Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1848749

EP1848749 - Contact drug delivery system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2007/44]CONTACT DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM
[2011/49]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.09.2018
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.09.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.05.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2018(Expected) grantpublished on 31.10.2018  [2018/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Auburn University
215 East Thach Avenue
Auburn, AL 36830 / US
[2007/44]
Inventor(s)01 / BYRNE, Mark, E.
3680 Hawks Landing
Auburn, AL 36830 / US
02 / VENKATESM, Siddarth
257 South Gay Street, Apt. A217
Auburn, Alabama 36830 / US
 [2007/44]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2018/44]
Former [2014/28]Alcock, David
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2007/44]DeVile, Jonathan Mark
D Young & Co 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date06734512.403.02.2006
[2007/44]
WO2006US04306
Priority number, dateUS20050650450P04.02.2005         Original published format: US 650450 P
US20050692049P17.06.2005         Original published format: US 692049 P
US20050736140P10.11.2005         Original published format: US 736140 P
US2006034677003.02.2006         Original published format: US 346770
[2010/35]
Former [2007/44]US20050650450P04.02.2005
US20050692042P17.06.2005
US20050736140P10.11.2005
US2006034677003.02.2006
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006084275
Date:10.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1848749
Date:31.10.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006
[2007/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1848749
Date:31.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.03.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.04.2010
ClassificationInternational:C07D487/04, A61K31/5025, A61P3/04
[2010/20]
Former International [2007/44]C08F118/00, A61K31/74
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/44]
Former [2007/44]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kontaktstofffreisetzungssystem[2011/49]
English:Contact drug delivery system[2011/49]
French:Systeme de distribution de medicaments par contact[2011/49]
Former [2007/44]KONTAKTSTOFFFREISETZUNGSSYSTEM
Former [2007/44]CONTACT DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM
Former [2007/44]SYSTEME DE DISTRIBUTION DE MEDICAMENTS PAR CONTACT
Entry into regional phase23.08.2007National basic fee paid 
23.08.2007Search fee paid 
23.08.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
23.08.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.10.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
23.08.2007Examination requested  [2007/44]
13.07.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.01.2012Observations by third parties
18.04.2013Date of oral proceedings
07.06.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
10.06.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
02.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
18.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.09.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
14.09.2018Fee for grant paid
14.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.09.2018Information about intention to grant a patent
24.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Appeal following examination06.08.2013Appeal received No.  T2374/13
15.10.2013Statement of grounds filed
20.07.2016Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
20.07.2016Date of oral proceedings
25.07.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP16179307.0   Application refused  : 02.01.2017
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.05.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
16.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
16.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
15.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
12.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
12.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201712   M06   Fee paid on   10.04.2017
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2004096477  (CHAUHAN ANUJ [US], et al) [X] 1,3,9-13 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 8 - paragraphs 9,22 * * page 6, paragraph 71 * [Y] 5-8
 [XI]  - LORENZO-ALVAREZ ET AL, "Soft contact lenses capable of sustained delivery of Timolol", J. PHARM. SCI., (20021001), vol. 91, no. 10, pages 2182 - 2192, XP002563648 [X] 1,4,11,14 * the whole document * [I] 5-8

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.10209
 [XY]  - HIRATANI, H. ET AL., "Timolol uptake and release by imprinted soft contact lenses made of N,N-diethylacrylamide and methacrylic acid", J. CONTRL. REL., (20020701), vol. 83, pages 223 - 230, XP002563649 [X] 1-2,4,11,14 * the whole document * [Y] 5-8

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-3659(02)00213-4
 [XY]  - HIRATANI, H ET AL., "The nature of backbone monomers determines the performance of imprinted soft contact lenses as timolol drug delivery systems", BIOMATERIALS, (2004), vol. 25, pages 1105 - 1113, XP002563650 [X] 1,9,11 * the whole document * [Y] 5-8

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0142-9612(03)00622-7
International search[X]US2006100408  (POWELL P M [US], et al);
 [X]US4668506  (BAWA RAJAN [US])
Examination   - ESPOSITO EX ET AL, "Methods for Applying the Quantitative Structure-Activity Relationship Paradigm", METHODS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, HUMANA PRESS INC, NJ, US, (20040101), vol. 275, ISSN 1064-3745, pages 131 - 213, XP009163021
    - DEY S ET AL, "TRANSPORTERS/RECEPTORS IN THE ANTERIOR CHAMBER: PATHWAYS TO EXPLORE OCULAR DRUG DELIVERY STRATEGIES", EXPERT OPINION ON BIOLOGICAL THERAPY, ASHLEY, LONDON, GB, (20030201), vol. 3, no. 1, doi:10.1517/14712598.3.1.23, ISSN 1471-2598, pages 23 - 44, XP008058707

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/14712598.3.1.23
    - FANELLI F ET AL, "Theoretical quantitative structure-activity relationship analysis on three dimensional models of ligand-m1 muscarinic receptor complexes", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 2, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S0968-0896(00)82015-5, ISSN 0968-0896, (19940301), pages 195 - 211, (19940301), XP026608910

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0968-0896(00)82015-5
    - Amy C. Anderson, "The Process of Structure-Based Drug Design", Chemistry & Biology, (20030901), vol. 10, no. 9, doi:10.1016/j.chembiol.2003.09.002, ISSN 1074-5521, pages 787 - 797, XP055080025

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chembiol.2003.09.002
    - BLUNDELL T L ET AL, "HIGH-THROUGHPUT CRYSTALLOGRAPHY FOR LEAD DISCOVERY IN DRUG DESIGN", NATURE REVIEWS. DRUG DISCOVERY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20020101), vol. 1, no. 1, doi:10.1038/NRD706, ISSN 1474-1784, pages 45 - 54, XP009023187

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrd706
    - Angelo Vedani ET AL, "Pseudoreceptor Modeling: The Construction of Three-Dimensional Receptor Surrogates", Journal of the American Chemical Society, doi:10.1021/ja00122a030, (19950501), pages 4987 - 4994, URL: http://pubs.acs.org/doi/pdf/10.1021/ja00122a030, XP055298993

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00122a030
    - LYNE PAUL D, "STRUCTURE-BASED VIRTUALSCREENING: AN OVERVIEW", DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY, ELSEVIER, RAHWAY, NJ, US, (20021001), vol. 7, no. 20, doi:10.1016/S1359-6446(02)02483-2, ISSN 1359-6446, pages 1047 - 1055, XP008070728

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-6446(02)02483-2
    - KARIM ET AL, "How to find effective functional monomers for effective molecularly imprinted polymers?", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20051206), vol. 57, no. 12, doi:10.1016/J.ADDR.2005.07.013, ISSN 0169-409X, pages 1795 - 1808, XP005173264

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2005.07.013
    - DONG W ET AL, "A computational and experimental investigation of the interaction between the template molecule and the functional monomer used in the molecularly imprinted polymer", ANALYTICA CHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 542, no. 2, ISSN 0003-2670, (20050629), pages 186 - 192, (20050629), XP027730397
    - KARSTEN HAUPT, "Imprinted Polymers : The Next Generation", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20030901), ISSN 0003-2700, pages 376A - 383A, XP002605831
    - XIE H ET AL, "ROLES OF HISTAMINE AND ITS RECEPTORS IN ALLERGIC AND INFLAMMATORY BOWEL DISEASES", WORLD JOURNAL OF GASTROENTEROLOGY, WJG PRESS, CN, (20050501), vol. 11, no. 19, ISSN 1007-9327, pages 2851 - 2857, XP009062013
otherEP1772767
 US2006100408