Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1863507

EP1863507 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING ACNE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.02.2018
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.03.2018  [2018/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Revance Therapeutics, Inc.
7555 Gateway Boulevard
Newark, CA 94560 / US
[2014/17]
Former [2007/50]For all designated states
Revance Therapeutics, Inc.
2400 Bayshore Parkway, Suite 100
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WAUGH, Jacob M.
425 First Street nr. 1801
San Francisco, California 94105 / US
02 / LEE, Jane
34243 Tartarian Way
Union City, CA 94587 / US
 [2010/12]
Former [2009/13]01 / WAUGH, Jacob M.
255 King Street nr 1805
San Francisco, California 94107 / US
02 / LEE, Jane
34243 Tartarian Way
Union City, CA 94587 / US
Former [2008/29]01 / WAUGH, Jacob M.
PO Box 50810
Palo Alto, California 94303 / US
02 / LEE, Jane
34243 Tartarian Way
Union City, CA 94587 / US
Former [2008/12]01 / WAUGH, Jacob M.
PO Box 50308
Palo Alto, California CA 94303 / US
02 / LEE, Jane
34243 Tartarian Way
Union City, CA 94587 / US
Former [2007/50]01 / WAUGH, Jacob M.
4020 El Camino Real 1116
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
02 / LEE, Jane
34243 Tartarian Way
Union City, CA 94587 / US
Representative(s)J A Kemp LLP
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/50]Wright, Simon Mark
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date06740288.330.03.2006
[2007/50]
WO2006US12095
Priority number, dateUS20050666531P30.03.2005         Original published format: US 666531 P
[2007/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006105450
Date:05.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/40]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1863507
Date:12.12.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2006
[2007/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.12.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61K36/00, A61K36/537, A61K36/906
[2007/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/50]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON AKNE[2007/50]
English:COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING ACNE[2007/50]
French:COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE L'ACNE[2007/50]
Entry into regional phase12.10.2007National basic fee paid 
12.10.2007Search fee paid 
12.10.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
12.10.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.10.2007Examination requested  [2007/50]
16.04.2010Observations by third parties
12.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.10.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/12]
08.11.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/12]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.03.2017
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
12.10.2012Request for further processing filed
12.10.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.10.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
15.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
11.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201207   M06   Fee paid on   25.05.2012
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2004091595  (UNILEVER NV [NL]; UNILEVER PLC [GB]; LEVER HINDUSTAN LTD [IN]; JAMES A) [X] 1-10 * page 26 * * page 18, lines 12-14 *;
 [X]WO9321899  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-10 * example 2 *;
 [X]BE903646  (HUYSMANS GUY A) [X] 1-10 * page 5; example 5 * * page 6, line 21 *;
 [Y]JP2002037736  (LION CORP) [Y] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [Y]US4923900  (DE VILLEZ RICHARD L [US]) [Y] 1-10 * claim 1 *;
 [Y]US2004242588  (DEJOVIN JACK [US] ET AL DEJOVIN JACK A [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0005]; claim 3 *
International search[X]US5910312  ;
 [Y]US5470884  ;
 [Y]US2003069148