Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1846054

EP1846054 - DEFORMING SURFACE OF DRUG ELUTING COATING TO ALTER DRUG RELASE PROFILE OF A MEDICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.07.2014
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boston Scientific Limited
The Corporate Center Bush Hill Bay Street
St. Michael / BB
[2007/43]
Inventor(s)01 / TIMM, Mary
166 Hartwell Avenue
Littleton, Massachusetts 01460 / US
 [2007/43]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/13]Lang, Johannes , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Former [2008/33]Altenburg, Udo
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Former [2007/43]Altenburg, Udo
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date06734383.003.02.2006
[2007/43]
WO2006US04021
Priority number, dateUS2005005021703.02.2005         Original published format: US 50217
[2007/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006084218
Date:10.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1846054
Date:24.10.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006
[2007/43]
Search report(s)International search reportEP30.11.2006
ClassificationInternational:A61L27/08
[2007/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/43]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DEFORMIERUNG DER OBERFLÄCHE EINER WIRKSTOFFFREISETZENDEN BESCHICHTUNG ZUR ÄNDERUNG DES WIRKSTOFFFREISETZUNGSPROFILS EINER MEDIZINISCHEN VORRICHTUNG[2007/43]
English:DEFORMING SURFACE OF DRUG ELUTING COATING TO ALTER DRUG RELASE PROFILE OF A MEDICAL DEVICE[2007/43]
French:DEFORMATION DE LA SURFACE D'UN REVETEMENT D'ELUTION DE MEDICAMENT POUR MODIFIER LE PROFIL DE LIBERATION DE MEDICAMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF MEDICAL[2007/43]
Entry into regional phase19.07.2007National basic fee paid 
19.07.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
19.07.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.07.2007Examination requested  [2007/43]
18.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.03.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/34]
15.04.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/34]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.08.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
09.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
08.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
08.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
07.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
12.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201409   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[E]WO2006020660
 [X]GB1336669
 [X]US2003149479
 [Y]US6280411
 [A]US2001047203