blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1882219
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2008215908Global Dossier 04.09.2008A1
Priority number Date
EP05103885 10.05.2005
WO2006IB51389 03.05.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2009508362Global Dossier 26.02.2009A
Priority number Date
EP05103885 10.05.2005
WO2006IB51389 03.05.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1882219Global Dossier 30.01.2008A2
Priority number Date
EP05103885 10.05.2005
EP06728118 03.05.2006
WO2006IB51389 03.05.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2006120612Global Dossier 15.03.2007A3
WO2006120612 16.11.2006A2
Priority number Date
EP05103885 10.05.2005
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN101171563 30.04.2008A
Priority number Date
EP05103885 10.05.2005