Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1849163

EP1849163 - MANIFOLD SYSTEM FOR THE VENTILATED STORAGE OF HIGH LEVEL WASTE AND A METHOD OF USING THE SAME TO STORE HIGH LEVEL WASTE IN A BELOW-GRADE ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.06.2015
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.06.2015No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.07.2015  [2015/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Holtec International, Inc.
555 Lincoln Drive West
Marlton, NJ 08053 / US
[2007/44]
Inventor(s)01 / SINGH, Krishna, P.
230 Normandy Circle East
Palm Harbor, Florida 34683 / US
 [2007/44]
Representative(s)Franzolin, Luigi , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[2014/31]
Former [2008/45]Franzolin, Luigi , et al
STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9
10121 Torino / IT
Former [2007/44]Franzolin, Luigi , et al
Studio Torta Via Viotti 9
I-10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date06734917.513.02.2006
[2007/44]
WO2006US05003
Priority number, dateUS20050652363P11.02.2005         Original published format: US 652363 P
[2007/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006086766
Date:17.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1849163
Date:31.10.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2006
[2007/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1849163
Date:30.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.04.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.05.2012
ClassificationInternational:G21C19/00
[2007/44]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2008/21]
Former [2007/44]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERTEILERSYSTEM ZUR BELÜFTETEN LAGERUNG VON HOCHAKTIVEM ABFALL UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN VERWENDUNG FÜR DIE LAGERUNG VON HOCHAKTIVEM ABFALL IN EINER UNTERIRDISCHEN UMGEBUNG[2007/44]
English:MANIFOLD SYSTEM FOR THE VENTILATED STORAGE OF HIGH LEVEL WASTE AND A METHOD OF USING THE SAME TO STORE HIGH LEVEL WASTE IN A BELOW-GRADE ENVIRONMENT[2007/44]
French:SYSTEME COLLECTEUR DESTINE A UN STOCKAGE AERE DE DECHETS A ACTIVITE ELEVEE ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION DE CE SYSTEME AFIN DE STOCKER DES DECHETS A ACTIVITE ELEVEE DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT SOUTERRAIN[2007/44]
Entry into regional phase03.09.2007National basic fee paid 
03.09.2007Search fee paid 
03.09.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.09.2007Examination requested  [2007/44]
11.12.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.06.2014Fee for grant paid
19.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.02.2014
Opposition(s)04.05.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
20.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
23.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
22.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
20.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XI]JPH11190799  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,4,6-8,17-19,22 * abstract * * figures 3,4,6 * [I] 2,3,5,9-16;
 [XI]KR20000000022  (TONG YANG MAGIC CORP [KR]) [X] 1,20 * figures 6,7a * [I] 21
International search[Y]US6064711
 [Y]US4525324
 [Y]GB2337722
 [Y]US5753925