Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1858541

EP1858541 - USE OF BMP ANTAGONISTS TO REGULATE HEPCIDIN-MEDIATED IRON METABOLISM AND TREAT IRON DEFICIENCY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2007/48]USE OF MODULATORS OF COMPOUNDS OF TGF-BETA SUPERFAMILY TO REGULATE HEPCIDIN-MEDIATED IRON METABOLISM
[2012/08]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.06.2012
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.05.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The General Hospital Corporation
55 Fruit Street
Boston, MA 02114 / US
[2012/30]
Former [2007/48]For all designated states
The General Hospital Corporation
55 Fruit Street
Boston MA 02114 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LIN, Herbert, Y.
68 Spruce Street
Watertown, Massachusetts 02472 / US
02 / BABITT, Jodie
82 Elmira Street Apt.3
Brighton, Massachusetts 02135 / US
03 / CHUNG, Raymond, T.
59 Bellingham Road
Chestnut Hill, Massachusetts 02467 / US
04 / SAMAD, Tarek, A.
42 8th Street, Suite 2310
Charlestown, Massachusetts 02129 / US
05 / SCHNEYER, Alan, L.
158 Laurel Street
Concord, Massachusetts 02174 / US
06 / WOOLF, Clifford
107 Franklin Street
Newton, Massachusetts 02458 / US
 [2007/48]
Representative(s)Cooley (UK) LLP
Dashwood
69 Old Broad Street
London EC2M 1QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/15]Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo LLP
Alder Castle
10 Noble Street
London EC2V 7JX / GB
Former [2012/30]Crump, Julian Richard John
Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street
London EC2V 7JX / GB
Former [2011/14]Crump, Julian Richard John
Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street
London EC2V 7JX / GB
Former [2007/48]Bösl, Raphael Konrad
Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Prinzregentenstrasse 68
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date06735151.016.02.2006
[2007/48]
WO2006US05367
Priority number, dateUS20050653479P16.02.2005         Original published format: US 653479 P
[2007/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006088972
Date:24.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/34]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1858541
Date:28.11.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2006
[2007/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1858541
Date:25.07.2012
Language:EN
[2012/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.04.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/17, A61K47/48, A61K39/395, A61P3/02, A61P7/06
[2007/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/48]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON BMP ANTAGONISTEN ZUR REGULIERUNG DES HEPCIDIN-VERMITTELTEN EISENSTOFFWECHSELS UND ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON EISENMANGEL[2012/08]
English:USE OF BMP ANTAGONISTS TO REGULATE HEPCIDIN-MEDIATED IRON METABOLISM AND TREAT IRON DEFICIENCY[2012/08]
French:UTILISATION D'ANTAGONISTES DU BMP POUR REGULER LE METABOLISME DU FER DEPENDANT DE L'HEPCIDINE ET TRAITER LE DÉFICIT EN FER[2012/08]
Former [2007/48]VERWENDUNG VON MODULATOREN VON VERBINDUNGEN DER TGF-BETA-SUPERFAMILIE ZUR REGULIERUNG DES HEPCIDIN-VERMITTELTEN EISENSTOFFWECHSELS
Former [2007/48]USE OF MODULATORS OF COMPOUNDS OF TGF-BETA SUPERFAMILY TO REGULATE HEPCIDIN-MEDIATED IRON METABOLISM
Former [2007/48]UTILISATION DE MODULATEURS DE COMPOSES DE LA FAMILLE DES TGF-BETA POUR REGULER LE METABOLISME DU FER DEPENDANT DE L'HEPCIDINE
Entry into regional phase14.09.2007National basic fee paid 
14.09.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
14.09.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.09.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.09.2007Examination requested  [2007/48]
11.12.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.06.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
18.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.2012Fee for grant paid
12.06.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.05.2018Observations by third parties
Divisional application(s)EP10196139.9  / EP2335719
EP15173396.1  / EP2954903
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.12.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.04.2013  30.04.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Eli Lilly and Company
Lilly Corporate Center
Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US
Opponent's representative
O'Connor, David
Eli Lilly and Company Ltd.
Erl Wood Manor
Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2013/23]
Opponent(s)01  25.04.2013  30.04.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Eli Lilly and Company
Lilly Corporate Center
Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US
Opponent's representative
O'Connor, David
Eli Lilly and Company Ltd.
