
Pfizer Global Research and Development Ramsgate Road
Sandwich Kent CT 13 9NJ / GB
03 / RAWSON, David, James
Pfizer Global Research and Development Ramsgate Road, Sandwich
Kent CT13 9NJ / GB
04 / SCHWARZ, Jacob, Bradley
Pfizer Global Research and Development Ann Arbor Laboratories
2800 Plymouth Road Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US
 [2008/04]
Representative(s)Pfizer
European Patent Department
23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue
75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR
[2012/32]
Former [2012/09]Kendrick, David Alan , et al
Pfizer
European Patent Department
23-25, avenue du Docteur Lannelongue
75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR
Former [2008/04]Hodge, Emma Jane
Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road
Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB
Application number, filing date06727559.419.04.2006
[2008/04]
WO2006IB01086
Priority number, dateUS20050676025P28.04.2005         Original published format: US 676025 P
[2008/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006114707
Date:02.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1879567
Date:23.01.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2006
[2008/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.11.2006
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/198, A61P25/00, C07C229/08, C07C229/28
[2008/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/04]
Extension statesAL28.11.2007
BA28.11.2007
HR28.11.2007
MK28.11.2007
YU28.11.2007
TitleGerman:AMINOSÄUREDERIVATE[2008/04]
English:AMINO ACID DERIVATIVES[2008/04]
French:DERIVES D'ACIDES AMINES[2008/04]
Entry into regional phase28.11.2007National basic fee paid 
28.11.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
28.11.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.05.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.11.2007Examination requested  [2008/04]
17.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M47)
16.12.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.04.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/42]
23.05.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2013/42]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.08.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
04.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
03.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201308   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2005016331  (MOCHIDA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD; AKADA, YASUSHIGE; OGIHARA, TAKUO; OKA) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 18 - page 22 *;
 [A]WO0230871  (GRUENENTHAL GMBH; CHIZH, BORIS; PUETZ, CLAUDIA, KATHARINA; HAURAND, MI) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *
 [X]  - SIVAGNANAM, G. ET AL, "Alphamethyldopa analgesia : its possible mechanism of action", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1985:571992, URL: STN, XP002391820 [X] 1 * abstract *
by applicant   - MILLAN, PROG. NEUROBIOL., (1999), vol. 57, pages 1 - 164
    - TETRAHEDRON, (2004), vol. 60, pages 5919 - 5930
    - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1998), vol. 39, pages 8775 - 8778