Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1855694

EP1855694 - ANTISENSE COMPOSITION FOR TREATING MUSCLE ATROPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2007/47]ANTISENSE COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR TREATING MUSCLE ATROPHY
[2015/28]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.11.2015
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sarepta Therapeutics, Inc.
4575 SW Research Way, Suite 200
Corvallis, OR 97333 / US
[2016/01]
Former [2015/19]For all designated states
Sarepta Therapeutics, Inc.
3450 Monte Villa Parkway, Suite 101
Bothell, Washington 98021 / US
Former [2007/47]For all designated states
AVI BioPharma, Inc.
Suite 200, 4575 S.W. Research Way
Corvallis, OR 97333 / US
Inventor(s)01 / IVERSEN, Patrick, L.
5902 N.W. Fair Oaks Place
Corvallis, OR 97330 / US
02 / TIMMINS, Alan P.
29290 SW Ladd Hill Road
Sherwood, OR 97140 / US
 [2009/05]
Former [2007/47]01 / IVERSEN, Patrick, L.
5902 N.W. Fair Oaks Place
Corvallis, OR 97330 / US
Representative(s)Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Ganghoferstraße 68 B
80339 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/02]Schiweck, Weinzierl & Koch
European Patent Attorneys
Landsberger Straße 98
80339 München / DE
Former [2011/41]Schiweck, Weinzierl & Koch
European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Straße 98
80339 München / DE
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2007/47]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date06734779.909.02.2006
[2007/47]
WO2006US04797
Priority number, dateUS20050651574P09.02.2005         Original published format: US 651574 P
[2007/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006086667
Date:17.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1855694
Date:21.11.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2006
[2007/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.02.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.09.2010
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/113, A61P21/00, A61K31/7088
[2015/28]
Former International [2007/47]A61K31/70, A01N43/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/02]
Former [2007/47]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:ANTISENSE-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MUSKELATROPHIE[2015/28]
English:ANTISENSE COMPOSITION FOR TREATING MUSCLE ATROPHY[2015/28]
French:COMPOSITION ANTISENS PERMETTANT DE TRAITER UNE ATROPHIE MUSCULAIRE[2015/28]
Former [2007/47]ANTISENSE-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MUSKELATROPHIE
Former [2007/47]ANTISENSE COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR TREATING MUSCLE ATROPHY
Former [2007/47]COMPOSITION ANTISENS ET METHODE PERMETTANT DE TRAITER UNE ATROPHIE MUSCULAIRE
Entry into regional phase10.09.2007National basic fee paid 
10.09.2007Search fee paid 
10.09.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
10.09.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.09.2007Examination requested  [2007/47]
21.04.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.09.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.04.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.02.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.11.2015Fee for grant paid
23.11.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.11.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Appeal following examination26.02.2016Appeal received No.  T2030/16
27.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)EP16161029.0
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.09.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
23.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
24.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
27.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
27.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
23.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
21.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.201611   M06   Fee paid on   23.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9902667  (UNIV LIEGE [BE], et al) [Y] 1-19 * claim 1 *;
 [Y]  - AMALI ASEERVATHAM ANUSHA ET AL, "Up-regulation of muscle-specific transcription factors during embryonic somitogenesis of zebrafish (Danio rerio) by knock-down of myostatin-1", DEVELOPMENTAL DYNAMICS, (200404), vol. 229, no. 4, ISSN 1058-8388, pages 847 - 856, XP002600078 [Y] 1-19 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/dvdy.10454
 [Y]  - JOULIA DOMINIQUE ET AL, "Mechanisms involved in the inhibition of myoblast proliferation and differentiation by myostatin.", EXPERIMENTAL CELL RESEARCH 10 JUN 2003 LNKD- PUBMED:12749855, (20030610), vol. 286, no. 2, ISSN 0014-4827, pages 263 - 275, XP002600079 [Y] 1-19 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/s0014-4827(03)00074-0
 [Y]  - MOULTON H M ET AL, "CELLULAR UPTAKE OF ANTISENSE MORPHOLINO OLIGOMERS CONJUGATED TO ARGININE-RICH PEPTIDES", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US LNKD- DOI:10.1021/BC034221G, (20040101), vol. 15, no. 2, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 290 - 299, XP002999956 [Y] 1-5 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc034221g
