Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1997270

EP1997270 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR AUTHENTICATING A USER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2008/49]DIGIPASS FOR THE WEB-FUNCTIONAL DESCRIPTION
[2014/48]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.10.2015
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.08.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG, HU
published on 27.09.2017  [2017/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vasco Data Security International GmbH
Worldwide Business Centre Balz-Zimmermannstrasse 7
8152 Glattbrugg / CH
[2009/08]
Former [2008/49]For all designated states
Vasco Data Security Inc.
Suite 210, 1901 South Meyers Road
Oakbrook Terrace, IL 60181 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FORT, Nicolas
13, Rue De La Cape
F-33200 Bordeaux / FR
02 / GRANGE, Benoit
11T, Rue Gourgues et Marsaud
F-33200 Bordeaux / FR
 [2010/01]
Former [2008/49]01 / FOT, Nicolas
13, Rue De La Cape
F-33200 Bordeaux / FR
02 / GRANGE, Benoit
11T, Rue Gourgues et Marsaud
F-33200 Bordeaux / FR
Representative(s)Beck, Michaël Andries T. , et al
IPLodge bvba
Technologielaan 9
3001 Heverlee / BE
[2014/49]
Former [2013/26]Beck, Michaël Andries T. , et al
IPLodge
Bondgenotenlaan 93/5
3000 Leuven / BE
Former [2011/31]D'Halleweyn, Nele Veerle Trees Gertrudis
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
Former [2009/48]Condon, Neil , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Former [2008/49]Condon, Neil , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date06737600.409.03.2006
[2008/49]
WO2006US08439
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007102823
Date:13.09.2007
Language:EN
[2007/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1997270
Date:03.12.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2007
[2008/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1997270
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US13.09.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/32, G06F21/31, H04L9/00, H04L9/08
[2013/34]
Former International [2008/49]H04L9/32, H04K1/00, H04L9/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/49]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG EINES BENUTZERS[2014/48]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR AUTHENTICATING A USER[2014/48]
French:PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR L'AUTHENTIFICATION D'UN UTILISATEUR[2014/48]
Former [2008/49]DIGIPASS ZUR WEB-FUNKTIONALITÄTSBESCHREIBUNG
Former [2008/49]DIGIPASS FOR THE WEB-FUNCTIONAL DESCRIPTION
Former [2008/49]DIGIPASS POUR LA DESCRIPTION FONCTIONNELLE WEB
Entry into regional phase08.10.2008National basic fee paid 
08.10.2008Search fee paid 
08.10.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
08.10.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.10.2008Examination requested  [2008/49]
06.01.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.06.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.2014Fee for grant paid
15.10.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.10.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.06.2014
Opposition(s)04.09.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
15.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
11.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.03.2006
BG03.12.2014
CY03.12.2014
CZ03.12.2014
EE03.12.2014
FI03.12.2014
LT03.12.2014
LV03.12.2014
MC03.12.2014
RO03.12.2014
SI03.12.2014
SK03.12.2014
GR04.03.2015
IS03.04.2015
PT03.04.2015
[2017/39]
Former [2016/12]CY03.12.2014
CZ03.12.2014
EE03.12.2014
FI03.12.2014
LT03.12.2014
LV03.12.2014
MC03.12.2014
RO03.12.2014
SI03.12.2014
SK03.12.2014
GR04.03.2015
IS03.04.2015
PT03.04.2015
Former [2015/46]CY03.12.2014
CZ03.12.2014
EE03.12.2014
FI03.12.2014
LT03.12.2014
LV03.12.2014
MC03.12.2014
RO03.12.2014
SK03.12.2014
GR04.03.2015
IS03.04.2015
PT03.04.2015
Former [2015/38]CY03.12.2014
CZ03.12.2014
EE03.12.2014
FI03.12.2014
LT03.12.2014
LV03.12.2014
RO03.12.2014
SK03.12.2014
GR04.03.2015
IS03.04.2015
PT03.04.2015
Former [2015/37]CY03.12.2014
CZ03.12.2014
EE03.12.2014
FI03.12.2014
LT03.12.2014
LV03.12.2014
RO03.12.2014
SK03.12.2014
GR04.03.2015
PT03.04.2015
Former [2015/36]CY03.12.2014
CZ03.12.2014
EE03.12.2014
FI03.12.2014
LT03.12.2014
LV03.12.2014
RO03.12.2014
GR04.03.2015
PT03.04.2015
Former [2015/35]CY03.12.2014
EE03.12.2014
FI03.12.2014
LT03.12.2014
LV03.12.2014
GR04.03.2015
PT03.04.2015
Former [2015/26]CY03.12.2014
FI03.12.2014
LT03.12.2014
LV03.12.2014
GR04.03.2015
Former [2015/24]FI03.12.2014
LT03.12.2014
LV03.12.2014
GR04.03.2015
Former [2015/23]FI03.12.2014
LT03.12.2014
Former [2015/20]LT03.12.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]US2004168083  (GASPARINI LOUIS [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] - [0041] *
 [A]  - Vorapranee Khu-Smith ET AL, "Enhancing the Security of Cookies", Information Security and Cryptology - ICISC 2001, Berlin, Heidelberg, Springer Berlin Heidelberg, (20020101), vol. 2288, pages 132 - 145, doi:10.1007/3-540-45861-1_11, ISBN 978-3-54-043319-4, XP055071302 [A] 1-15 * chapter 5, "Server-Managed Cookie Encryption" * * chapter 6, "User-Managed Cookie Encryption" * * chapter 8, "Secure Cookies versus User-Managed Cookie Security" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-45861-1_11
 [A]  - Seonghan Shin ET AL, "Leakage-Resilient Authenticated Key Establishment Protocols", Field Programmable Logic and Application, Berlin, Heidelberg, Springer Berlin Heidelberg, (20030101), vol. 2894, pages 155 - 172, doi:10.1007/978-3-540-40061-5_10, ISSN 0302-9743, ISBN 978-3-54-045234-8, XP055071328 [A] 1-15 * section 1.2, "Classification of AKE Protocols Using Password" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-540-40061-5_10
International search[XE]US2006064463  (CHAN HOI Y [US], et al);
 [A]US2004073792  (NOBLE BRIAN D [US], et al);
 [A]US6601169  (WALLACE JR CLYDE RILEY [US], et al);
 [A]US6920560  (WALLACE JR CLYDE RILEY [US]);
 [A]US2005268241  (LERNER JACK L [US]);
 [A]US2004111621  (HIMBERGER ANDREW M [US], et al)
by applicant   - "Enhancing the Security of Cookies", VORAPRANEE KHU-SMITH; CHRIS MITCHELL, Information Security and Cryptology - ICISC, SPRINGER, (2001), pages 132 - 145