Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021863

EP2021863 - HINGE FOR SPECTACLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.09.2014
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gosselin Marketing Inc.
325, rue Elvin
Drummondville QC J2A 1T2 / CA
[2012/08]
Former [2009/12]For all designated states
Kolo Distributing Canada 2007 Inc.
2385, Des Colombes
Drummondville QC J2C 8K3 / CA
For all designated states
Richard, Louis
107, Des Érables
Drummondville, QC J2C 1Y1 / CA
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Chagny, Yves
2, Rue du Champ, De Foire
01100 Arbent / FR
For all designated states
Richard, Louis
107, Des Érables
Drummondville, QC J2C 1Y1 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Chagny, Yves
2, rue du Champs de Foire
01100 Arbent / FR
02 / Richard, Louis
700 rue Taillon, app. 106
Drummondville, QC J2C 6H2 / CA
 [2009/28]
Former [2009/12]01 / Chagny, Yves
2, rue du Champs de Foire
01100 Arbent / FR
02 / Richard, Louis
107, rue des Érables
Drummondville, QC J2C 1Y1 / CA
Former [2009/07]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Reinhardt, Harry , et al
RPK Patentanwälte
Reinhardt, Pohlmann und Kaufmann
Partnerschaft mbB
Grünstrasse 1
75172 Pforzheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/08]Reinhardt, Harry , et al
Reinhardt & Pohlmann Partnerschaft Grünstrasse 1
75172 Pforzheim / DE
Former [2009/07]Nithardt, Roland
Cabinet Roland Nithardt Y-PARC Parc Scientifique et Technologique Rue Galilée 9
1400 Yverdon-les-Bains / CH
Application number, filing date06741465.611.05.2006
[2009/07]
WO2006CA00750
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007131313
Date:22.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2021863
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2021863
Date:06.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA22.11.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.11.2009
ClassificationInternational:G02C5/10, G02C5/22, G02C5/14, G02C5/00
[2013/17]
Former International [2009/07]G02C5/22, G02C5/16
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GELENK FÜR BRILLEN[2009/07]
English:HINGE FOR SPECTACLES[2009/07]
French:CHARNIÈRE POUR LUNETTES[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase26.11.2008National basic fee paid 
26.11.2008Search fee paid 
26.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
25.01.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.05.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.2013Fee for grant paid
24.09.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.05.2013
Opposition(s)07.08.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
16.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
17.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
10.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
14.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.05.2006
BG06.11.2013
CY06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
SI06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
TR06.11.2013
IS06.03.2014
LU11.05.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU11.05.2006
BG06.11.2013
CY06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
SI06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
IS06.03.2014
LU11.05.2014
Former [2016/31]BG06.11.2013
CY06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
SI06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
IS06.03.2014
LU11.05.2014
Former [2016/25]BG06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
SI06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
IS06.03.2014
LU11.05.2014
Former [2015/14]CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
SI06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
IS06.03.2014
LU11.05.2014
Former [2015/04]CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
IS06.03.2014
LU11.05.2014
Former [2014/41]CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
IS06.03.2014
Former [2014/37]CZ06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
IS06.03.2014
Former [2014/36]EE06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
IS06.03.2014
Former [2014/25]LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
IS06.03.2014
Former [2014/23]LT06.11.2013
IS06.03.2014
Former [2014/20]LT06.11.2013
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1376201  (DECOVER [FR]) [A] 1-15 * columns 1-4, paragraphs 8-24 *;
 [A]FR2700397  (CDS [FR]) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 32 - page 5 *;
 [A]DE20316953U  (WIED JUN [DE]) [A] 1-15 * claim - *;
 [A]US5408279  (CHIOU CHING-HAE [TW]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, lines 36-47; figure 1 * * column 4, lines 16-29 *
International search[A]CA2439558
 [A]US5386254
 [A]US5646708
 [A]US6145985
 [A]CA2018533
 [XE]US7055953
 [XE]CA2487910
by applicant EP1376201
  CA2439558