Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1853295

EP1853295 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THE TREATMENT OF GASTROINTESTINAL DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.05.2010
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.05.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.06.2010  [2010/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
320 Bent Street
Cambridge, MA 02141 / US
[2009/26]
Former [2007/46]For all designated states
Microbia, INC.
320 Bent Street Cambridge
Massachusetts 02141 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CURRIE, Mark G.
18 Hall Avenue
Sterling, Massachusetts 01564 / US
02 / MAHAJAN-MIKLOS, Shalina
882 Cedro Way
Stanford, California 94305 / US
03 / SUN, Li Jing
88 Greenwich Street, Unit 623
New York, New York 10006 / US
04 / KURTZ, Caroline
40 Stone Road
Sudbury, Massachusetts 01776 / US
 [2007/46]
Representative(s)Adams, Harvey Vaughan John , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/12]Adams, Harvey Vaughan John , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
Former [2008/35]Schnappauf, Georg , et al
Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6
81679 München / DE
Former [2007/46]Schnappauf, Georg , et al
Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date06734753.408.02.2006
[2007/46]
WO2006US04768
Priority number, dateUS2005005407208.02.2005         Original published format: US 54072
[2007/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006086653
Date:17.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1853295
Date:14.11.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2006
[2007/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.12.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/16, C07K7/08
[2008/09]
Former International [2007/46]A61K38/10, C07K7/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/46]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG GASTROINTESTINALER ERKRANKUNGEN[2007/46]
English:METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THE TREATMENT OF GASTROINTESTINAL DISORDERS[2007/46]
French:PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES GASTRO-INTESTINAUX[2007/46]
Entry into regional phase06.09.2007National basic fee paid 
06.09.2007Search fee paid 
06.09.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
06.09.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.09.2007Examination requested  [2007/46]
28.02.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.12.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/24]
28.01.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
18.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE19543628  (FORSSMANN WOLF GEORG [DE]) [X] 1,4,5,16 * Claims 1-11 * [Y] 2,9-15,17,29;
 [Y]WO2004069165  (MICROBIA INC [US], et al) [Y] 2,9-15,17,29 * Claims 1-24 *
 [X]  SAUVAGE F J DE ET AL, "PRECURSOR STRUCTURE, EXPRESSION, AND TISSUE DISTRIBUTION OF HUMAN GUANYLIN", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC.; US, (19921001), vol. 89, no. 19, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 9089 - 9093, XP002025433 [X] 1,4,5,16 * Abstract Figures 1 and 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.19.9089
 [X]  KUHN MICHAELA ET AL, "The circulating bioactive form of human guanylin is a high molecular weight peptide (10.3 kDa)", FEBS (FEDERATION OF EUROPEAN BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETIES) LETTERS, (1993), vol. 318, no. 2, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 205 - 209, XP002507964 [X] 1,4,5,16 * Abstract Figures 1 and 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(93)80022-M
 [X]  WIEGAND R C ET AL, "HUMAN GUANYLIN: CDNA ISOLATION, STRUCTURE, AND ACTIVITY", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19921019), vol. 311, no. 2, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 150 - 154, XP002025434 [X] 1,4,5,16 * Abstract Figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(92)81387-2
 [X]  LAUBER THOMAS ET AL, "Solution structure of human proguanylin. The role of a hormone prosequence.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20030627), vol. 278, no. 26, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 24118 - 24124, XP002507965 [X] 1,4,5,16 * Abstract Figure 7 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M300370200
 [X]  SKELTON NICHOLAS J ET AL, "Determination of the solution structure of the peptide hormone guanylin: Observation of a novel form of topological stereoisomerism", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 33, no. 46, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 13581 - 13592, XP002507966 [X] 1,4,5,16 * Abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00250a010
International search[A]US5879656
 [A]US5962220
 [A]US6060037