EP1846008 - METHOD FOR THE MITIGATION OF SYMPTOMS OF CONTACT LENS RELATED DRY EYE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson and Johnson Vision Care, Inc. 7500 Centurion Parkway, Suite 100 Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US | [2007/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LORENZ, Kathrine, Osborn 3894 Criswell Drive Columbus, OH 43220 / US | 02 /
STEFFEN, Robert, B. 1158 Blue Heron Lane West Jacksonville Beach, FL 32250 / US | 03 /
MCCABE, Kevin, P. 1053 Waterfall Drive Jacksonville, FL 32225 / US | 04 /
COPPER, Lenora, C. 12306 Peach Orchard Drive Jacksonville, FL 32223 / US | [2007/43] | Representative(s) | Kirsch, Susan Edith, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2014/12] |
Former [2013/17] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2007/43] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06734416.8 | 06.02.2006 | [2007/43] | WO2006US04097 | Priority number, date | US20050650656P | 07.02.2005 Original published format: US 650656 P | [2007/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006086303 | Date: | 17.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1846008 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1846008 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/74, A61K47/30, G02C7/04, G02B1/04, C08G77/04 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
G02B1/043 (EP);
A61K47/30 (KR);
A61K31/74 (EP);
C08G77/04 (KR);
G02B1/04 (KR);
G02C7/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [2008/20] |
Former [2007/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ABSCHWÄCHUNG DER SYMPTOME DES DURCH KONTAKTLINSEN VERURSACHTEN TROCKENEN AUGES | [2007/43] | English: | METHOD FOR THE MITIGATION OF SYMPTOMS OF CONTACT LENS RELATED DRY EYE | [2007/43] | French: | PROCEDE D'ATTENUATION DES SYMPTOMES DE L'OEIL SEC LIES AU PORT DE LENTILLES DE CONTACT | [2007/43] | Entry into regional phase | 15.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 22.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DXY]US2003125498 (MCCABE KEVIN P [US], et al) [DX] 1-21 * page 1, paragraphs 9,11,12 * * page 2, paragraphs 22,25 * * page 3, paragraph 29 - page 6, paragraph 63 * * example 1 * [Y] 1-21; | [X]WO0170837 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON VISION CARE [US]) [X] 10-21 * page 2, lines 18-30 * * page 3, line 12 - page 9, line 4; examples 2-14 *; | [X]WO9720852 (BAUSCH & LOMB [US]) [X] 10-21 * page 1, lines 11-13 * * page 4, line 1 - page 20, line 2 *; | [X]EP0940693 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON VISION PROD [US]) [X] 10-21 * page 2, paragraphs 1,11-14 * * page 5, paragraphs 19,21,22; examples 2-16 *; | [X]US6218503 (LAI YU-CHIN [US], et al) [X] 10-21 * column 1, lines 5-25 * * column 2, lines 26-40 *; | [X] - "Premarket Notification VISTAKON (Senofilcon A) Contact Lens; Summary of Safety and Effectiveness", (20041124), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20041124151511/http://www.fda.gov/cdrh/pdf4/k042275.pdf, (20060623), XP002387698 [X] 1-21 * the whole document * | [Y] - KUNZLER J F, "Silicone Hydrogels for Contact Lens Application", TRENDS IN POLYMER SCIENCE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (199602), vol. 4, no. 2, ISSN 0966-4793, pages 52 - 59, XP004049314 [Y] 1-21 * abstract * | Examination | US6364482 |