Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1889066

EP1889066 - DETERMINATION OF RESPONDERS TO CHEMOTHERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.03.2015
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.03.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.04.2015  [2015/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstraße 124
4070 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2008/08]For all designated states
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / HELLER, Astrid
Ruhe am Bach 5b
82377 Penzberg / DE
02 / LUTZ, Verena
Unterbrunnerstrasse 14
81475 Muenchen / DE
03 / MOECKS, Joachim
Max-Joseph-Strasse 9
68167 Mannheim / DE
04 / WARD, Carol
30 Rue Des Vignes
F-68510 Helfrantzkirch / FR
05 / BRENNSCHEIDT, Ulrich
deceased / DE
 [2008/08]
Representative(s)Burger, Alexander
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Patentabteilung
Nonnenwald 2
82377 Penzberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/43]Burger, Alexander
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patent Department (TR-E) Nonnenwald 2
82377 Penzberg / DE
Former [2008/08]Burger, Alexander
Roche Diagnostics GmbH,Patent Department (TR-E), Postfach 1152
82372 Penzberg / DE
Application number, filing date06742856.510.05.2006
[2008/08]
WO2006EP04370
Priority number, dateEP2005001024411.05.2005         Original published format: EP 05010244
EP2005001107023.05.2005         Original published format: EP 05011070
[2008/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006119980
Date:16.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1889066
Date:20.02.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2006
[2008/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.11.2006
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/574
[2008/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BESTIMMUNG VON AUF CHEMOTHERAPIE REAGIERENDEN PATIENTEN[2014/21]
English:DETERMINATION OF RESPONDERS TO CHEMOTHERAPY[2008/08]
French:DETERMINATION DE SUJETS REPONDANT A UNE CHIMIOTHERAPIE[2008/08]
Former [2008/08]BESTIMMUNG VON AUF CHEMOTHERAPIE REAGIERENDEN SUBSTANZEN
Entry into regional phase11.12.2007National basic fee paid 
11.12.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.12.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.12.2007Examination requested  [2008/08]
24.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.06.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.10.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/15]
19.11.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2015/15]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.02.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
07.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
10.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201409   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0100245  (GENENTECH, INC) [X] 1-18,22,23 * abstract * * page 57, paragraph 2 - paragraph 5; example 12 *;
 [A]WO0172721  (BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY; LEE, FRANCIS, Y) [A] 1-18,23,24;
 [A]WO0239117  (ONCOLYTICS BIOTECH, INC; COFFEY, MATTHEW, C) [A] 1-18,23,24;
 [X]  - WARSHAMANA-GREENE G SAKUNTALA ET AL, "The insulin-like growth factor-I receptor kinase inhibitor, NVP-ADW742, sensitizes small cell lung cancer cell lines to the effects of chemotherapy.", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH : AN OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH. 15 FEB 2005, (20050215), vol. 11, no. 4, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 1563 - 1571, XP002393843 [X] 1-18,23,24 * abstract * * page 57, paragraph 2 - paragraph 5; example 12 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-04-1544