EP2004548 - SYNTHESIS OF NANOPARTICLES OF LITHIUM METAL PHOSPHATE POSITIVE MATERIAL FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | ||
For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | ||
For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | |||
Former [2011/02] | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies Inc. 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | ||
For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | |||
Former [2010/26] | For all designated states HPL (High Power Lithium) AG Baarerstrasse 86 6302 Zug / CH | ||
For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | |||
Former [2008/52] | For all designated states High Power Lithium S.A. PSE-B EPFL 1015 Lausanne / CH | ||
For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EXNAR, Ivan Wybäumetstrasse 16 CH-4452 Itingen / CH | 02 /
DREZEN, Thierry Ch. Des Petits-esserts 7 CH-1053 Cugy / CH | [2008/52] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2010/03] | Raynor, John Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2009/08] | Grosfillier, Philippe Andre Roland S.A. P.O. Box 1255 1001 Lausanne / CH | ||
Former [2008/52] | Grosfillier, Philippe Andre Roland S.A. Avenue Tissot 15 P.O. Box 1255 1001 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 06727848.1 | 06.04.2006 | [2008/52] | WO2006IB51061 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007113624 | Date: | 11.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2004548 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C01B25/45, H01M4/58 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
H01M4/5825 (EP,US);
H01M4/485 (KR);
C01B25/45 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/136 (EP,US);
H01M4/625 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/52] | Title | German: | SYNTHESE VON NANOPARTIKELN VON LITHIUMMETALLPHOSPHAT-POSITIVMATERIAL FÜR LITHIUM-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIEN | [2008/52] | English: | SYNTHESIS OF NANOPARTICLES OF LITHIUM METAL PHOSPHATE POSITIVE MATERIAL FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY | [2008/52] | French: | SYNTHESE DE NANOPARTICULES DE MATERIAU POSITIF DE PHOSPHATE DE METAL DE LITHIUM POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM | [2008/52] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 06.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/15] | 29.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA] - YANG JINGSI ET AL, "Nonaqueous sol-gel synthesis of high-performance LiFePO4", ELECTROCHEM SOLID STATE LETTERS; ELECTROCHEMICAL AND SOLID-STATE LETTERS 2004, (2004), vol. 7, no. 12, pages A515 - A518, XP002409825 [X] 14-18 * the whole document * [A] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.1819893 | [XA] - TAJIMI S ET AL, "Enhanced electrochemical performance of LiFePO4 prepared by hydrothermal reaction", SOLID STATE IONICS, DIFFUSION & REACTIONS ELSEVIER NETHERLANDS, (20041130), vol. 175, no. 1-4, ISSN 0167-2738, pages 287 - 290, XP002409883 [X] 14-18 * the whole document * [A] 1 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ssi.2003.12.033 | [XA] - PARK K S ET AL, "Synthesis of LiFePO4 by co-precipitation and microwave heating", ELECTROCHEMISTRY COMMUNICATIONS ELSEVIER SWITZERLAND, (200310), vol. 5, no. 10, ISSN 1388-2481, pages 839 - 842, XP002409827 [X] 14-18 * the whole document * [A] 1 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.elecom.2003.08.005 | [A] - FELDMANN, C. ET AL, "Preparation of sub-micrometer LnPO4 particles (Ln = La, Ce)", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE , 37(15), 3251-3254 CODEN: JMTSAS; ISSN: 0022-2461, (2002), XP002409826 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1016131016637 | [A] - KIM D H ET AL, "Polyol-mediated synthesis of Li4Ti5O12 nanoparticle and its electrochemical properties", ELECTROCHEM. COMMUN.; ELECTROCHEMISTRY COMMUNICATIONS DECEMBER 2005, (200512), vol. 7, no. 12, pages 1340 - 1344, XP002409828 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.elecom.2005.09.027 | [A] - D. LARCHER AND R. PATRICE, "Preparation of Metallic Powders and Alloys in Polyol Media: A Thermodynamic Approach", JOURANL OF SOLID STATE CHEMISTRY, (2000), vol. 154, pages 405 - 411, XP002409831 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jssc.2000.8802 | [PX] - DONG-HAN KIM ET AL, "Synthesis of LiFePO4 nanoparticles in polyol medium and their electrochemical properties", ELECTROCHEMICAL AND SOLID-STATE LETTERS ELECTROCHEM. SOC USA, (200609), vol. 9, no. 9, ISSN 1099-0062, pages A439 - A442, XP002409829 [PX] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.2218308 | [PX] - T.R. KIM, D.H. KIM AND J. KIM, "Electrochemichal and structural properties of lithium manganese phosphate prepared using polyol process", ABSTRACT 209TH ECS MEETING, DENVER, COLORADO, MAY 7-12,2006, (200605), XP002409830 [PX] 1-18 * the whole document * | Examination | - ARNOLD G ET AL, "Fine-particle lithium iron phosphate LiFePO"4 synthesized by a new low-cost aqueous precipitation technique", JOURNAL OF POWER SOU, ELSEVIER SA, CH, (20030601), vol. 119-121, doi:10.1016/S0378-7753(03)00241-6, ISSN 0378-7753, pages 247 - 251, XP004430175 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-7753(03)00241-6 |