Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1861313

EP1861313 - STERILE DE-MOLDING APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.03.2012
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.03.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.04.2012  [2012/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medical Instill Technologies, Inc.
201 Housatonic Avenue
New Milford CT 067762 / US
[2007/49]
Inventor(s)01 / PY, Daniel
1 Helena Avenue
Larchmont, NY 10538 / US
 [2007/49]
Representative(s)Bauer, Wulf
Patentanwälte
Bauer Vorberg Kayser
Partnerschaft mbB
Goltsteinstrasse 87
50968 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/31]Bauer, Wulf
Bauer Vorberg Kayser Patentanwälte Lindenallee 43
50968 Köln (Marienburg) / DE
Former [2007/49]Bauer, Wulf
Bauer - Vorberg - Kayser Patentanwälte Lindenallee 43
50968 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date06738435.413.03.2006
[2007/49]
WO2006US09372
Priority number, dateUS20050660935P11.03.2005         Original published format: US 660935 P
[2007/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006099507
Date:21.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/38]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1861313
Date:05.12.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2006
[2007/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US13.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:B65B1/04
[2007/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/49]
Extension statesAL18.12.2007
BA18.12.2007
HR18.12.2007
MK18.12.2007
YU18.12.2007
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM STERILEN ENTNEHMEN AUS EINER FORM[2007/49]
English:STERILE DE-MOLDING APPARATUS AND METHOD[2007/49]
French:APPAREIL ET METHODE DE DEMOULAGE STERILE[2007/49]
Entry into regional phase11.10.2007National basic fee paid 
11.10.2007Search fee paid 
18.12.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.12.2007Examination requested  [2008/07]
01.10.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/14]
16.11.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2012/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200803   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.2008
31.03.201106   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]US6326010  ;
 [Y]US2004256026  ;
 [Y]WO0249821