Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023529

EP2023529 - A METHOD FOR PROTECTING DIGITAL CONTENT BY ENCRYPTING AND DECRYPTING A MEMORY CARD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  01.07.2016
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2016Refusal of applicationpublished on 03.08.2016  [2016/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lin, Hui
1F., No. 72, Chow-Tze St.
Taipei 114 / TW
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Lang, Christian , et al
LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei
Ingolstädter Straße 5
80807 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/45]Lang, Christian , et al
LangPatent
Anwaltskanzlei
Rosenheimer Strasse 139
81671 München / DE
Former [2009/07]Lang, Christian , et al
LangRaible GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Herzog-Wilhelm-Straße 22
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date06741797.208.05.2006
[2009/07]
WO2006CN00901
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007128162
Date:15.11.2007
Language:ZH
[2007/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2023529
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN15.11.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.12.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/32, G06F21/00, H04L29/06
[2012/04]
Former International [2009/07]H04L9/32
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM SCHUTZ VON DIGITALEM INHALT DURCH VERSCHLÜSSELN UND ENTSCHLÜSSELN EINER SPEICHERKARTE[2009/07]
English:A METHOD FOR PROTECTING DIGITAL CONTENT BY ENCRYPTING AND DECRYPTING A MEMORY CARD[2009/07]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PROTECTION D'UN CONTENU NUMÉRIQUE PAR CHIFFREMENT ET DÉCHIFFREMENT D'UNE CARTE MÉMOIRE[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase08.12.2008Translation filed 
08.12.2008National basic fee paid 
08.12.2008Search fee paid 
08.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
08.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
20.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2016Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/31]
23.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
16.03.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/31]
16.03.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.04.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
30.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
29.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
27.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
28.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1248248  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0015] * * paragraphs [0018] - [0040] * * paragraphs [0069] - [0079] * * paragraphs [0140] - [0149] * * paragraphs [0175] - [0187] *;
 [X]EP1085394  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0017] * * paragraphs [0021] - [0029] * * paragraphs [0047] - [0059] * * paragraphs [0077] - [0086] * * paragraphs [0102] - [0105] * * paragraphs [0115] - [0128] * * paragraphs [0133] - [0141] * * figures 1-27 *;
 [X]  "SDMI SECURE DIGITAL MUSIC INITIATIVE", SDMI PORTABLE DEVICE SPECIFICATION VERSION 1.0, XX, XX, (19990708), no. PART 01, pages 1 - 35, XP000997330 [X] 1-7 * the whole document *
 [A]  MICROSOFT CORPORATION, "Encrypting File System for Windows 2000", MICROSOFT WINDOWS 2000 SERVER, XX, XX, (19990701), XP002319388 [A] 1-7 * abstract *
International search[X]CN1425173
 [A]CN1592307
 [A]US2006089123
by applicant EP1248248
  EP1085394