Erl Wood Manor
GB-Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB
04.06.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.12.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.10.2014Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M01)
24.11.2014Reply to a communication from the opposition division
17.03.2015Date of oral proceedings
22.07.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.07.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition10.09.2015Appeal received No.  T1786/15
01.12.2015Statement of grounds filed
20.04.2016Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2016/17]
19.08.2016Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2016/34]
15.10.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
23.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
24.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.02.2006
AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
CZ25.07.2012
DK25.07.2012
EE25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
LV25.07.2012
NL25.07.2012
PL25.07.2012
RO25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
SI25.07.2012
SK25.07.2012
TR25.07.2012
BG25.10.2012
GR26.10.2012
IS25.11.2012
PT26.11.2012
IE16.02.2013
LU16.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
CZ25.07.2012
DK25.07.2012
EE25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
LV25.07.2012
NL25.07.2012
PL25.07.2012
RO25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
SI25.07.2012
SK25.07.2012
TR25.07.2012
BG25.10.2012
GR26.10.2012
IS25.11.2012
PT26.11.2012
IE16.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2014/07]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
CZ25.07.2012
DK25.07.2012
EE25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
LV25.07.2012
NL25.07.2012
PL25.07.2012
RO25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
SI25.07.2012
SK25.07.2012
BG25.10.2012
GR26.10.2012
IS25.11.2012
PT26.11.2012
IE16.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2013/42]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
CZ25.07.2012
DK25.07.2012
EE25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
LV25.07.2012
NL25.07.2012
PL25.07.2012
RO25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
SI25.07.2012
SK25.07.2012
BG25.10.2012
GR26.10.2012
IS25.11.2012
PT26.11.2012
MC28.02.2013
Former [2013/34]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
CZ25.07.2012
DK25.07.2012
EE25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
LV25.07.2012
NL25.07.2012
PL25.07.2012
RO25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
SI25.07.2012
SK25.07.2012
BG25.10.2012
GR26.10.2012
IS25.11.2012
PT26.11.2012
Former [2013/22]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
CZ25.07.2012
DK25.07.2012
EE25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
LV25.07.2012
NL25.07.2012
PL25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
SI25.07.2012
GR26.10.2012
IS25.11.2012
PT26.11.2012
Former [2013/21]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
DK25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
LV25.07.2012
NL25.07.2012
PL25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
SI25.07.2012
GR26.10.2012
IS25.11.2012
PT26.11.2012
Former [2013/15]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
LV25.07.2012
NL25.07.2012
PL25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
SI25.07.2012
GR26.10.2012
IS25.11.2012
PT26.11.2012
Former [2013/13]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
LV25.07.2012
PL25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
SI25.07.2012
GR26.10.2012
IS25.11.2012
PT26.11.2012
Former [2013/12]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
LV25.07.2012
PL25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
SI25.07.2012
GR26.10.2012
IS25.11.2012
Former [2013/11]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
LV25.07.2012
PL25.07.2012
SI25.07.2012
GR26.10.2012
IS25.11.2012
Former [2013/10]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
IS25.11.2012
Former [2013/09]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
Former [2013/08]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
Former [2013/07]AT25.07.2012
Cited inInternational search[PA]WO2005028517  (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al) [PA] 1-102 * see abstract, claims 54-61 and 66 *;
 [A]WO02098444  (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR], et al) [A] 1-102 * see abstract and claim 10 *;
 [XY]WO2004004750  (INST MEDIZINTECHNOLOGIE MAGDEB [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6,19-21,23,27,28,31-34,41,42,46-48,55,56,59-63,65,68,101,102 * see abstract and claims 1-7 * [Y] 87-93;
