Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1853518

EP1853518 - FINE PARTICULATE TITANIUM DIOXIDE, AND PRODUCTION PROCESS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2018Revocation of patentpublished on 25.04.2018  [2018/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHOWA DENKO K.K.
13-9, Shibadaimon 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8518 / JP
[2012/22]
Former [2007/46]For all designated states
SHOWA DENKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
13-9, Shibadaimon 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8518 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KAYAMA, Susumu
c/o SHOWA TITANIUM CO. LTD., 3-1, Nishinomiyamachi
Toyama-shi, Toyama, 9318577 / JP
02 / KOGOI, Hisao
c/o SHOWA TITANIUM CO. LTD., 3-1, Nishinomiyamachi
Toyama-shi, Toyama, 9318577 / JP
 [2007/46]
Representative(s)Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
[2012/22]
Former [2009/51]Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
Former [2007/46]Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date06728635.128.02.2006
[2007/46]
WO2006JP304205
Priority number, dateJP2005005466628.02.2005         Original published format: JP 2005054666
[2007/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006098175
Date:21.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1853518
Date:14.11.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2006
[2007/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1853518
Date:30.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.09.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:C01G23/07, B01J35/02
[2007/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/46]
TitleGerman:FEINTEILIGES TITANDIOXID SOWIE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAFÜR[2007/46]
English:FINE PARTICULATE TITANIUM DIOXIDE, AND PRODUCTION PROCESS AND USES THEREOF[2007/46]
French:DIOXYDE DE TITANE EN PARTICULES FINES, SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET SES UTILISATIONS[2007/46]
Entry into regional phase14.09.2007National basic fee paid 
14.09.2007Search fee paid 
14.09.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
14.09.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.09.2007Examination requested  [2007/46]
01.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.03.2012Fee for grant paid
30.03.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.03.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.02.2013  03.04.2013  ADMISSIBLE
KRONOS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Postfach 10 07 20
D-51307 Leverkusen / DE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 02  27.02.2013  04.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Sachtleben Chemie GmbH
Dr. Rudolf Sachtleben Strasse 4
47198 Duisburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Nobbe, Matthias
Demski & Nobbe
Patentanwälte
Mülheimer Strasse 210
47057 Duisburg / DE
 [2018/03]
Former [2013/14]
Opponent(s)01  27.02.2013   
KRONOS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Postfach 10 07 20
D-51307 Leverkusen / DE
 02  27.02.2013   
Sachtleben Chemie GmbH
Dr. Rudolf Sachtleben Strasse 4
47198 Duisburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Nobbe, Matthias
Demski & Nobbe
Patentanwälte
Reichspräsidentenstraße 21-25
45470 Mülheim a.d. Ruhr / DE
09.04.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.08.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
02.12.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.12.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
15.01.2018Legal effect of revocation of patent [2018/17]
Appeal following opposition26.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0275/16
11.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
15.01.2018Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
15.01.2018Date of oral proceedings
19.01.2018Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
19.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
24.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
22.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.02.2006
AT30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
IT30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
PL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
TR30.05.2012
BG30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
ES10.09.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
CH28.02.2013
GB28.02.2013
IE28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
LU28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
IT30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
PL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
TR30.05.2012
BG30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
ES10.09.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
CH28.02.2013
GB28.02.2013
IE28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2014/09]AT30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
IT30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
PL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
BG30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
ES10.09.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
CH28.02.2013
GB28.02.2013
IE28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2014/07]AT30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
IT30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
PL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
BG30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
ES10.09.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
CH28.02.2013
IE28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2013/48]AT30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
IT30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
PL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
BG30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
ES10.09.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2013/42]AT30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
IT30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
PL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
BG30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
ES10.09.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
MC28.02.2013
Former [2013/34]AT30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
IT30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
PL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
BG30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
ES10.09.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
Former [2013/13]AT30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
IT30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
PL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
Former [2013/11]AT30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
IT30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
PL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2013/10]AT30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2013/09]AT30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2013/08]AT30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2013/07]AT30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2012/51]CY30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2012/50]CY30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2012/49]CY30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2012/48]LT30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
Former [2012/47]LT30.05.2012
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed