Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1853518 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1853518



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1510
19.03.2018 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
06.03.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
06.03.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
05.03.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.03.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.03.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
02.03.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.03.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
01.03.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
01.03.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
01.03.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 14
01.03.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
01.03.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
01.03.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
19.01.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
19.01.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
19.01.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
19.01.2018 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
20.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
19.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
19.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
15.12.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
14.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
14.12.2017 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
14.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
14.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.12.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 14
14.12.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
14.12.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
14.12.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
14.12.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
13.12.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
13.12.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
08.12.2017 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 2
15.11.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.11.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.11.2017 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 3
10.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.11.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 27
10.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
10.11.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
08.11.2017 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
13.10.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.10.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.10.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.10.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
10.10.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
10.10.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
10.10.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
10.10.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
10.10.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
05.10.2017 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
08.08.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.08.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.08.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.08.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
02.08.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.08.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.08.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
01.08.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
01.08.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
01.08.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
01.08.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
01.08.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
26.07.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
07.07.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.07.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
04.07.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
19.08.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.08.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.08.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.08.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.08.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 10
11.08.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.08.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.08.2016 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 2
06.08.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 7
05.08.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 8
01.08.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
15.04.2016 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
15.04.2016 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
11.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
11.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
11.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
11.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
11.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
11.04.2016 Claims Appeal 4
11.04.2016 Claims Appeal 3
11.04.2016 Claims Appeal 3
11.04.2016 Claims Appeal 3
11.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
11.04.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 23
16.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.02.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
11.02.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
11.02.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
11.02.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
11.02.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
11.02.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
08.02.2016 Request concerning representative opponent Appeal 1
26.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
26.01.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
26.01.2016 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
07.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
03.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.12.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.12.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.12.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.12.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
02.12.2015 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
02.12.2015 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
02.12.2015 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 12
02.12.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
02.12.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
02.12.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
02.12.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
02.12.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
02.12.2015 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.12.2015 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 7
02.12.2015 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 23
23.10.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
27.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
27.08.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
20.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
20.08.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 12
20.08.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
20.08.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
20.08.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
20.08.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
20.08.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
20.08.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
20.08.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.08.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.08.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.08.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
20.08.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 7
20.08.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.08.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
20.08.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.08.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.08.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.08.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.08.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
20.08.2015 Claims Opposition 5
20.08.2015 Claims Opposition 6
20.08.2015 Claims Opposition 5
20.08.2015 Claims Opposition 6
20.08.2015 Claims Opposition 4
20.08.2015 Claims Opposition 6
20.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
20.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
20.08.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
20.08.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.08.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 10
20.08.2015 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.08.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 11
27.03.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
03.03.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.03.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.03.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.02.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.02.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.02.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.02.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.02.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.02.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
23.02.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
23.02.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
23.02.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.02.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.04.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
26.04.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.01.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.09.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.09.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.08.2013 Claims Opposition 2
19.08.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.08.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
09.04.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
09.04.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
09.04.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
06.03.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
04.03.2013 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
04.03.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.03.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.03.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.03.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
04.03.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.03.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.03.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.03.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.03.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.03.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.03.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
04.03.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
04.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
04.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 41
04.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
04.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 44
04.03.2013 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
27.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
27.02.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 16
27.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 27
27.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 45
27.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
27.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 33
27.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
27.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
27.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 26
27.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 42
27.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 44
27.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
27.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
27.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 85
27.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 105
27.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
27.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 41
27.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
27.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
27.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
07.05.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
20.02.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
20.02.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
20.02.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
01.12.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
01.12.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
01.12.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
01.12.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 41
28.07.2011 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
28.07.2011 Translation of priority document Search / examination 43
19.07.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
19.07.2011 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 4
19.07.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
19.07.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
07.07.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.03.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
07.03.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.02.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.02.2011 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 1
12.11.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
17.10.2007 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
10.10.2007 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
26.09.2007 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
04.06.2007 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
01.06.2007 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
09.10.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 23
09.10.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 24
21.09.2006 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
21.09.2006 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 42