 [A]  - SASHA BOGDANOVICH ET AL, "Functional improvement of dystrophic muscle by myostatin blockade", NATURE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1038/NATURE01154, (20021128), vol. 420, no. 6914, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 418 - 421, XP009120477 [A] 14 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature01154
International search[Y]US2004242528  (HAGSTROM JAMES E [US], et al);
 [Y]US6103466  (GROBET LUC [BE], et al)
 [Y]  - GONZALEZ-CADAVID N.F. ET AL., "Organization of the human myostatin gene and expression in healthy men and HIV-infected men with muscle wasting", PNAS, (199812), vol. 95, pages 14938 - 14943, XP000918848

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.25.14938
ExaminationWO2004097017
 US2013085139
 US2009099066
by applicantUS6103466
 US6617440
 US2004242528
 US2003074680
 US6365351
 US5698685
 US5217866
 US5142047
 US5034506
 US5166315
 US5185444
 US5521063
 US5506337
 WO9740854
    - AGRAWAL, S.; S. H. MAYRAND, "Site-specific excision from RNA by RNase H and mixed-phosphate-backbone oligodeoxynucleotides.", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (1990), vol. 87, no. 4, pages 1401 - 5
    - BENNETT, M. R.; S. M. SCHWARTZ, "Antisense therapy for angioplasty restenosis. Some critical considerations.", CIRCULATION, (1995), vol. 92, no. 7, pages 1981 - 93
    - BLOMMERS, M. J.; U. PIELES ET AL., "An approach to the structure determination of nucleic acid analogues hybridized to RNA. NMR studies of a duplex between 2'-OMe RNA and an oligonucleotide containing a single amide backbone modification.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1994), vol. 22, no. 20, pages 4187 - 94
    - BONHAM, M. A.; S. BROWN ET AL., "An assessment of the antisense properties of RNase H-competent and steric-blocking oligomers.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1995), vol. 23, no. 7, pages 1197 - 203
    - BOUDVILLAIN, M.; M. GUERIN ET AL., "Transplatin-modified oligo(2'-0-methyl ribonucleotideA: a new tool for selective modulation of gene expression.", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 36, no. 10, pages 2925 - 31
    - CROSS, C. W.; J. S. RICE ET AL., "Solution structure of an RNA x DNA hybrid duplex containing a 3'-thioformacetal linker and an RNA A-tract", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 36, no. 14, pages 4096 - 107
    - DAGLE, J. M.; J. L. LITTIG, "Targeted elimination of zygotic messages in Xenopus laevis embryos by modified oligonucleotides possessing terminal cationic linkages.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2000), vol. 28, no. 10, pages 2153 - 7
    - DING, D.; S. M. GRAYAZNOV ET AL., "An oligodeoxyribonucleotide N3'- P5' phosphoramidate duplex forms an A-type helix in solution.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1996), vol. 24, no. 2, pages 354 - 60
    - MCPHERRON, A. C; A. M. LAWLER ET AL., "Regulation of skeletal muscle mass in mice by a new TGF-beta superfamily member.", NATURE, (1997), vol. 387, no. 6628, pages 83 - 90
    - MCPHERRON, A. C.; S.-J. LEE, "Double muscling in cattle due to mutations in the myostatin gene.", PNAS, (1997), vol. 94, no. 23, pages 12457 - 12461
    - MERTES, M. P.; E. A. COATS, "Synthesis of carbonate analogs of dinucleosides. 3'-Thymidinyl 5'-thymidinyl carbonate, 3'-thymidinyl 5'-(5-fluoro-2'-deoxyuridinyl) carbonate, and 3'-(5-fluoro-2'-deoxyuridinyl) 5'-thymidinyl carbonate.", J MED CHEM, (1969), vol. 12, pages 154 - 7
    - MOULTON, H.M ET AL., "Cellular uptake of antisense morpholino oligomers conjugated to argenine-rich peptides", BIOCONOUGATE CHEMISTRY, (2004), vol. 15, no. 2, pages 290 - 299
    - SCHULTE, J.N., "Effects of resistance training on the rate of muscle protein synthesis in frail elderly people", INT. J. SPORT NUTRITION AND EXERCISE METAB, (2001), pages 111 - 118
    - STEIN, D., E. ET AL., "A specificity comparison of four antisense types: morpholino, 2'-0-methyl RNA, DNA, and phosphorothioate DNA.", ANTISENSE NUCLEIC ACID DRUG DEV, (1997), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 151 - 7
    - TOULME, J. J.; R. L. TINEVEZ ET AL., "Targeting RNA structures by antisense oligonucleotides.", BIOCHIMIE, (1996), vol. 78, no. 7, pages 663 - 73
    - WALLACE, J. I.; R. S. SCHWARTZ, "Epidemiology of weight loss in humans with special reference to wasting in the elderly.", INT J CARDIOL, (2002), vol. 85, no. 1, pages 15 - 21
    - WILLIAMS, A. S.; J. P. CAMILLERI ET AL., "A single intra-articular injection of liposomally conjugated methotrexate suppresses joint inflammation in rat antigen-induced arthritis.", BR J RHEUMATOL, (1996), vol. 35, no. 8, pages 719 - 24
    - YARASHESKI, K.E. ET AL., "Serum myostatin-immunoreactive protein is increased in 60-92 year old women and men with muscle wasting", J. NUTRITION, HEALTH, AGING, (2002), vol. 6, no. 5, pages 343 - 348
    - ZIMMERS, T. A.; M. V. DAVIES ET AL., "Induction of Cachexia in Mice by Systemically Administered Myostatin.", SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 296, no. 5572, pages 1486 - 1488