blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1882219 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1882219



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 69
02.12.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
02.02.2010 Closing of application Search / examination 2
22.10.2009 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
25.09.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
21.09.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.09.2009 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
06.05.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
06.05.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.04.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.04.2008 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 7
07.04.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
04.01.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
28.12.2007 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
28.11.2007 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
03.10.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission for entry into the European phase Search / examination 1
03.10.2007 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
21.09.2007 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
29.05.2007 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
15.03.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
15.03.2007 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
16.11.2006 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 25