Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1853250

EP1853250 - COMBINATIONS AND MODES OF ADMINISTRATION OF THERAPEUTIC AGENTS AND COMBINATION THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  30.09.2019
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2019Revocation of patentpublished on 06.11.2019  [2019/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Abraxis BioScience, LLC
86 Morris Avenue
Summit, NJ 07901 / US
[2018/15]
Former [2011/52]For all designated states
Abraxis BioScience, LLC
11755 Wilshire Boulevard
Suite 2100
Los Angeles, CA 90025 / US
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Abraxis BioScience, LLC
11755 Wilshire Boulevard, 20th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90025 / US
Former [2007/46]For all designated states
Abraxis BioScience, Inc.
11755 Wilshire Blvd., 20th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90025 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DESAI, Neil, P.
11755 Wilshire Boulevard, 20th Floor
Los Angeles, California 90025 / US
02 / SOON-SHIONG, Patrick
149 South Barrington Avenue, 311
Los Angeles, California 90049 / US
 [2007/46]
Representative(s)Weber, Martin , et al
Jones Day
Prinzregentenstraße 11
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/29]Weber, Martin , et al
Jones Day Rechtsanwälte Attorneys-at-Law Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Former [2007/46]Roques, Sarah Elizabeth
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date06735710.321.02.2006
[2007/46]
WO2006US06167
Priority number, dateUS20050654245P18.02.2005         Original published format: US 654245 P
[2007/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006089290
Date:24.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1853250
Date:14.11.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2006
[2007/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1853250
Date:02.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.08.2006
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/337, A61K31/555, A61K38/22, A61K31/7068, A61P35/00
[2007/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/46]
TitleGerman:KOMBINATIONEN UND MODI ZUR VERABREICHUNG THERAPEUTISCHER MITTEL UND KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIE[2007/46]
English:COMBINATIONS AND MODES OF ADMINISTRATION OF THERAPEUTIC AGENTS AND COMBINATION THERAPY[2007/46]
French:COMBINAISONS ET MODES D'ADMINISTRATION D'AGENTS THERAPEUTIQUES ET TRAITEMENT COMBINE[2007/46]
Entry into regional phase05.09.2007National basic fee paid 
05.09.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
05.09.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.09.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.09.2007Examination requested  [2007/46]
24.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.06.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.03.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
28.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
29.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.08.2011Fee for grant paid
04.08.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10011106.1  / EP2301531
EP17165979.0  / EP3248600
EP20154548.0
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.04.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.08.2012  07.08.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP, et al
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 02  02.08.2012  31.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
MediGene Aktiengesellschaft
Lochhamer Strasse 11
82152 Planegg/Martinsried / DE
Opponent's representative
Weiss, Wolfgang, et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2018/52]
Opponent(s)01  01.08.2012  07.08.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington & Fife LLP, et al
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 02  02.08.2012  31.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
MediGene Aktiengesellschaft
Lochhamer Strasse 11
82152 Planegg/Martinsried / DE
Opponent's representative
Weiss, Wolfgang, et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
Former [2012/41]
Opponent(s)01  01.08.2012  07.08.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 02  02.08.2012   
MediGene Aktiengesellschaft
Lochhamer Strasse 11
82152 Planegg/Martinsried / DE
Opponent's representative
Weiss, Wolfgang, et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Former [2012/37]
Opponent(s)01  01.08.2012  07.08.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 02  02.08.2012  09.08.2012  ADMISSIBLE
MediGene Aktiengesellschaft
Lochhamer Strasse 11
82152 Planegg/Martinsried / DE
Opponent's representative
Geissler, Andreas, et al
MediGene AG
Intellectual Property
Lochhamer Straße 11
DE-82152 Planegg/Martinsried / DE
Former [2012/36]
Opponent(s)01  01.08.2012   
Generics [UK] Limited
Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
12.09.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.04.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.10.2013Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.03.2014
13.03.2014Date of oral proceedings
01.04.2014Date of oral proceedings
19.05.2014Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.05.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.08.2019Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/45]
18.09.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition29.07.2014Appeal received No.  T1556/14
29.09.2014Statement of grounds filed
12.08.2019Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
17.07.2014Appeal received No.  T1556/14
29.09.2014Statement of grounds filed
12.08.2019Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
15.07.2014Appeal received
26.09.2014Statement of grounds filed
12.08.2019Date of oral proceedings
11.09.2019Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
28.05.2010Request for further processing filed
28.05.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
16.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
15.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0189522  (AMERICAN BIOSCIENCE INC [US], et al) [X] 1-49 * examples 11,16,18 *;
 [X]  - O'SHAUGHNESSY J A ET AL, "Weekly nanoparticle albumin paclitaxel (Abraxane) results in long-term disease control in patients with taxane-refractory metastatic breast cancer.", BREAST CANCER RESEARCH AND TREATMENT, & 27TH ANNUAL CHARLES A COLTMAN SAN ANTONIO BREAST CANCER SYMPOSIUM; SAN ANTONIO, TX, USA; DECEMBER 08 -11, 2004, (2004), vol. 88, no. Suppl. 1, ISSN 0167-6806, page S65, XP009068641 [X] 1-49 * abstract *
 [PX]  - STINCHCOMBE T E ET AL, "Preliminary results of phase I trial of carboplatin (CP) in combination with ABI-007 administered weekly or every 3 weeks in patients (pts) with solid tumors.", BREAST CANCER RESEARCH AND TREATMENT, & 28TH ANNUAL SAN ANTONIO BREAST CANCER SYMPOSIUM; SAN ANTONIO, TX, USA; DECEMBER 08 -11, 2005, (2005), vol. 94, no. Suppl. 1, ISSN 0167-6806, page S71, XP009068639 [PX] 1,4,5,8-20 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10549-005-7328-3
Examination   - DE VOS A I ET AL, "Differential modulation of cisplatin accumulation in leukocytes and tumor cell lines by the paclitaxel vehicle Cremophor EL", ANNALS OF ONCOLOGY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO LNKD- DOI:10.1023/A:1008215720081, (19971101), vol. 8, no. 11, ISSN 1569-8041, pages 1145 - 1150, XP019228696

