Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1853250 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1853250



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 3164
19.02.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.02.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.02.2020 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
13.02.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.02.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.02.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.02.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.02.2020 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
23.01.2020 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 2
23.01.2020 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 2
23.01.2020 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 2
30.09.2019 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
27.09.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
26.09.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.09.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.09.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.09.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.09.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.09.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 7
18.09.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
18.09.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
18.09.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
11.09.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
11.09.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
11.09.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
11.09.2019 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 2
23.08.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.08.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.08.2019 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
19.08.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
16.08.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.08.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
15.08.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.08.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.07.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 13
22.07.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 13
19.07.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
19.07.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
18.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
18.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
18.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
18.07.2019 Claims Appeal 2
18.07.2019 Claims Appeal 2
18.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.07.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
17.07.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.06.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
18.06.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
18.06.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.06.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.06.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
12.06.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.06.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
11.06.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
07.06.2019 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
07.06.2019 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
07.06.2019 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
07.06.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 9
07.06.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 9
07.06.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 9
07.06.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 6
07.06.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 6
29.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.05.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
29.05.2019 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 2
17.05.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.05.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.05.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.04.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
18.04.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
15.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
15.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
15.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
15.04.2019 Claims Appeal 2
15.04.2019 Claims Appeal 1
15.04.2019 Claims Appeal 2
15.04.2019 Claims Appeal 1
15.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
15.04.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.04.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
12.04.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.01.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.01.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.12.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.12.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
05.12.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.12.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.12.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
05.12.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.12.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
30.11.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
30.11.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
30.11.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
30.11.2018 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 3
27.11.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
02.10.2018 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
13.03.2018 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
20.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.02.2018 Request for change of address - applicant Appeal 2
02.01.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
31.07.2017 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 2
31.07.2017 Request concerning representative opponent Appeal 4
31.07.2017 Request concerning representative opponent Appeal 2
30.11.2016 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 3
21.03.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
21.03.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
23.12.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.12.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
17.12.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
19.03.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.03.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.03.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.03.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.03.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.03.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.03.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
02.03.2015 Non-scannable object Appeal 6
02.03.2015 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
02.03.2015 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
02.03.2015 Non-scannable object Appeal 6
02.03.2015 Non-scannable object Appeal 6
02.03.2015 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
02.03.2015 Non-scannable object Appeal 6
02.03.2015 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
02.03.2015 Non-scannable object Appeal 6
02.03.2015 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
02.03.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 1
27.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
27.02.2015 Amended description with annotations Appeal 3
27.02.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.02.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 11
27.02.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.02.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
27.02.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
27.02.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
27.02.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
27.02.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 12
27.02.2015 Claims Appeal 2
27.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
27.02.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 25
26.02.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.02.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.02.2015 Withdrawal of an appeal Appeal 1
12.02.2015 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
20.10.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.10.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.10.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
29.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 4
29.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
29.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
29.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
29.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
29.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
29.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
29.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
29.09.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
29.09.2014 Claims Appeal 2
29.09.2014 Claims Appeal 5
29.09.2014 Claims Appeal 3
29.09.2014 Claims Appeal 1
29.09.2014 Claims Appeal 6
29.09.2014 Claims Appeal 5
29.09.2014 Claims Appeal 3
29.09.2014 Claims Appeal 2
29.09.2014 Claims Appeal 5
29.09.2014 Claims Appeal 5
29.09.2014 General enquiry Appeal 1
29.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 3
29.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 72
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 23
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 23
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
29.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
29.09.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 35
29.09.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 11
26.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
26.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
26.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
26.09.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
26.09.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 17
04.09.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
05.08.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
05.08.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
05.08.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
29.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
29.07.2014 Notice of appeal/statement of grounds Appeal 1
23.07.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
23.07.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
23.07.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
23.07.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
23.07.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
23.07.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
17.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
17.07.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
17.07.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
15.07.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
15.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
25.06.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.05.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.05.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.05.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.05.2014 Annex to a communication Opposition 105
19.05.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 23
19.05.2014 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
19.05.2014 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 57
19.05.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 30
19.05.2014 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
19.05.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
19.05.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
19.05.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
19.05.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
19.05.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
19.05.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.05.2014 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 47
03.04.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
31.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
31.01.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
31.01.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
31.01.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 6
31.01.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 6
31.01.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 6
31.01.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 6
31.01.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 6
31.01.2014 Claims Opposition 5
31.01.2014 Claims Opposition 4
31.01.2014 Claims Opposition 6
31.01.2014 Claims Opposition 4
31.01.2014 Claims Opposition 4
31.01.2014 Claims Opposition 4
31.01.2014 Claims Opposition 5
31.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
31.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
31.01.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.01.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
29.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
22.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
22.01.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.01.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
21.01.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
21.01.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
21.01.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
21.01.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
21.01.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
21.01.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
21.01.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
21.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
21.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
