Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1850808

EP1850808 - APPARATUS FOR DYNAMIC VERTEBRAL STABILIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2007/45]APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DYNAMIC VERTEBRAL STABILIZATION
[2018/19]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.10.2018
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.04.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SK
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stryker European Holdings I, LLC
2825 Airview Boulevard
Kalamazoo, MI 49002 / US
[2016/09]
Former [2007/45]For all designated states
Stryker Spine
Z.I. de Marticot
33610 Cestas / FR
Inventor(s)01 / FALLIN, T., Wade
210 East 200 South
Hyde Park, Utah 84318 / US
02 / GERBEC, Daniel, E.
1755 Country Club Drive
Logan, Utah 84321 / US
03 / DEVER, Joel
195 North 250 East
Millville, Utah 84326 / US
 [2007/45]
Representative(s)Regimbeau
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
[2012/49]
Former [2007/45]Collin, Jérôme , et al
Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Application number, filing date06735764.022.02.2006
[2007/45]
WO2006US06233
Priority number, dateUS2005008711522.03.2005         Original published format: US 87115
US20050655298P22.02.2005         Original published format: US 655298 P
[2007/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006101655
Date:28.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1850808
Date:07.11.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2006
[2007/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1850808
Date:21.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.09.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/44, A61B17/56, A61B17/70
[2011/13]
Former International [2007/45]A61F2/44, A61B17/56
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/47]
Former [2007/45]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR DYNAMISCHEN BANDSCHEIBENSTABILISIERUNG[2018/19]
English:APPARATUS FOR DYNAMIC VERTEBRAL STABILIZATION[2018/19]
French:DISPOSITIF DE STABILISATION DYNAMIQUE VERTEBRALE[2018/19]
Former [2007/45]VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR DYNAMISCHEN BANDSCHEIBENSTABILISIERUNG
Former [2007/45]APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DYNAMIC VERTEBRAL STABILIZATION
Former [2007/45]DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE STABILISATION DYNAMIQUE VERTEBRALE
Entry into regional phase21.08.2007National basic fee paid 
21.08.2007Search fee paid 
21.08.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
21.08.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.08.2007Examination requested  [2007/45]
26.08.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.04.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.04.2018
24.04.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
26.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.08.2018Fee for grant paid
30.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.02.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
09.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
08.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
08.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
07.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
07.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
07.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
13.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.11.2018
CZ21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
EE21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
IT21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
PL21.11.2018
RO21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
SK21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
[2019/40]
Former [2019/37]AT21.11.2018
CZ21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
EE21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
IT21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
PL21.11.2018
RO21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/35]AT21.11.2018
CZ21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
IT21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
PL21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/34]AT21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
IT21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AT21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/24]AT21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/23]AT21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT21.11.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2004105577  (GLOBUS MEDICAL [US]; DAVID C PAUL [US]; ANDREW LEE [US]) [A] 1-12 * page 19, line 26 - page 20, line 8; figures 12-13 *;
 [A]EP1388323  (BIEDERMANN MOTECH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0014] , [0019] , [0021] , [0024]; figures 1-4,7-8; claim 1 *;
 [A]US6402750  (ATKINSON ROBERT E [US] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * column 16, line 4 - line 41; figures 10a-c *;
 [A]US4309777  (PATIL ARUN A) [A] 1 * abstract *
International search[X]US2003220643  ;
 [Y]US2002133155  ;
 [A]US6423065
ExaminationWO2004098452
 WO9505785
by applicantWO2004105577
 EP1388323
 US6402750
 US4309777