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1008215720081
    - LI C ET AL, "Polymer-drug conjugates: Recent development in clinical oncology", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, ELSEVIER BV, AMSTERDAM, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.ADDR.2007.11.009, vol. 60, no. 8, ISSN 0169-409X, (20080522), pages 886 - 898, (20080208), XP022624677

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2007.11.009
    - LI CHUN ET AL, "Complete regression of well-established tumors using a novel water-soluble poly(L-glutamic acid)-paclitaxel conjugate", CANCER RESEARCH, (19980601), vol. 58, no. 11, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 2404 - 2409
    - LANGER COREY J ET AL, "Phase III trial comparing paclitaxel poliglumex (CT-2103, PPX) in combination with carboplatin versus standard paclitaxel and carboplatin in the treatment of PS 2 patients with chemotherapy-naïve advanced non-small cell lung cancer.", JOURNAL OF THORACIC ONCOLOGY : OFFICIAL PUBLICATION OF THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE STUDY OF LUNG CANCER JUN 2008 LNKD- PUBMED:18520802, (200806), vol. 3, no. 6, ISSN 1556-1380, pages 623 - 630
by applicantUS2004143004
 WO0064437
 WO0189522
 US6566405
 US2005004002
 US5916596
 US6506405
 US6537579
    - LORENZ ET AL., AGENTS ACTIONS, (1987), vol. 7, pages 63 - 67
    - WEISS ET AL., J. CLIN. ONCOL., (1990), vol. 8, pages 1263 - 1268
    - NG ET AL., CANCER RES., (2004), vol. 64, pages 821 - 824
    - NAT. MED., (1999), vol. 5, no. 9, pages 1032 - 1038