Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1886635

EP1886635 - STENT DEPLOYMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.11.2013
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.12.2013  [2013/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP.
43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
[2008/07]
Inventor(s)01 / SATO, Masatoshi, Olympus Medical Systems Corp.
43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome
Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
 [2012/37]
Former [2008/07]01 / SATO, Masatoshi, OLYMPUS IP SERVICES CO., LTD.
2-3 Kuboyama-cho
Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 1928512 / JP
Representative(s)von Hellfeld, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/02]von Hellfeld, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Former [2009/51]von Hellfeld, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Former [2008/07]von Hellfeld, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date06732435.027.04.2006
[2008/07]
WO2006JP308884
Priority number, dateJP2005016480503.06.2005         Original published format: JP 2005164805
[2008/07]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006129441
Date:07.12.2006
Language:JA
[2006/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1886635
Date:13.02.2008
Language:EN
[2008/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1886635
Date:09.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP07.12.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/82, A61B17/34
[2012/25]
Former International [2009/08]A61F2/82, A61B17/34, A61M25/06, A61B18/14, A61F2/94
Former International [2008/18]A61F2/82, A61B17/34
Former International [2008/07]A61B17/34
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE [2008/27]
Former [2008/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:STENTABLAGEVORRICHTUNG[2008/07]
English:STENT DEPLOYMENT DEVICE[2008/07]
French:APPAREIL DE DÉPLOIEMENT DE STENT[2008/07]
Entry into regional phase27.11.2007Translation filed 
27.11.2007National basic fee paid 
27.11.2007Search fee paid 
27.11.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
27.11.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.11.2007Examination requested  [2008/07]
04.01.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
13.02.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
27.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.2012Date of oral proceedings
08.08.2012Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
14.08.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.11.2012Fee for grant paid
29.11.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.08.2010
Opposition(s)10.10.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
18.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
19.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
19.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US2005085892  (GOTO HIROAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7-13 * paragraphs [0076] , [0136] , [0137] , [0146] - [0152]; figures 8A-8C,9-11 *;
 [XA]US2005085891  (GOTO HIROAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,10 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0058]; figure - * [A] 5,6;
 [X]US5690643  (WIJAY BANDULA [US]) [X] 1,2,8 * column 2, line 15 - line 55; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]WO2004110521  (BARD INC C R [US]) [X] 1,3,9 * paragraph [0029]; figures 11A,11B *
ExaminationWO0232496
 JP2000014769