 [XY]WO2004016606  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8-11,19-21,24,25,31-34,36-38,46-48,51-53,59-63,72,101,102 * see abstract, claims 1,7-8 * [Y] 87-93;
 [X]CN1284380  ;
 [A]WO03089608  (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-102 * see abstract, claims and page 43 *
 [A]  - WEINSTEIN D A ET AL, "Inappropriate expression of hepcidin is associated with iron refractory anemia: implications for the anemia of chronic disease", BLOOD, W.B.SAUNDERS COMPANY, ORLANDO, FL, US, (20021115), vol. 100, no. 10, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 3776 - 3781, XP002356757 [A] 1-102 * see abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2002-04-1260
 [A]  - NEMETH ET AL., "Hepcidin is decreased in TRF2 hemochromatosis", BLOOD, (20050215), vol. 105, no. 4, pages 1803 - 1806, XP002416006 [A] 1-102 * see abstract and page 1805 last *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2004-08-3042
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, Database accession no. 2001-317422, XP002416009 & CN1284380 A 20010221 (INST HEMATOLOGY CHINESE ACAD MEDICAL SCI) [X] 1-3,6,11,19-21,23-25,31-34,36,38,41,46-48,53,55,59-63,68,101,102 * abstract; column A *
 [A]  - ROETTO A ET AL, "Mutant antimicrobial peptide hepcidin is associated with severe juvenile hemochromatosis", NATURE GENETICS, NATURE AMERICA, NEW YORK, US, (200301), vol. 33, no. 1, ISSN 1061-4036, pages 21 - 22, XP002356759 [A] 1-102 * see the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng1053
 [A]  - KRIJT J. ET AL., "Expression of Rgmc, the murine ortholog of hemojuvelin gene, is modulated by development and inflammation, but not by iron status or erythropoietin", BLOOD, (20041215), vol. 104, no. 13, XP002416007 [A] 1-102 * see abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2004-06-2422
by applicantUS6432410
 US5719120
 US5830847
 US6015693
 US5571714
 US2004014175
 WO9424314
 WO9512608
    - P. AISEN ET AL., J. BIOCHEM. CELL BIOL., (2001), vol. 33, pages 940 - 959
    - J.M.C. GUTTERIDGE ET AL., BIOCHEM. J., (1982), vol. 296, pages 605 - 609
    - S. XIONG ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, pages 17646 - 17654
    - C. FINCH, BLOOD, (1994), vol. 84, pages 1697 - 1702
    - C.H. PARK ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, pages 7806 - 7810
    - A. KRAUSE ET AL., FEBS LETT., (2000), vol. 480, pages 147 - 150
    - G. NICOLAS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD, SCI. USA, (2001), vol. 98, pages 878 - 885
    - C. PIGEON ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, pages 7811 - 7819
    - H. KULAKSIZ ET AL., J. ENDOCRINOL., (2005), vol. 184, pages 361 - 370
    - G. NICOLAS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD.
    - J. MASSAGUE, ANNU. REV. BIOCHEM., (1998), vol. 67, pages 753 - 791
    - J. MASSAGUE, ANN. REV. CELL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 6, pages 597 - 641
    - M.B. SPORN; A.B. ROBERTS, J. CELL. BIO1, (1992), vol. 119, page 10171021
    - S.W. WAHL, J. CLIN. IMMUNOL, (1992), vol. 12, pages 61 - 74
    - D.M. KINGSLEY, GENES DEV., (1994), vol. 8, pages 133 - 146
    - J. MASSAGUE; B. LIKE, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1985), vol. 260, pages 2636 - 2645
    - S. CHEIFETZ ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1986), vol. 261, pages 9972 - 9978
    - A.H. REDDI, CURR. OPIN. GENET. DEV., (1994), vol. 4, pages 737 - 744
    - K.A. WAITE; C. ENG, NAT. REV. GENET., (2003), vol. 4, pages 763 - 773
    - J. MASSAGUE; Y.G. CHEN, GENES DEV., (2000), vol. 14, pages 627 - 644
    - K. MIYAZONO ET AL., J. CELL PHYSIOL., (2001), vol. 187, page 265276
    - N. MORRELL ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2001), vol. 104, pages 790 - 795
    - A. VON BUDNOFFAND K.W.Y. CHO, DEV. BIOL., (2001), vol. 239, pages 1 - 14
    - C.H. HELDIN ET AL., NATURE, (1997), vol. 390, pages 465 - 471
    - J. NEWMAN ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (2001), vol. 345, pages 319 - 324
    - B.L. ROSENZWEIG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 7632 - 7636
    - L. ATTISANO; J.L. WRANA, SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 296, pages 1646 - 1647
    - M. KAWABATA ET AL., CYTOKINE GROWTH FACTOR REV., (1998), vol. 9, pages 49 - 61
    - T. SAKOU, BONE, (1998), vol. 22, pages 591 - 603
    - R.G. SCHAUB; J. WOZNEY, CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL., (1991), vol. 2, pages 868 - 871
    - J.M. SCHMITT ET AL., J. ORTHOP. RES., (1999), vol. 17, pages 269 - 278
    - G.J. THOMSEN ET AL., TRENDS GENET., (1997), vol. 13, pages 209 - 211
    - E. CANALIS ET AL., ENDOCR. REV., (2003), vol. 24, pages 218 - 235