21.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 76
21.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 112
21.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 131
21.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 78
21.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
21.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
21.01.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 24
17.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
17.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
13.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
13.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
13.01.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.11.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
31.10.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.10.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.10.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.10.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.10.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.10.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.10.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.10.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.10.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.10.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.10.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.10.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.10.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.10.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.10.2013 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 2
25.09.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.09.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.09.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.09.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.09.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.09.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.09.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.09.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.09.2013 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
17.09.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.09.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.09.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.09.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.09.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
22.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
22.08.2013 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 1
20.08.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.08.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.08.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.08.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.08.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.08.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.08.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.08.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.08.2013 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
07.08.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
07.08.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.07.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
26.04.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.04.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
22.04.2013 Annex Opposition 2
22.04.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
22.04.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.04.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.04.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.04.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
22.04.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.04.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.04.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.04.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
22.04.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.04.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.04.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.04.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.04.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.04.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
22.04.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
22.04.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.04.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.04.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
22.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
22.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
22.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
22.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
22.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
22.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
22.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
22.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
22.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
22.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
22.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
22.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
22.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
22.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
22.04.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 33
14.03.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.03.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.03.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
12.03.2013 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
15.01.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.01.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.01.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
09.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
09.01.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
09.01.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
26.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.11.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
15.11.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
15.11.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.11.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
15.11.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.11.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.11.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
15.11.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 62
24.09.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
24.09.2012 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 2
24.09.2012 Communication of amended entries Search / examination 1
12.09.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.09.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
12.09.2012 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
12.09.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
12.09.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
27.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.08.2012 Request for documents Opposition 1
20.08.2012 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
20.08.2012 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 3
14.08.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
09.08.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
04.08.2012 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
02.08.2012 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
02.08.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
02.08.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
01.08.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
01.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
01.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
01.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
01.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
01.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
01.08.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
01.08.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 18
01.08.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
01.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 62
02.12.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
28.11.2011 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
22.11.2011 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 3
07.10.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
21.09.2011 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
16.09.2011 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
16.09.2011 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 3
04.08.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.08.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
04.08.2011 Claims Search / examination 5
04.08.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
04.08.2011 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
04.08.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
04.08.2011 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 2
21.06.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
15.06.2011 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
03.06.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.06.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.06.2011 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
11.04.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
11.04.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
11.04.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
11.04.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 105
09.03.2011 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
24.02.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.02.2011 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 34
24.02.2011 Description Search / examination 33
24.02.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.02.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.11.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
03.11.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.09.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
30.09.2010 Claims Search / examination 5
30.09.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.09.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
29.09.2010 Claims Search / examination 5
29.09.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
27.07.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
27.07.2010 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
27.07.2010 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
16.06.2010 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
28.05.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
28.05.2010 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 6
28.05.2010 Claims Search / examination 5
28.05.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
28.05.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
28.05.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 24
28.05.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
28.05.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
28.05.2010 Request for further processing Search / examination 4
19.03.2010 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
08.12.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
01.12.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.08.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
03.08.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.06.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
09.06.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
09.06.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
08.06.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
08.06.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
08.06.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
07.04.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
25.03.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.01.2009 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
08.01.2009 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 5
28.11.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
28.11.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.11.2008 Claims Search / examination 3
04.11.2008 Claims Search / examination 5
04.11.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
04.11.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
03.11.2008 Claims Search / examination 5
03.11.2008 Claims Search / examination 3
03.11.2008 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
03.11.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
03.11.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
03.11.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
26.08.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
19.08.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.04.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
24.04.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.10.2007 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
27.09.2007 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
06.09.2007 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
05.09.2007 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
05.09.2007 Claims Search / examination 9
05.09.2007 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
05.09.2007 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
04.09.2007 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
31.08.2007 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
31.08.2007 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
29.06.2007 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
13.09.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 37
24.08.2006 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
24.08.2006 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 109
10.04.2006 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
10.04.2006 Claims International Searching Authority 5
10.04.2006 Description International Searching Authority 93
10.04.2006 Drawings International Searching Authority 9