Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1863833

EP1863833 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING MACROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2014
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.06.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 06.07.2016  [2016/27]
Applicant(s)For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  NL  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim / DE
For:DE 
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG
Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/50]For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  NL  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim / DE
For:DE 
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG
Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BUSACCA, Carl
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
900 Ridgebury Road
P.o. Box 368
Ridgefield, CT 06877 / US
02 / GALLOU, Fabrice
Feierabendstrasse 59
4051 Basel / CH
03 / HADDAD, Nizar
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
900 Ridgebury Road
P.o. Box 368
Ridgefield, CT 06877-0368 / US
04 / HOSSAIN, Azad
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
900 Ridgebury Road
P.o. Box 368
Ridgefield, CT 06877-0368 / US
05 / KAPADIA, Suresh, R.
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
900 Ridgebury Road
P.o. Box 368
Ridgefield, CT 06877-0368 / US
06 / LIU, Jianxiu
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
900 Ridgebury Road
P.o. Box 368
Ridgefield, CT 06877-0368 / US
07 / SENANAYAKE, Chris, Hugh
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
900 Ridgebury Road
P.o. Box 368
Ridgefield, CT 06877-0368 / US
08 / WEI, Xudong
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
900 Ridgebury Road
P.o. Box 368
Ridgefield, CT 06877-0368 / US
09 / YEE, Nathan K.
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
900 Ridgebury Road
P.o. Box 368
Ridgefield, CT 06877-0368 / US
 [2013/18]
Former [2007/50]01 / BUSACCA, Carl
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceut. Inc 900 Ridgebury Road, P.o. Box 368
Ridgefield, CT 06877 / US
02 / GALLOU, Fabrice
Feierabendstrasse 59
4051 Basel / CH
03 / HADDAD, Nizar
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmac. Inc 900 Ridgebury Road, P.o. Box 368
Ridgefield, CT 06877 / US
04 / HOSSAIN, Azad
Boehringer Ingelh. Pharmac. Inc 900 Ridgebury Road, P.o. Box 368
Ridgefield, CT 06877 / US
05 / KAPADIA, Suresh, R.
Boehringer Ingelh. Pharmac. Inc 900 Ridgebury Road, P.o. Box 368
Ridgefield, CT 06877 / US
06 / LIU, Jianxiu
Boehringer Ingelh. Pharmac. Inc 900 Ridgebury Road, P.o. Box 368
Ridgefield, CT 06877-0368 / US
07 / SENANAYAKE, Chris, Hugh
Boehringer Ingelh. Pharmac. Inc 900 Ridgebury Road, P.o. Box 368
Ridgefield, CT 06877-0368 / US
08 / WEI, Xudong
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceut. Inc 900 Ridgebury Road, P.o. Box 368
Ridgefield, CT 06877-0368 / US
09 / YEE, Nathan K.
Boehringer Ingelh. Pharmac. Inc 900 Ridgebury Road, P.o. Box 368
Ridgefield, CT 06877-0368 / US
Representative(s)Simon, Elke Anna Maria , et al
Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH
Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
[2012/40]
Former [2007/50]Hammann, Heinz , et al
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
Application number, filing date06737166.606.03.2006
[2007/50]
WO2006US07954
Priority number, dateUS20050659696P08.03.2005         Original published format: US 659696 P
[2007/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006096652
Date:14.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/37]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1863833
Date:12.12.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2006
[2007/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1863833
Date:18.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.11.2006
ClassificationInternational:C07K5/08, C07D417/04, C07D401/04
[2007/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/50]
Extension statesBA08.10.2007
HR08.10.2007
YU08.10.2007
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG MAKROCYCLISCHER VERBINDUNGEN[2007/50]
English:PROCESS FOR PREPARING MACROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS[2007/50]
French:PRÉPARATION DE COMPOSÉS MACROCYCLIQUES[2013/18]
Former [2007/50]PREPARATION DE COMPOSES MACROCYCLIQUES
Entry into regional phase08.10.2007National basic fee paid 
08.10.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
08.10.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.10.2007Examination requested  [2007/50]
13.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.01.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.08.2013Fee for grant paid
08.08.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10183681.5  / EP2332963
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.02.2008
Opposition(s)19.06.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
02.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBG18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
IE06.03.2014
LU06.03.2014
[2016/27]
Former [2016/25]BG18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
IE06.03.2014
LU06.03.2014
Former [2015/07]CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
IE06.03.2014
LU06.03.2014
Former [2014/48]CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
LU06.03.2014
Former [2014/28]CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
Former [2014/23]CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
Former [2014/22]CY18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
Former [2014/18]CY18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
Former [2014/12]CY03.07.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
Former [2014/11]CY03.07.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
Former [2014/10]CY03.07.2013
LT18.09.2013
Former [2014/08]LT18.09.2013
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO03053349
 [Y]WO2004094452
 [A]US2005049187
 [XP]US2005267018
 [XP]WO2005095403
 [XP]US2005153877
 [Y]  JERRY MARCH: "Advanced Organic Chemistry" 1992, 4TH EDITION, JOHN WILEY AND SONS , XP002385266 page 641 - page 644
by applicant WO03053349
  WO2004094452
  US6608027
  US2003224977
  US2005075279
  US2005080005
  US2005049187
  US2004248779