    - V.A. BOTCHKAREV, J. INVEST. DERMATOL., (2003), vol. 120, pages 36 - 47
    - D. HSU ET AL., MOL. CELL, (1998), vol. 1, pages 673 - 683
    - J.J. PEARCE ET AL., DEV. BIOL., (1999), vol. 209, pages 98 - 110
    - C.R. RODRIGEZ ESTEBAN ET AL., NATURE, (1999), vol. 401, pages 243 - 251
    - T.A, SAMAD ET AL., "DRAGON: a bone morphogenetic protein co-receptor", J. BIOL, CHEM., (2005), vol. 280, pages 14122 - 14129
    - T.A. SAMAD ET AL., "DRAGON: A member of the repulsive guidance molecule-related family of neuronal- and muscle-expressed membrane proteins is regulated by DRG1 and has neuronal adhesive properties", J. NEUROSCIENCE, (2004), vol. 24, pages 2027 - 2036
    - T.A. SAMAD ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2005), vol. 280, pages 14122 - 14129
    - J.L. BABITT ET AL., "Repulsive guidance molecule (RGMa), a DRAGON homologue, is a bone morphogenetic protein co-receptor", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2005), vol. 280, pages 29820 - 29827
    - S.K. CHENG ET AL., GENES DEV., (2003), vol. 17, pages 31 - 36
    - M.M. SHEN; A.F. SCHIER, TRENDS GENET., (2000), vol. 16, pages 303 - 309
    - Y. YAMAGUCHI ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 346, pages 281 - 284
    - W.A. BRODER ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 346, pages 371 - 374
    - S.W. WAHL, J. CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 12, pages 61 - 74
    - M. SHAH ET AL., LANCET, (1992), vol. 339, pages 213 - 214
    - M.S. STEINER; E.R. BARRACK, MOL. ENDOCRINOL., (1992), vol. 6, pages 15 - 25
    - F.N. ZIYADEH ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SEI. USA, (2000), vol. 97, pages 8015 - 8020
    - H. YAMAMOTO ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 271, pages 16253 - 16259
    - A BANDYOPADHYAY ET AL., CANCER RES., (1999), vol. 59, pages 5041 - 5046
    - Z. QI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD, SCI. USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 2345 - 2349
    - T. NAKAMURA ET AL., HEPATOL., (2000), vol. 32, pages 247 - 255
    - SAKAMOTO ET AL., GENE THER., (2000), vol. 7, pages 1915 - 1924
    - H. UENO ET AL., GENE THER., (2000), vol. 11, pages 33 - 42
    - J. GEORGE ET AL., PROC. NATL ACAD, SCI. USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 12719 - 12724
    - M.A. GALLOP ET AL., J. MED, CHEM., (1994), vol. 37, pages 1233 - 1251
    - E.M. GORDON ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1994), vol. 37, pages 1385 - 1401
    - D.E. CANE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 82, pages 63 - 68
    - S.H. DEWITT ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SD. U.S.A., (1993), vol. 90, pages 6909 - 6913
    - R.N. ZUCKERMANN ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1994), vol. 37, pages 2678 - 2685
    - CARELL ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED. ENGL., (1994), vol. 33, pages 2059 - 2060
    - P.L. MYERS, CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL., (1997), vol. 8, pages 701 - 707
    - G. NICOLAS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2001), vol. 98, pages 8780 - 8785
    - KA. AHMAD ET AL., BLOOD CELLS MOL. DIS., (2002), vol. 29, pages 361 - 366
    - G. NICOLAS ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (2002), vol. 110, pages 1037 - 1044
    - N. KELLEY-LOUGHNANE ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (2002), vol. 35, pages 525 - 534
    - G.R. LEE, SEMIN. HEMATOL., (1983), vol. 20, pages 61 - 80
    - A.J. MATTHEWS ET AL., J. SURG. RES., (1997), vol. 73, pages 35 - 40
    - T.P. TUOMAINEN ET AL., DIABETES CARE, (1997), vol. 20, pages 426 - 428
    - P. TUOMAINEN ET AL., CIRCULATION, (1997), vol. 97, pages 1461 - 1466
    - J.M. MCCORD, CIRCULATION, (1991), vol. 83, pages 1112 - 1114
    - J.L. SULLIVAN, J. CLIN. EPIDEMIOL., (1996), vol. 49, pages 1345 - 1352
    - M.A. SMITH ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI., (1997), vol. 94, pages 9866 - 9868
    - P. RIEDERER ET AL., J. NEUROCHEM., (1989), vol. 512, pages 515 - 520
    - P. KNEKT ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (1994), vol. 56, pages 379 - 382
    - J.L. BABITT ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2005), vol. 280, pages 29820 - 29827
    - G. PAPAMOKOLAOU ET AL., NAT. GENET., (2004), vol. 36, pages 77 - 82
    - F.W. HUANG ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (2005), vol. 115, pages 2187 - 2191
    - J.L, BABITT ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2005), vol. 280, pages 29820 - 29827
    - C.A. FROLICK ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1984), vol. 259, pages 10995 - 11000