Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1882219

EP1882219 - SLEEP WATCHDOG CIRCUIT FOR ASYNCHRONOUS DIGITAL CIRCUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.02.2010
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.02.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.03.2010  [2010/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NXP B.V.
High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
[2008/05]
Inventor(s)01 / DE HAAS, Clemens
c/o Philips Intellectual Property & Standards Gmbh Weisshausstr. 2
52066 Aachen / DE
02 / KLOSTERS, Frank
c/o Philips Intellectual Property & Standards Gmbh Weisshausstr. 2
52066 Aachen / DE
 [2008/05]
Representative(s)Schouten, Marcus Maria , et al
NXP B.V.
Intellectual Property & Licensing
High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2009/44]Schouten, Marcus Maria , et al
NXP B.V. IP & L Department High Tech Campus 32
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2008/33]van der Veer, Johannis Leendert , et al
NXP Semiconductors B.V. IP&L Department High Tech Campus 32
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2008/22]van der Veer, Johannis Leendert , et al
NXP Semiconductors B.V. IP Department High Tech Campus 32
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2008/05]Schneider, Michael
NXP Semiconductors IP Department Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12
1100 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date06728118.803.05.2006
[2008/05]
WO2006IB51389
Priority number, dateEP2005010388510.05.2005         Original published format: EP 05103885
[2008/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006120612
Date:16.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/46]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1882219
Date:30.01.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2006
[2008/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.03.2007
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/32, G06F1/08
[2008/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/05]
Extension statesAL10.12.2007
BA10.12.2007
HR10.12.2007
MK10.12.2007
YU10.12.2007
TitleGerman:SLEEP-WATCHDOG-SCHALTUNG FÜR ASYNCHRONE DIGITALE SCHALTUNGEN[2008/05]
English:SLEEP WATCHDOG CIRCUIT FOR ASYNCHRONOUS DIGITAL CIRCUITS[2008/05]
French:CIRCUIT DE SURVEILLANCE A MODE VEILLE POUR CIRCUITS NUMERIQUES ASYNCHRONES[2008/05]
Entry into regional phase10.12.2007National basic fee paid 
10.12.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.12.2007Examination requested  [2008/05]
06.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.09.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/10]
22.10.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
02.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0666527  (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [X] 1-5,8-11,13-17 * column 2, line 13 - column 7, line 5; figure 1 *;
 [X]US6816022  (HEJDEMAN CARL [GB], et al) [X] 1-5,8-11,13-17 * column 1, line 20 - column 5, line 15; figure 2 *;
 [X]WO2004066526  (IHP GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,8-11,13-17 * page 4, line 20 - page 8, line 12 * * page 11, line 19 - page 23, line 33; figures 1-10 *